HARRIS et al v. MEDICAL TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT, INC.
Plaintiff: |
ISAAC HARRIS, DARNELL FRYE and LEO FRANKLIN |
Defendant: |
MEDICAL TRANSPORTATION MANAGEMENT, INC. |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv01371 |
Filed: |
July 13, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Columbia |
Office: |
Washington, DC Office |
County: |
11001 |
Presiding Judge: |
Amit P. Mehta |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 3, 2022 |
Filing
215
ORDER denying 212 Defendant's Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings During Pendency of Appeal. The parties shall file a proposed summary judgment briefing schedule on or before June 10, 2022. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/3/2022. (lcapm2)
|
November 22, 2021 |
Filing
200
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendant's 189 Motion to Amend/Correct and 190 Motion to Stay. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/22/2021. (lcapm2)
|
August 6, 2021 |
Filing
187
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying the Defendant's 180 Motion to Decertify FLSA Collective and granting the Plaintiffs' 179 Motion for Certification of an Issue Class Under Rule 23(c)(4) in part. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/06/2021. (lcapm2)
|
September 24, 2020 |
Filing
176
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, ECF No. 134 . The court also denies as moot Defendant's Motion to Strike, ECF No. 143 , and Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, ECF No. 157 . See attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/24/2020. (lcapm2)
|
August 9, 2018 |
Filing
62
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 55 Motion for Partial Relief from Order of July 17, 2018, and resolving the parties' disputes as to the final text of the Notice and the Consent Form. The parties shall appear for a Status Conference on August 15, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/9/2018. (lcapm2) Modified document type on 8/9/2018 (zjd).
|
July 17, 2018 |
Filing
49
ORDER denying Third-Party Defendants' MBI Logistics LLC and Star Transportation's 31 Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta 7/17/2018. (lcapm2) Modified document type on 7/18/2018 (zjd).
|
March 5, 2018 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 10 Motion to Dismiss. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/5/2018. (lcapm2)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?