HUDSON, JR. v. AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES
Plaintiff: EUGENE HUDSON, JR.
Defendant: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES
Case Number: 1:2017cv01867
Filed: September 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: James E. Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:0401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 130 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/28/2020. (lcjeb1)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 92 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/2/2019. (lcjeb2)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 89 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/12/2019. (lcjeb2)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 50 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/25/18. (lcjeb1)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 43 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/2/18. (lcjeb1)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 33 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/5/18. (lcjeb1)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING Defendant's 14 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/15/17. (lcjeb1) Modified event title on 11/16/2017 (znmw).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUDSON, JR. v. AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES
Represented By: Gony Frieder Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE HUDSON, JR.
Represented By: Jonathan G. Axelrod
Represented By: Justin P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?