NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION v. SEMONITE et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION
Defendant: TODD T. SEMONITE and ROBERT M. SPEER
Movant: VIRGINIA ELECTRIC AND POWER COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2017cv01361
Filed: July 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Royce C. Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/08/2019. (lcrcl3)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/23/18. (lsj)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re Order 59 . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/20/17. (lsj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION v. SEMONITE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks, II
Represented By: Eric Robert Glitzenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD T. SEMONITE
Represented By: Dedra Seibel Curteman
Represented By: Heather E. Gange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT M. SPEER
Represented By: Dedra Seibel Curteman
Represented By: Heather E. Gange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: VIRGINIA ELECTRIC AND POWER COMPANY
Represented By: Harry M. Johnson, III
Represented By: Eric J. Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?