DOE et al v. TRUMP et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, DYLAN KOHERE, REGAN V. KIBBY and JOHN DOE, 1
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP, JAMES N. MATTIS, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, HEATHER A. WILSON, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, ELAINE C. DUKE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, RICHARD V. SPENCER and RAQUEL C. BONO
Case Number: 1:2017cv01597
Filed: August 9, 2017
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2018 187 Featured Case ORDER denying 183 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/30/2018. (lcckk3)
November 28, 2018 186 Memorandum in opposition to re 183 MOTION to Stay re 156 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Wolfson, Paul)
November 27, 2018 185 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew Evan Carmichael (Carmichael, Andrew)
November 27, 2018 184 NOTICE of Filing Petition for a Writ of Certiorari Before Judgment by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Petition)(Carmichael, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Reply due by 11/28/2018. (dot)
November 25, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' 183 Motion to Stay the Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal. Defendants indicate that Plaintiffs oppose this Motion. In light of Defendants' request for an expedited ruling, the Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file a response to Defendants' Motion by NOVEMBER 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/25/2018. (lcckk3)
November 21, 2018 183 MOTION to Stay re 156 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carmichael, Andrew)
November 13, 2018 182 REPLY to opposition to motion re 170 MOTION for Protective Order to preclude the deposition of Vice Admiral David Kriete filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. (Carmichael, Andrew)
November 13, 2018 181 REPLY to opposition to motion re 171 MOTION for Protective Order to preclude discovery of documents and information subject to the presidential communications privilege and to preclude further deposition testimony of Jennifer Hay filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Carmichael, Andrew)
November 13, 2018 180 REPLY to opposition to motion re 169 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Information Withheld Under the Deliberative Process Privilege filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Wolfson, Paul)
November 8, 2018 179 NOTICE of Filing by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
November 7, 2018 178 NOTICE Re: Letter by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carmichael, Andrew)
October 30, 2018 177 AFFIDAVIT re 175 Memorandum in Opposition, 176 Memorandum in Opposition, (Declaration of Alan E. Schoenfeld in Support of Plaintiffs' Memoranda in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Protective Orders) by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
October 30, 2018 176 Memorandum in opposition to re 170 MOTION for Protective Order to preclude the deposition of Vice Admiral David Kriete filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Schoenfeld, Alan)
October 30, 2018 175 Memorandum in opposition to re 171 MOTION for Protective Order to preclude discovery of documents and information subject to the presidential communications privilege and to preclude further deposition testimony of Jennifer Hay filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Schoenfeld, Alan)
October 30, 2018 174 RESPONSE re 169 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Information Withheld Under the Deliberative Process Privilege filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Carmichael, Andrew)
October 9, 2018 173 SEALED DOCUMENT(Main Document Exhibit C to the Declaration of Alan E. Schoenfeld) filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. re 169 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Information Withheld Under the Deliberative Process Privilege filed by JANE DOE 6, JOHN DOE 2, DYLAN KOHERE, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Alan E. Schoenfeld)(ztd)
October 9, 2018 172 Featured Case SEALED ORDER re 168 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons. filed by JANE DOE 6, JOHN DOE 2, DYLAN KOHERE, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/9/18.(zdot)
October 9, 2018 171 MOTION for Protective Order to preclude discovery of documents and information subject to the presidential communications privilege and to preclude further deposition testimony of Jennifer Hay by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Carmichael, Andrew)
October 9, 2018 170 MOTION for Protective Order to preclude the deposition of Vice Admiral David Kriete by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Carmichael, Andrew)
October 9, 2018 169 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Information Withheld Under the Deliberative Process Privilege by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alan E. Schoenfeld in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Information Withheld Under the Deliberative Process Privilege, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
October 9, 2018 168 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Alan E. Schoenfeld, # 2 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Alan E. Schoenfeld, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
September 21, 2018 167 Joint STATUS REPORT in Response to September 10, 2018 Order by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Schoenfeld, Alan)
September 12, 2018 166 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. Attorney Christopher R. Looney terminated. (Looney, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties shall report to the Court which issues have been identified for the subject matter of the motions due by 9/21/2018. Parties to file opening motions addressing outstanding issues identified during the meet and confer process due by 10/9/2018. Parties to file crossing response briefs by 10/30/2018. Parties to file crossing reply briefs by 11/13/2018. (dot)
September 10, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of parties' 165 Joint Status Report in Response to August 27, 2018 Order. In that Order, the Court instructed the parties to propose a plan for moving forward toward a timely resolution of this case. In their Joint Status Report, the parties agree that there remain numerous disputes regarding discovery. Accordingly, the parties propose a schedule for resolving the outstanding disputes before depositions and other discovery resume. The Court adopts the parties' agreed upon schedule. The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer to identify outstanding issues for the Court's resolution by SEPTEMBER 17, 2018. The Court OREDERS that parties report to the Court which issues have been identified for the subject matter of the motions by SEPTEMBER 21, 2018. The Court ORDERS the parties to file opening motions addressing outstanding issues identified during the meet and confer process by OCTOBER 9, 2018. The Court ORDERS the parties to file crossing response briefs by OCTOBER 30, 2018. The parties dispute whether reply briefs are necessary. The Court agrees with the government that reply briefs would assist the Court given the significance of the issues at stake. The Court ORDERS the parties to file crossing reply briefs by NOVEMBER 13, 2018. This is a generous schedule, so the Court expects no requests for extensions. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9-10-2018. (lcckk3)
September 10, 2018 165 Joint STATUS REPORT IN RESPONSE TO AUGUST 27, 2018 ORDER by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Schoenfeld, Alan)
August 29, 2018 USCA Case Number 18-5257 for 162 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,, filed by RYAN D. MCCARTHY, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JAMES N. MATTIS, HEATHER A. WILSON, ELAINE C. DUKE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, MARK T. ESPER, DONALD J. TRUMP, RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR. (zrdj)
August 28, 2018 164 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re 162 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,,. (ztd)
August 27, 2018 163 AMICUS BRIEF by RETIRED MILITARY OFFICERS AND FORMER NATIONAL SECURITY OFFICIALS. (ztd)
August 27, 2018 162 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 156 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by JAMES N. MATTIS, MARK T. ESPER, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RAQUEL C. BONO, ELAINE C. DUKE, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, HEATHER A. WILSON, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., RICHARD V. SPENCER. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Carmichael, Andrew)
August 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/10/2018. (dot)
August 27, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report by no later than SEPTEMBER 10, 2018. The Joint Status Report shall propose a plan for moving forward toward a timely resolution of this case. In particular, the Joint Status Report shall include a proposed protocol for the efficient resolution of the parties' outstanding discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/27/2018. (lcckk3)
August 27, 2018 161 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 136 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/27/2018. (lcckk3)
August 24, 2018 160 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION Regarding 159 ORDER DENYING Defendants' 115 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and DENYING Plaintiffs' 131 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/24/2018. (lcckk3)
August 24, 2018 159 Featured Case ORDER DENYING Defendants' 115 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and DENYING Plaintiffs' 131 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/24/2018. (lcckk3)
August 17, 2018 158 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. Attorney Daniel L. McFadden terminated. (McFadden, Daniel)
August 6, 2018 157 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION Regarding 156 ORDER DENYING Defendants' 115 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, to the extent that Motion sought the dismissal of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for lack of jurisdiction or for failure to state a claim, and DENYING Defendants' 116 Motion to Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/6/2018. (lcckk3, )
August 6, 2018 156 Featured Case ORDER DENYING Defendants' 115 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, to the extent that Motion sought the dismissal of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for lack of jurisdiction or for failure to state a claim, and DENYING Defendants' 116 Motion to Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/6/2018. (lcckk3)
August 6, 2018 155 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION Regarding 154 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 90 Partial Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Partially Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction and DENYING Defendants' 89 Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/6/2018. (lcckk3)
August 6, 2018 154 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 90 Partial Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Partially Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction and DENYING Defendants' 89 Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/6/2018. (lcckk3)
July 6, 2018 153 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Trump v. Hawaii)(Carmichael, Andrew)
July 3, 2018 152 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. Attorney Claire Laporte terminated. (McFadden, Daniel)
July 3, 2018 151 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. Attorney Lauren Godles Milgroom terminated. (Milgroom, Lauren)
June 25, 2018 150 NOTICE of Filing of Redacted Documents by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON re 138 Memorandum in Opposition,, (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Redacted, # 2 Exhibit 11 Redacted, # 3 Exhibit 12 Redacted)(Carmichael, Andrew)
June 22, 2018 149 REPLY to opposition to motion re 131 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Schoenfeld, Alan)
June 22, 2018 148 ERRATA (Notice of Errata) by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE 128 Affidavit,,,, filed by JANE DOE 6, JOHN DOE 2, DYLAN KOHERE, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit QQ)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
June 19, 2018 145 Featured Case ORDER Regarding the Deposition of Rear Admiral David Kriete. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/19/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (lcckk3)
June 11, 2018 147 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ASSOCIATION OF MEDICAL SCHOOL PEDIATRIC DEPARTMENT CHAIRS, RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. re 138 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed by RYAN D. MCCARTHY, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JAMES N. MATTIS, HEATHER A. WILSON, ELAINE C. DUKE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, MARK T. ESPER, DONALD J. TRUMP, RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
June 11, 2018 146 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. re 130 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by JANE DOE 6, JOHN DOE 2, DYLAN KOHERE, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, 131 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JANE DOE 6, JOHN DOE 2, DYLAN KOHERE, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, 116 MOTION To Dissolve The Preliminary Injunction filed by RYAN D. MCCARTHY, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, JAMES N. MATTIS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, HEATHER A. WILSON, ELAINE C. DUKE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, MARK T. ESPER, DONALD J. TRUMP, RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., 115 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RYAN D. MCCARTHY, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, JAMES N. MATTIS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, HEATHER A. WILSON, ELAINE C. DUKE, MARK T. ESPER, RICHARD V. SPENCER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, DONALD J. TRUMP, RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
June 11, 2018 143 Featured Case ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The documents attached to Defendant' motion are, hereby, placed under seal. the parties shall MEET AND CONFER regarding what redactions need to be made to these documents such that they can be filed on the public docket. Redacted versions shall be filed on the docket by no later than 6/25/2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/11/18. (dot)
June 7, 2018 141 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. Attorney Ryan Bradley Parker terminated. (Parker, Ryan)
June 6, 2018 144 REPLY to opposition to motion re 115 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON; (SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 138 TO VIEW.) (ztd)
June 6, 2018 140 REPLY to opposition to motion re 116 MOTION To Dissolve The Preliminary Injunction filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. (Carmichael, Andrew)
June 6, 2018 139 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit 11, # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Carmichael, Andrew)
June 6, 2018 138 Memorandum in opposition to re 131 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Carmichael, Andrew) Modified linkage on 6/11/2018 (ztd).
May 24, 2018 137 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Op. 73-74, Knight First Amend. Inst. at Columbia Univ. v. Trump, No. 17-cv-5205, # 2 Op., Grimm v. Gloucester County School Board, No. 15-cv-00054)(Wolfson, Paul)
May 21, 2018 136 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Retired Military Officers and Former National Security Officials (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spector, Phillip)
May 17, 2018 135 Featured Case ORDER granting 134 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' reply in support of motions to dissolve the preliminary injunction, to dismiss the complaint, and/or in the alternative for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment due by 6/6/2018. Plaintiffs' reply in support of cross-motion for summary judgment due by 6/22/2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/17/18. (dot)
May 17, 2018 134 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Carmichael, Andrew)
May 14, 2018 133 ERRATA by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE 128 Affidavit,,,, filed by JANE DOE 6, JOHN DOE 2, DYLAN KOHERE, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY. (Attachments: # 1 (Corrected) Declaration of Joshua D. Safer in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 11, 2018 132 Memorandum in opposition to re 115 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' Statement of Facts)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 11, 2018 131 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 11, 2018 130 Memorandum in opposition to re 116 MOTION To Dissolve The Preliminary Injunction , 115 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 11, 2018 129 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam M. Cambier in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction and Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 11, 2018 128 AFFIDAVIT (Declaration of Lauren Godles Milgroom in Support of the Statement of Undisputed Material Facts) by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP, # 43 Exhibit QQ, # 44 Exhibit RR, # 45 Exhibit SS)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
April 30, 2018 127 ERRATA by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE 126 Reply to opposition to Motion,, filed by JANE DOE 6, JOHN DOE 2, DYLAN KOHERE, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Declaration of Kevin M. Lamb in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply)(Lamb, Kevin)
April 30, 2018 126 REPLY to opposition to motion re 109 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas for Production of Documents Directed to Nonparties Family Research Council and Heritage Foundation (Reply in Support of Motion to Compel) filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Lamb in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Wolfson, Paul)
April 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Response due by 5/11/2018. Defendants' Reply due by 5/24/2018. (dot)
April 25, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' 117 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs request a seven day extension of time up to and including May 11, 2018, within which to file their Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss the Complaint or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment, because Plaintiffs represent that they need additional time to formulate their responses. This is the first request for an extension of this deadline and Defendants consent. Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' oppositions shall be filed no later than MAY 11, 2018. Granting Defendants an equivalent extension, Defendants' reply briefs shall be filed no later than MAY 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/25/2018. (lcckk3)
April 24, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' 116 Motion to Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction, which apparently supersedes Defendants' earlier 96 Motion to Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' earlier 96 Motion is accordingly DENIED as MOOT. Only Defendants' 116 Motion remains pending. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/24/2018. (lcckk3)
April 24, 2018 125 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FAMILY RESEARCH COUNCIL, INC. (Schaerr, Gene)
April 24, 2018 124 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 118 Order filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Recall, # 2 Exhibit Partially Redacted Presentation)(Parker, Ryan)
April 23, 2018 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Gene C. Schaerr on behalf of FAMILY RESEARCH COUNCIL, INC. (Schaerr, Gene)
April 23, 2018 122 Memorandum in opposition to re 109 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas for Production of Documents Directed to Nonparties Family Research Council and Heritage Foundation filed by Heritage Foundation, FAMILY RESEARCH COUNCIL, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schaerr, Gene)
April 23, 2018 121 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Heritage Foundation. (Abegg, Heidi)
April 23, 2018 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi K. Abegg on behalf of Heritage Foundation (Abegg, Heidi)
April 23, 2018 119 Memorandum in opposition to re 109 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas for Production of Documents Directed to Nonparties Family Research Council and Heritage Foundation filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. (Parker, Ryan)
April 23, 2018 118 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Clawback Dispute. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (lcckk3)
April 23, 2018 117 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 116 MOTION To Dissolve The Preliminary Injunction , 115 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfson, Paul)
April 20, 2018 116 MOTION To Dissolve The Preliminary Injunction by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2015 Statement, # 3 Exhibit RAND Blog Post, # 4 Exhibit Terms of Reference)(Parker, Ryan)
April 20, 2018 115 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative,, MOTION for Summary Judgment by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Department of Defense Release No.: NR-272-15, # 3 Exhibit Agnes Gereben Schaefer, On RANDs Research Findings Regarding Transgender Military Personnel Policy, # 4 Exhibit Memorandum from Secretary Mattis: Terms of Reference)(Parker, Ryan)
April 18, 2018 114 Featured Case ORDER DENYING Defendants' 97 Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/18/2018. (lcckk3)
April 18, 2018 113 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Deadline for Document Production and Privilege Disputes. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/18/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (lcckk3)
April 16, 2018 112 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Deposition of the Vice Chairman of the Joint Chiefs of Staff, General Paul J. Selva. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/16/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (lcckk3)
April 16, 2018 111 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by JANE DOE 2,JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Slip Op., Karnoski v. Trump, No. 2:17-cv-01297-MJP (Apr. 13, 2018))(Wolfson, Paul)
April 12, 2018 110 REPLY to opposition to motion re 97 MOTION for Protective Order filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., MARK T. ESPER, JAMES N. MATTIS, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. (Parker, Ryan)
April 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Nonparties Family Research Council and Heritage Foundation, and/or Defendants, shall file a Response to 109 by 4/23/2018. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 4/30/2018. (dot)
April 9, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' 109 Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas for Production of Documents Directed to Nonparties Family Research Council and Heritage Foundation. Nonparties Family Research Council and Heritage Foundation, and/or Defendants, shall file a response by no later than APRIL 23, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file a reply by no later than APRIL 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/9/2018. (lcckk3)
April 6, 2018 109 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas for Production of Documents Directed to Nonparties Family Research Council and Heritage Foundation by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lauren Milgroom, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Wolfson, Paul) (Attachment 9 replaced to make page 4 non-fillable on 4/9/2018) (td).
April 6, 2018 108 Memorandum in opposition to re 97 MOTION for Protective Order filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam M. Cambier in Support of Plainttiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Wolfson, Paul)
April 6, 2018 107 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE re 106 Amended Complaint,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Wolfson, Paul)
April 6, 2018 106 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, MARK T. ESPER filed by JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, DYLAN KOHERE, JANE DOE 4, JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, JANE DOE 6, JANE DOE 7, JOHN DOE 2.(Wolfson, Paul)
April 4, 2018 105 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jennifer Levi (Levi, Jennifer)
April 4, 2018 104 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mary L. Bonauto (Bonauto, Mary)
March 29, 2018 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Roosevelt on behalf of JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Roosevelt, Theresa)
March 28, 2018 102 TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on March 28, 2018; Page Numbers: 1 - 54. Date of Issuance:March 28, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Richard D. Ehrlich, Telephone number (202) 354-3269, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from t he court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/18/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2018.(Ehrlich, Richard)
March 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference on the record held on 3/28/2018. (Court Reporter Richard Ehrlich.) (dot)
March 28, 2018 101 Featured Case ORDER Regarding March 28, 2018 Teleconference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/28/2018. (lcckk3)
March 28, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 98 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren Godles Milgroom in order for her to appear as co-counsel for Plaintiffs. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/28/2018. (lcckk3)
March 28, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of putative intervenor Buzzfeed, Inc.'s ("Buzzfeed") 99 Motion to Intervene to Seek Access to March 28, 2018 Telephone Conference. This motion was filed on the evening before the telephone conference to which Buzzfeed seeks access. Other members of the press likewise have sought access to the teleconference by contacting courthouse personnel. Because the teleconference is scheduled for this morning, March 28, 2018, this Order addressing Buzzfeed's pending motion and other press inquiries must of necessity be brief.In its motion, Buzzfeed indicates that it does not know what the substance of this morning's teleconference will be. The Court hereby notifies Buzzfeed and other interested news outlets that the purpose of the March 28, 2018, telephone conference is solely to set a schedule for future proceedings. Buzzfeed also cites a number of opinionsmany of them in the criminal contextin its motion about the appropriateness of sealed or in camera proceedings. This is a civil case, and the teleconference will not be sealed. The discussion will be transcribed, and the record will be available shortly afterwards. As its practice has been, the Court also shall issue a written order summarizing the teleconference and setting forth agreed dates for the ensuing briefing.Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 77(b) allows the Court to hold this teleconference with the parties in chambers. That rule states that "[e]very trial on the merits must be conducted in open court and, so far as convenient, in a regular courtroom," but "[a]ny other act or proceeding may be done or conducted by a judge in chambers, without the attendance of the clerk or other court official, and anywhere inside or outside the district." Fed. R. Civ. P. 77(b). "Rule 77(b) simply articulates the traditional authority of a judge to speak privately with the parties to a suit, whether in bench conferences or in chambers." B.H. v. McDonald, 49 F.3d 294, 298 (7th Cir. 1995). The Court is under no obligation to allow any and all interested parties to join a teleconference held in its chambers, especially where the content of that conference does not address the merits of the case, will be memorialized in an Order, and will also be transcribed in a public transcript. Moreover, Buzzfeed frames its request as a motion to intervene under Rule 24, but does not specify whether it seeks intervention as of right (Rule 24(a)) or permissive intervention (Rule 24(b)). Language in its memorandum suggests that intervention is sought as of right, but Buzzfeed has not cited any federal statute that would give it "an unconditional right to intervene" (Rule 24(a)(1)), nor does it claim that the nature of this teleconferencea scheduling conferencewould "dispos[e] of the action" and thus "may as a practical matter impair or impede the movant's ability to protect its interest" (Rule 24(a)(2)). Even if Buzzfeed instead seeks permissive intervention pursuant to Rule 24(b), it has not argued that any federal statute accords it "a conditional right to intervene" (Rule 24(b)(1)) or that it "has a claim or defense that shares with the main action a common question of law or fact" (Rule 24(b)(2)). The Court is not persuaded that intervention is appropriate. Accordingly, the Court shall DENY Buzzfeed's 99 Motion to Intervene to Seek Access to March 28, 2018 Telephone Conference, as well as any other requests by the press to participate in this teleconference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/28/2018. (lcckk3) Modified to add link on 3/29/2018 (znmw).
March 27, 2018 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Schafer on behalf of BUZZFEED, INC. (Schafer, Matthew)
March 27, 2018 99 MOTION to Intervene to Seek Access to March 28, 2018 Telephone Conference by BUZZFEED, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Zoe Tillman, # 3 Declaration of Matthew L. Schafer, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Corporate Disclosure)(Schafer, Matthew)
March 27, 2018 98 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren Godles Milgroom, :Firm- Foley Hoag LLP, :Address- 155 Seaport Boulevard, Boston, MA 02210. Phone No. - 617-832-3052. Fax No. - 617-832-7000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5391796. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lauren Godles Milgroom, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
March 26, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference on the record set for 3/28/2018 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
March 26, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The teleconference previously set for March 27, 2018 is hereby rescheduled for MARCH 28, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/26/2018. (lcckk3)
March 26, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference on the record set for 3/27/2018 at 9:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
March 26, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court will hold a teleconference with the parties on MARCH 27, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall jointly call chambers at a number to be provided by e-mail. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/26/2018. (lcckk3)
March 23, 2018 97 MOTION for Protective Order by RAQUEL C. BONO, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan)
March 23, 2018 96 MOTION to Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction by RAQUEL C. BONO, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Declaration)(Parker, Ryan)
March 23, 2018 95 NOTICE by ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Parker, Ryan)
March 23, 2018 94 REPLY to opposition to motion re 90 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Partially Disolve the Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Partially Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. (Parker, Ryan)
March 19, 2018 93 REPLY to opposition to motion re 89 MOTION for Protective Order filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. (Parker, Ryan)
March 16, 2018 92 RESPONSE re 90 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Partially Disolve the Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Partially Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Wolfson, Paul)
March 12, 2018 91 RESPONSE re 89 MOTION for Protective Order filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Daniel McFadden, # 2 Exhibit A- E-Mail to Ryan Parker March 1, 2018, # 3 Exhibit B- E-Mail exchange July 27, 2017 regarding the transgender policy message, # 4 Exhibit C- Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to General Dunford, # 5 Exhibit D- Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to the Navy and Secretary Spencer, # 6 Exhibit E- Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to the Army and Secretary Esper, # 7 Exhibit F- Air Force's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, # 8 Exhibit G- Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to the Defense Health Agency and Director Bono, # 9 Exhibit H- Privilege log produced by the Defendants on February 7, 2018, # 10 Exhibit I- Privilege log produced by the Defendants on February 6, 2018, # 11 Exhibit J- E-Mail exchange dated January 11-12, 2018 regarding "Proposed Discovery Response Schedule.")(Wolfson, Paul)
March 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Response to 90 due by 3/16/2018. Defendants' Reply due by 3/23/2018. (dot)
March 2, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' 90 Partial Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Partially Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs shall file a response by no later than MARCH 16, 2018. Defendants shall file a reply by no later than MARCH 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/2/2018. (lcckk3)
March 2, 2018 90 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Partially Disolve the Preliminary Injunction by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan). Added MOTION for Order to Partially Dissolve the Preliminary Injunction on 3/5/2018 (znmw).
February 27, 2018 89 MOTION for Protective Order by RAQUEL C. BONO, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan)
February 22, 2018 88 TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, held on 02/16/2018. Page Numbers: 11. Date of Issuance: 02/22/2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sara A. Wick. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days , the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2018.(Wick, Sara)
February 21, 2018 87 TRANSCRIPT OF INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on November 28, 2017; Page Numbers: 1 - 31. Date of Issuance:December 15, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Richard D. Ehrlich, Telephone number (202) 354-3269, Tape Number: NA. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a publ ic terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2018.(Ehrlich, Richard)
February 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's motion for protective order due by 2/27/2018. Response due by 3/12/2018. Reply due by 3/19/2018. (tb)
February 16, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference on the record held on 2/16/2018. (Court Reporter Sara Wick.) (dot)
February 16, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court held a teleconference with the parties today, February 16, 2018, to discuss a discovery dispute. The dispute relates to Defendants' assertions of two privileges: the deliberative process privilege and the presidential communications privilege. With respect to the deliberative process privilege, Plaintiffs have provided Defendants with a list of documents that they contend were inappropriately withheld in full or in part. Defendants are going to review those documents and consult with Plaintiffs next week to discuss whether they are willing to release some or all of those documents, or at least provide Plaintiffs with more information about the documents so that Plaintiffs can consider the appropriateness of Defendants' assertions of privilege. The parties will then meet and confer and attempt to resolve their disputes without further Court intervention. If unsuccessful, Plaintiffs can contact the Court again. With respect to the presidential communications privilege, Defendants refuse to provide any information to the Court for it to review in camera in order to adjudicate the legality of Defendants' assertion of privilege. Defendants are to file a motion for a protective order on this particular presidential communications privilege issue by no later than FEBRUARY 27, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file a response by no later than MARCH 12, 2018. Defendants shall file a reply by no later than MARCH 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/16/2018. (lcckk3)
February 16, 2018 86 Letter from Plaintiffs and Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Letter, # 2 Exhibit Ex A 2017.12.15 Pltfs' 1st Set of INTs, # 3 Exhibit Ex B President Trump Interrogatory Objections - Served 2.6.18, # 4 Exhibit Ex C Secretary of Defense Mattis Interrogatory Responses - Served on 2.6, # 5 Exhibit Ex D 2018.01.25 Air Force's Objcs. and Resps. to Pltfs' 1st INTs, # 6 Exhibit Ex E Doe v. Trump - Updated Privilege Log - 2.7.18, # 7 Exhibit Ex F USDOE00061876 - with redactions, # 8 Exhibit Ex G USDOE00061945 - with redactions, # 9 Ex H President Trump RFA Objections - Served 2.6.18) "Let this be filed" signed 2/16/18 by Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly(td) (Main Document 86 replaced on 2/16/2018) (ztd).
February 15, 2018 83 TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 02/13/2018; Page Numbers: 35; Date of Issuance: 02/15/2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sara A. Wick, Telephone number 202-354-3284. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporte r referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/8/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2018.(Wick, Sara)
February 14, 2018 85 Featured Case ORDER on the parties Joint Motion pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) and Local Civil Rule 16.3(c)(10). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/14/18. (dot)
February 14, 2018 84 Featured Case ORDER granting 81 Motion for Uniform Protective Order and Cross-Use Agreement. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/14/18. (dot)
February 14, 2018 82 STIPULATION of Voluntary Partial Dismissal as to Plaintiff Jane Doe 1 and Defendants United States Coast Guard and Kirstjen Nielsen, in her official capacity as Secretary of Homeland Security by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Wolfson, Paul) Modified text on 2/15/2018 (td).
February 14, 2018 81 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Cross-Use Agreement and Fed.R.Evid. 502(D) Order by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order and Cross Use Agreement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) Order)(Parker, Ryan) Modified text on 2/15/2018 (td).
February 13, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference on the record set for 2/16/2018 at 2:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
February 13, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court held a teleconference with the parties today, February 13, 2018, to discuss a discovery dispute. The Court will hold another teleconference on Friday, FEBRUARY 16, 2018 at 2:30 PM to continue to discuss this dispute. In the meantime, the parties are to meet and confer. The parties shall be prepared during the next teleconference to discuss what information Defendants contend is covered by the presidential communications privilege that the Court can review in camera. The parties shall also meet and confer to resolve or narrow their dispute regarding the deliberative process privilege and, if the dispute cannot be fully resolved, Plaintiffs shall be prepared to identify the specific documents they would request the Court review in camera. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/13/2018. (lcckk3)
February 13, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference on the record held on 2/13/2018. (Court Reporter Sara Wick.) (dot)
February 9, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference on the record set for 2/13/2018 at 2:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
February 9, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court will hold a teleconference with the parties on the record on FEBRUARY 13, 2018 at 2:30 pm to discuss a discovery dispute. The parties shall jointly call chambers at a number provided by e-mail. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/9/2018. (lcckk3)
January 9, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference held on 1/9/2018. (Court Reporter Sara Wick.) (dot)
January 9, 2018 80 Featured Case ORDER Regarding January 9, 2018 Teleconference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/9/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (lcckk3)
January 8, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference on the record set for 1/9/2018 at 1:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
January 4, 2018 79 MANDATE of USCA as to 66 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,, filed by RYAN D. MCCARTHY, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, RICHARD V. SPENCER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RAQUEL C. BONO, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JAMES N. MATTIS, HEATHER A. WILSON, ELAINE C. DUKE ; USCA Case Number 17-5267. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Order)(ztd)
December 29, 2017 78 ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint,, by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON.(Parker, Ryan)
December 22, 2017 77 Joint STATUS REPORT Supplementing Discovery Plan by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. (Parker, Ryan)
December 15, 2017 76 Joint STATUS REPORT Setting Forth Detailed Discovery Plan by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. (Parker, Ryan)
December 11, 2017 75 Featured Case ORDER DENYING Defendants' 73 Motion for a Partial Stay of the Court's Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/11/2017. (lcckk3)
December 8, 2017 74 Memorandum in opposition to re 73 MOTION to Stay Portion of Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Wolfson, Paul)
December 7, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Partial Stay of Preliminary Injunction due by 12/8/2017. (kt)
December 7, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' 73 Motion for Partial Stay of Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal. Plaintiff shall file a response by no later than DECEMBER 8, 2017 at NOON. Defendants have waived their right to file a reply. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/7/2017. (lcckk3)
December 6, 2017 73 MOTION to Stay Portion of Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lernes J. Herbert, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan)
December 1, 2017 USCA Case Number 17-5267 for 66 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,, filed by RYAN D. MCCARTHY, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, RICHARD V. SPENCER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RAQUEL C. BONO, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JAMES N. MATTIS, HEATHER A. WILSON, ELAINE C. DUKE. (zrdj)
November 30, 2017 72 TRANSCRIPT OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on November 28, 2017; Page Numbers: 1 - 31. Date of Issuance:November 30, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Richard D. Ehrlich, Telephone number (202) 354-3269, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018.(Ehrlich, Richard)
November 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/28/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2017. Discovery due by 3/30/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 12/15/2017. Initial Disclosure due by 12/15/2017. Proponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due by 2/5/2018; Opponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due by 3/5/2018; and Replies, if any due by 3/12/2018. Status Conference set for 4/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Richard Ehrlich.) (dot)
November 28, 2017 71 Featured Case SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/28/2017. (lcckk3)
November 27, 2017 70 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Defendants' 67 Motion for Clarification of the Court's October 30, 2017 Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/27/2017. (lcckk3)
November 27, 2017 69 Memorandum in opposition to re 67 MOTION to ClarifyCourt's Order of October 30, 2017 filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Wolfson, Paul)
November 22, 2017 68 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re 66 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,,. (td)
November 22, 2017 67 MOTION to ClarifyCourt's Order of October 30, 2017 by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Carmichael, Andrew)
November 21, 2017 66 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 60 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by JAMES N. MATTIS, RAQUEL C. BONO, ELAINE C. DUKE, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, HEATHER A. WILSON, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., RICHARD V. SPENCER. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Carmichael, Andrew)
November 21, 2017 65 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Wolfson, Paul)
November 17, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file their Joint Statement addressing all topics listed in Local Rule 16.3(c) by no later than NOVEMBER 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/17/2017. (lcckk3)
November 14, 2017 64 Featured Case ORDER FOR INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/14/2017. (lcckk3)
November 14, 2017 63 Featured Case ORDER Regarding the parties' 62 Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/14/2017. (lcckk3)
November 10, 2017 62 Joint STATUS REPORT in Response to October 30, 2017 Order by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Wolfson, Paul)
October 30, 2017 61 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION Regarding 60 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART Defendants' 45 Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/30/2017. (lcckk3)
October 30, 2017 60 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART Defendants' 45 Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/30/2017. (lcckk3)
October 23, 2017 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher F. Stoll on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stoll, Christopher)
October 23, 2017 58 ERRATA Correcting Defendants' Reply In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON 57 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by RYAN D. MCCARTHY, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, RICHARD V. SPENCER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RAQUEL C. BONO, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, JAMES N. MATTIS, HEATHER A. WILSON, ELAINE C. DUKE. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Corrected Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss)(Parker, Ryan)
October 20, 2017 57 REPLY to opposition to motion re 45 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. (Parker, Ryan)
October 20, 2017 56 NOTICE of Filing Redacted Declarations by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian Judge pertaining to Jane Doe 1, # 2 Declaration pertaining to Jane Doe 2, # 3 Declaration pertaining to Jane Doe 3, # 4 Declaration pertaining to Jane Doe 4, # 5 Declaration of Daniel Sitterly pertaining to Jane Doe 5, # 6 Declaration pertaining to John Doe 1)(Parker, Ryan)
October 16, 2017 55 Memorandum in opposition to re 45 MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Wolfson, Paul)
October 16, 2017 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Schuster on behalf of NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY, SOUTHERN ARIZONA GENDER ALLIANCE, TENNESSEE TRANSGENDER POLITICAL COALITION, TGI NETWORK OF RHODE ISLAND, TRANSGENDER ALLIES GROUP, TRANSGENDER LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATION FUND, TRANSGENDER RESOURCE CENTER OF NEW MEXICO, TRANSOHIO (Schuster, Stephanie)
October 16, 2017 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Baker Manning on behalf of NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY, SOUTHERN ARIZONA GENDER ALLIANCE, TENNESSEE TRANSGENDER POLITICAL COALITION, TGI NETWORK OF RHODE ISLAND, TRANSGENDER ALLIES GROUP, TRANSGENDER LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATION FUND, TRANSGENDER RESOURCE CENTER OF NEW MEXICO, TRANSOHIO (Manning, Susan)
October 16, 2017 52 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY, TENNESSEE TRANSGENDER POLITICAL COALITION, TGI NETWORK OF RHODE ISLAND, TRANSGENDER ALLIES GROUP, TRANSGENDER LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATION FUND, TRANSOHIO, TRANSGENDER RESOURCE CENTER OF NEW MEXICO, SOUTHERN ARIZONA GENDER ALLIANCE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Manning, Susan)
October 16, 2017 51 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Declarations in Opposition to the Government's Motion to Dismiss and in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Raymond Edwin Mabus, # 2 Declaration of Deborah Lee Jones, # 3 Declaration of Eric K. Fanning, # 4 Declaration of Mark J. Eitelberg, # 5 Declaration of George R. Brown)(Wolfson, Paul)
October 16, 2017 50 AMICUS BRIEF by MASSACHUSETTS (td) Modified on 10/16/2017 as to filer(s) (jf).
October 11, 2017 49 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by TREVOR PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hogan, Howard)
October 5, 2017 48 SEALED DOCUMENT (Declarations) re 47 Memorandum in Opposition, 45 MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by RYAN D. MCCARTHY, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, RICHARD V. SPENCER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RAQUEL C. BONO, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, HEATHER A. WILSON, ELAINE C. DUKE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration as to Jane Doe 2, # 2 Declaration as to Jane Doe 3, # 3 Declaration as to Jane Doe 4, # 4 Declaration as to Jane Doe 5, # 5 Declaration as to John Doe 1)(znmw)
October 5, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court has received Defendant's 46 Consent Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. That motion seeks leave to file under seal certain declarations that "contain information identifying the Plaintiffs who are proceeding in this action under pseudonyms." The motion also indicates that Defendants have "requested that Plaintiffs' counsel propose redactions to the declarations that will allow them to be filed on the public record without placing the Plaintiffs' identities at risk of disclosure." Having considered the familiar Hubbard factors for sealing, and given that the Court has previously permitted Plaintiffs to proceed under pseudonyms to protect their anonymity, the 46 Motion shall be GRANTED. See EEOC v. Nat'l Childrens Ctr. Inc., 98 F.3d 1406, 1409 (D.C. Cir. 1996) (listing factors). However, this ruling is CONTINGENT on the parties filing mutually agreeable redacted versions of the declarations at issue on the public docket by OCTOBER 20, 2017. Any content in these documents that would not expose the identities of the Plaintiffs shall be made publicly available. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/5/2017. (lcckk1)
October 4, 2017 47 Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with 65.1(d) Expedited Request, filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON. (See Docket Entry 45 to view document). (znmw)
October 4, 2017 46 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration as to Jane Doe 1, # 2 Declaration as to Jane Doe 2, # 3 Declaration as to Jane Doe 3, # 4 Declaration as to Jane Doe 4, # 5 Declaration as to Jane Doe 5, # 6 Declaration as to John Doe 1)(Parker, Ryan)
October 4, 2017 45 MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Interim Guidance, # 2 Declaration of Robert B. Chadwick, # 3 Declaration of Robert O. Burns, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan)
October 4, 2017 44 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs on Behalf of Medical, Nursing, Mental Health, and Other Health Care Organizations by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN MEDICAL WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN NURSES ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF MEDICAL SCHOOL PEDIATRIC DEPARTMENT CHAIRS, ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBT EQUALITY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS, PEDIATRIC ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, WORLD PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR TRANSGENDER HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Brief of Amici Curiae Medical, Nursing, Mental Health, and Other Health Care Organizations in Support of Plaintiffs, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wilkens, Scott)
September 29, 2017 43 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/5/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/11/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/10/2017.) (See Docket Entry 41 to view document). (znmw)
September 29, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Response to 13 due by 10/4/2017. Reply due by 10/16/2017. (dot)
September 29, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' 42 Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants request an additional two days to file their opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction because they need additional time to prepare declarations and for senior Executive Branch officials to review their forthcoming pleadings. Defendants represent that Plaintiffs oppose this extension, but no opposition has yet been filed. Because the record supporting Plaintiffs' motion is large and the requested extension is brief, the Court will GRANT Defendants' motion over Plaintiffs' objection. Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss by no later than OCTOBER 4, 2017. This is the final extension that will be granted. Additionally, the Court notes that Defendants' motion is untimely. The Order Establishing Procedures in this case states that "[m]otions for extensions of time must be filed at least four (4) business days prior to the first affected deadline." ECF No. 5 at 3. The Court expects all future motions to be filed on time. If Plaintiffs require additional time, they may file their reply and opposition by OCTOBER 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/29/2017. (lcckk3)
September 29, 2017 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Interim Guidance, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan)
September 29, 2017 41 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RAQUEL C. BONO served on 9/5/2017; DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY served on 9/5/2017; ELAINE C. DUKE served on 9/5/2017; JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR. served on 9/6/2017; JAMES N. MATTIS served on 9/6/2017; RYAN D. MCCARTHY served on 9/5/2017; RICHARD V. SPENCER served on 9/6/2017; DONALD J. TRUMP served on 9/11/2017; UNITED STATES COAST GUARD served on 9/5/2017; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE served on 9/5/2017; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY served on 9/5/2017; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY served on 9/5/2017; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 9/6/2017; HEATHER A. WILSON served on 9/5/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Summons Executed as to AirForce, # 2 Summons Executed as to Army, # 3 Summons Executed as to Bono, # 4 Summons Executed as to Coast Guard, # 5 Summons Executed as to DHA, # 6 Summons Executed as to Duke, # 7 Summons Executed as to Dunford, # 8 Summons Executed as to Mattis, # 9 Summons Executed as to McCarthy, # 10 Summons Executed as to Navy, # 11 Summons Executed as to Spencer, # 12 Summons Executed as to USA, # 13 Summons Executed as to Wilson, # 14 Proof of Service as to U.S. Attorney General, # 15 Proof of Service as to U.S. Attorney's Office - District of D.C., # 16 Certificate of Service)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
September 21, 2017 40 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Christopher R. Looney in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction to 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with 65.1(d) Expedited Request,, 36 Order by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 20, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' 39 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Entry of a Briefing Schedule. Defendants request an additional two weeks to file their opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction and a motion to dismiss. They also request a briefing schedule on these motions that would not be complete until October 27, 2017. The Court will GRANT-IN-PART Defendants' motion. The parties shall adhere to the following schedule: Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss by no later than OCTOBER 2, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file a reply in support of their Application and an opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by no later than OCTOBER 13, 2017. Defendants shall file a reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss by no later than OCTOBER 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/20/2017. (lcckk3)
September 20, 2017 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, Unopposed MOTION for Briefing Schedule by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan)
September 13, 2017 38 Featured Case ORDER granting 37 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/13/17. (dot)
September 12, 2017 37 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Ryan)
September 10, 2017 36 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' 13 Application for a Preliminary Injunction, 14 Request for Expedited Hearing and 15 Motion for Leave to File Documents under Seal. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/10/2017. (lcckk3)
September 8, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Harriet Hoder in order for her to appear as co-counsel for Plaintiffs. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. There are now 16 attorneys who are appearing pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. The Court notes that attorneys for Plaintiffs only need to move to appear pro hac vice before the Court if they are actually going to participate in Court proceedings. LCvR 83.2(d). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/8/2017. (lcckk3)
September 6, 2017 35 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,, filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE. (Wolfson, Paul)
September 6, 2017 34 NOTICE regarding Consolidation of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and the Merits of Plaintiffs' Claims by RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Presidential Memorandum regarding Military Service by Transgender Individuals)(Parker, Ryan)
September 6, 2017 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Harriet Hoder, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP, :Address- 60 State Street, Boston, MA 02109. Phone No. - 617-526-6203. Fax No. - 617-526-5000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5104723. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Harriet Hoder, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 5, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 16 , 17 , 18 , 22 , 23 , 24 , 25 , 26 , 27 , 28 , 29 , 30 , 31 and 32 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Jennifer Levi, Shannon P. Minter, Mary L. Bonauto, Christopher R. Looney, Nancy Lynn Schroeder, Adam M. Cambier, Christopher F. Stoll, Amy Whelan, Kathleen M. Brill, Rachel C. Hutchinson, Claire Laporte, Michael J. Licker, Daniel L. McFadden and Matthew E. Miller in order for them to appear as co-counsel for Plaintiffs. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/5/2017. (lcckk3)
September 1, 2017 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew E. Miller, :Firm- Foley Hoag LLP, :Address- 155 Seaport Boulevard, Boston, MA 02210. Phone No. - 617-832-3041. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5100489. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew E. Miller, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 1, 2017 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel L. McFadden, :Firm- Foley Hoag LLP, :Address- 155 Seaport Boulevard, Boston, MA 02210. Phone No. - 617-832-1293. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5100477. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel L. McFadden, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 1, 2017 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael J. Licker, :Firm- Foley Hoag LLP, :Address- 155 Seaport Boulevard, Boston, MA 02210. Phone No. - 617-832-1197. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5100412. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Licker, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 1, 2017 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Claire Laporte, :Firm- Foley Hoag LLP, :Address- 155 Seaport Boulevard, Boston, MA 02210. Phone No. - 617-832-1210. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5100401. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Claire Laporte, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 1, 2017 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachel C. Hutchinson, :Firm- Foley Hoag LLP, :Address- 155 Seaport Boulevard, Boston, MA 02210. Phone No. - 617-832-3063. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5100387. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel C. Hutchinson, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 1, 2017 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathleen M. Brill, :Firm- Foley Hoag LLP, :Address- 155 Seaport Boulevard, Boston, MA 02210. Phone No. - 617-832-1229. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5100368. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kathleen M. Brill, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 1, 2017 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amy Whelan, :Firm- National Center for Lesbian Rights, :Address- 870 Market St., Ste. 370, San Francisco, California 94102. Phone No. - 415-392-6257. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5100283. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declration of Amy Whelan, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 1, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Telephone Conference on the record held on 9/1/2017. Defendants' Response to 13 due by 9/22/2017. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 9/29/2017. Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2017. (Court Reporter Janice Dickman.) (dot)
September 1, 2017 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher F. Stoll, :Firm- National Center for Lesbian Rights, :Address- 870 Market St., Ste. 370, San Francisco, California 94102. Phone No. - 415-392-6257. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5100239. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher F. Stoll, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 1, 2017 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adam M. Cambier, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 60 State Street, Boston, MA 02109. Phone No. - 617-526-6262. Fax No. - 617-526-5000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5100204. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam M. Cambier, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 1, 2017 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nancy Lynn Schroeder, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 350 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 2100, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Phone No. - (213) 443-5393. Fax No. - (213) 443-5400 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5100160. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nancy Lynn Schroeder, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 1, 2017 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher R. Looney, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 60 State Street, Boston, MA 02109. Phone No. - 617-526-6313. Fax No. - 617-526-5000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5100097. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher R. Looney, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 1, 2017 21 SUMMONS (9) Reissued Electronically as to ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, HEATHER A. WILSON (znmw)
September 1, 2017 20 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to RAQUEL C. BONO, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (znmw)
September 1, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court held a teleconference in this matter on September 1, 2017 to set a briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' 13 Application for a Preliminary Injunction. At the parties' request, the Court entered the following schedule: Defendants shall file an opposition to Plaintiffs' Application by no later than SEPTEMBER 22, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file a reply by no later than SEPTEMBER 29, 2017. The parties were also ordered to file a notice with the Court by no later than SEPTEMBER 6, 2017 indicating their positions as to whether the Court's consideration of Plaintiffs' preliminary injunction application should be consolidated with its final determination of the merits of the case. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/1/2017. (lcckk3)
September 1, 2017 19 NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Declaration of Alan E. Schoenfeld in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE re Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alan E. Schoenfeld)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 1, 2017 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mary L. Bonauto, :Firm- GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, :Address- 30 Winter St., Ste. 800, Boston, Massachusetts 02108. Phone No. - 617-426-1350. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5099075. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mary L. Bonauto, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 1, 2017 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Shannon P. Minter, :Firm- National Center for Lesbian Rights, :Address- 870 Market St., Ste. 370, San Francisco, California 94102. Phone No. - 415-392-6257. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5099060. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon P. Minter, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
September 1, 2017 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer Levi, :Firm- GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, :Address- 30 Winter St., Ste. 800, Boston, Massachusetts 02108. Phone No. - 617-426-1350. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5099052. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jennifer Levi, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
August 31, 2017 15 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher R. Looney, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order (SEALED))(Lamb, Kevin)
August 31, 2017 14 MOTION for Hearing Request for Expedited Hearing and Statement of Facts Making Expedition Essential, by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE re 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with 65.1(d) Expedited Request, (Lamb, Kevin) Modified event title on 9/1/2017 (znmw).
August 31, 2017 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with 65.1(d) Expedited Request, by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin M. Lamb, # 2 Exhibit A-F (Lamb Dec.), # 3 Declaration of Brad R. Carson, # 4 Exhibit A-C (Carson Dec.), # 5 Declaration of Deborah Lee James, # 6 Exhibit A-D (James Dec.), # 7 Declaration of Eric K. Fanning, # 8 Exhibit A-F (Fanning Dec.), # 9 Declaration of Raymond Edwin Mabus, Jr., # 10 Exhibit A-F (Mabus Dec.), # 11 Declaration of George Richard Brown, MD, DFAPA, # 12 Exhibit A-D (Brown Dec.), # 13 Declaration of Margaret C. Wilmoth, # 14 Declaration of Regan V. Kibby, # 15 Declaration of Dylan Kohere, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
August 31, 2017 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Bradley Parker on behalf of All Defendants (Parker, Ryan)
August 31, 2017 11 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JOHN DOE, 1, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, REGAN V. KIBBY, DYLAN KOHERE(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Lamb, Kevin)
August 31, 2017 10 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE (Summons - Air Force) re 9 Amended Complaint,, filed by JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 3, DYLAN KOHERE, JANE DOE 4, JOHN DOE, 1, REGAN V. KIBBY, JANE DOE 5. Related document: 9 Amended Complaint,, filed by DYLAN KOHERE, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JOHN DOE, 1, REGAN V. KIBBY. (Attachments: # 1 Summons - Army, # 2 Summons - Coast Guard, # 3 Summons - Duke, # 4 Summons - Dunford, # 5 Summons - Mattis, # 6 Summons - McCarthy, # 7 Summons - Trump, # 8 Summons - United States, # 9 Summons - Wilson)(Lamb, Kevin)
August 31, 2017 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, against ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, RICHARD V. SPENCER, RAQUEL C. BONO filed by JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, DYLAN KOHERE, REGAN V. KIBBY, JOHN DOE, 1. (Attachments: # 1 Summons - U.S. Department of the Navy, # 2 Summons - Defense Health Agency, # 3 Summons - Raquel C. Bono, # 4 Summons - Richard V. Spencer)(Lamb, Kevin)
August 30, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alan E. Schoenfeld, in order for him to appear as co-counsel for Plaintiffs, contingent on said attorney filing a declaration certifying familiarity with this Court's Local Rules by no later than SEPTEMBER 6, 2017. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/30/2017. (lcckk3)
August 30, 2017 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alan E. Schoenfeld, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street, New York, NY 10007. Phone No. - 212-937-7294. Fax No. - 212-230-8888 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5096409. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alan E. Schoenfeld In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
August 30, 2017 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Matthew Lamb on behalf of JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5 (Lamb, Kevin)
August 11, 2017 6 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Wolfson, Paul)
August 11, 2017 5 Featured Case ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/11/2017. (DM)
August 11, 2017 SUMMONS Not Issued as to US Attorney and the US Attorney General. (sth)
August 11, 2017 4 SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, HEATHER A. WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(sth)
August 10, 2017 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Plaintiffs to proceed under pseudonyms. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/10/17. (sth)
August 9, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (sth)
August 9, 2017 2 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonyms , by JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfson, Paul)
August 9, 2017 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, against ELAINE C. DUKE, JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR., JAMES N. MATTIS, RYAN D. MCCARTHY, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, HEATHER A. WILSON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5066975) filed by JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons - Trump, # 3 Summons - Mattis, # 4 Summons - Dunford, # 5 Summons - U.S. Army, # 6 Summons - McCarthy, # 7 Summons - U.S. Air Force, # 8 Summons - Wilson, # 9 Summons - U.S. Coast Guard, # 10 Summons - Duke, # 11 Summons - U.S.A.)(Wolfson, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE et al v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE 1
Represented By: Mary L. Bonauto(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathleen M. Brill(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Adam M. Cambier(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Harriet Hoder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rachel C. Hutchinson(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Lamb
Represented By: Claire Laporte(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Levi(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael J. Licker(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher R. Looney(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Schroeder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Amy Whelan(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE 2
Represented By: Mary L. Bonauto(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathleen M. Brill(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Adam M. Cambier(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Harriet Hoder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rachel C. Hutchinson(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Lamb
Represented By: Claire Laporte(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Levi(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael J. Licker(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher R. Looney(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Schroeder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Amy Whelan(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE 3
Represented By: Mary L. Bonauto(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathleen M. Brill(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Adam M. Cambier(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Harriet Hoder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rachel C. Hutchinson(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Lamb
Represented By: Claire Laporte(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Levi(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael J. Licker(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher R. Looney(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Schroeder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Amy Whelan(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE 4
Represented By: Mary L. Bonauto(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathleen M. Brill(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Adam M. Cambier(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Harriet Hoder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rachel C. Hutchinson(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Lamb
Represented By: Claire Laporte(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Levi(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael J. Licker(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher R. Looney(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Schroeder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Amy Whelan(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE 5
Represented By: Mary L. Bonauto(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathleen M. Brill(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Adam M. Cambier(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Harriet Hoder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rachel C. Hutchinson(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Lamb
Represented By: Claire Laporte(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Levi(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael J. Licker(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher R. Looney(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Schroeder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Amy Whelan(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DYLAN KOHERE
Represented By: Mary L. Bonauto(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathleen M. Brill(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Adam M. Cambier(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Harriet Hoder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rachel C. Hutchinson(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Lamb
Represented By: Claire Laporte(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Levi(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael J. Licker(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher R. Looney(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Schroeder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Amy Whelan(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGAN V. KIBBY
Represented By: Mary L. Bonauto(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathleen M. Brill(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Adam M. Cambier(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Harriet Hoder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rachel C. Hutchinson(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Lamb
Represented By: Claire Laporte(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Levi(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael J. Licker(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher R. Looney(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Schroeder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Amy Whelan(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE, 1
Represented By: Mary L. Bonauto(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kathleen M. Brill(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Adam M. Cambier(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Harriet Hoder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Rachel C. Hutchinson(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Lamb
Represented By: Claire Laporte(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jennifer Levi(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael J. Licker(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher R. Looney(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Matthew E. Miller(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Schroeder(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Amy Whelan(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES N. MATTIS
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH F. DUNFORD, JR.
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN D. MCCARTHY
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER A. WILSON
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES COAST GUARD
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAINE C. DUKE
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD V. SPENCER
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAQUEL C. BONO
Represented By: Ryan Bradley Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?