NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE v. TRUMP et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE
Defendant: DONALD TRUMP, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, ELAINE C. DUKE, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2017cv01907
Filed: September 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Christopher R. Cooper
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/17/2018. (lcjdb1)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting the government's motion to clarify and granting in part and denying in part the government's motion to stay. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/17/2018. (lcjdb1)
August 15, 2018 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion to Stay by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO, CLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sellers, Joseph) Modified event title on 8/17/2018 (znmw).
August 10, 2018 USCA Case Number 18-5243 for 28 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,, filed by JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE. (zrdj)
August 7, 2018 Filing 29 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re 28 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zrdj)
August 6, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 23 Memorandum & Opinion, 22 Order on Motion for Scheduling Order,, Order on Motion for Hearing,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 26 Order, 27 Memorandum & Opinion by ELAINE C. DUKE, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, DONALD TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Davis, Kathryn)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/3/2018. (lcjdb1)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying defendants' motion to revise the Court's April 24, 2018 Order. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/3/2018. (lcjdb1)
August 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: The stay of the Court's 4/24/2018 Order vacating the DHS's 9/5/2017 decision rescinding the DACA program is continued until 8/23/2018. Defendants shall file by 8/23/2018 any motion seeking a further stay of the Court's Order pending appeal. (jth)
July 11, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Pezzi on behalf of All Defendants (Pezzi, Stephen)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/27/2018. (lcjdb1)
June 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to revive 69 Order is due by 7/11/2018. Responses due by 7/23/2018 Reply due by 7/27/2018. (tb)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/24/2018. (lcjdb1) (Main Document 23 replaced on 4/26/2018) (ztd).
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and deferring in part 15 the government's motion to dismiss; granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment; and disposing of the remaining motions pending in this case. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/24/2018. (lcjdb1)
March 15, 2018 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT OF 3/14/18 MOTIONS HEARING before Judge John D. Bates held on March 14, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-95. Date of Issuance: March 15, 2018. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2018.(Wayne, Bryan)
March 14, 2018 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/14/2018 before Judge John D. Bates re: 15 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE. Motion heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb)
January 28, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Reply in support of their 28 Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 2/6/2018. A Joint Status Report representing the parties' respective proposals for scheduling further proceedings in this case is due by 2/22/2018. (jth)
January 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Bates: Telephone Conference call held on 1/26/2018. The Motions Hearing presently scheduled for Friday, February 2, 2018 is continued to a date and time to be determined. (Revised Scheduling Order to be Issued) (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (jth)
January 25, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 1/26/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On the Court's own motion, and upon consideration of the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No. 17-2325 for purposes of the dispositive motions currently pending in both cases; it is further ORDERED that all filings with respect to those motions shall be made jointly and shall be filed only in 17-2325; it is further ORDERED that counsel of record in both cases shall receive electronic notice of any filings made in either case; and it is further ORDERED that counsel in both cases shall determine how to divide their argument time at the motions hearing currently set for Friday, February 2, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge John D. Bates. SO ORDERED - by Judge John D. Bates on 1/18/2018. (tb)
January 10, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie S. Selesnick on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO, CLC (Selesnick, Julie)
January 3, 2018 Filing 19 Case directly reassigned to Judge John D. Bates as related to 17cv2325 (JDB). Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
December 15, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for Nine Declarants to Proceed Pseudonymously by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO, CLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sellers, Joseph)
November 27, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 11/22/2017. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2017. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2018. Replies due by 1/19/2018. Oral Arguments on Motions set for 1/31/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: See Order for full briefing schedule. The Court will hold a motions hearing on January 31, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/22/2017. (lccrc1)
November 21, 2017 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order and Stipulation Regarding Use of Discovery by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO, CLC (Sellers, Joseph)
November 9, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2017. (lsj)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court directs Plaintiffs to file any opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before November 29, 2017. Defendants' reply is due 14 days after Plaintiffs file their opposition. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/9/2017. (lccrc3)
November 8, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Certified Index of Administrative Record, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bailey, Kate) Modified event title on 11/9/2017 (znmw).
November 3, 2017 Filing 14 REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION for Scheduling Order MOTION for Hearing filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO, CLC. (Sellers, Joseph)
October 30, 2017 Filing 13 RESPONSE re 9 MOTION for Scheduling Order MOTION for Hearing filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Bailey, Kate)
October 30, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Bailey on behalf of All Defendants (Bailey, Kate)
October 26, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Lynn Westmoreland on behalf of All Defendants (Westmoreland, Rachael)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before October 30, 2017, Defendants shall respond to 9 Plaintiffs' Motion for Status Conference and Adoption of Case Management Order. That response shall include Defendants' positions on the statements made in Plaintiffs' Rule 26(f) report, which is attached to Plaintiffs' motion. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/26/2017. (lccrc1)
October 24, 2017 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO, CLC.(znmw)
October 24, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for Scheduling Order by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - N.D. Cal. Scheduling Order, # 3 Exhibit B - E.D.N.Y. Scheduling Order, # 4 Exhibit C - D. Md. Status Conference Order, # 5 Exhibit D - McNamara Email, # 6 Exhibit E - Beckenhauser Email, # 7 Exhibit F - N.D. Cal. Hearing Transcript)(Sellers, Joseph). Added MOTION for Hearing on 10/25/2017 (znmw).
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff NAACP's 8 Consent Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/24/2017. (lccrc1)
October 23, 2017 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Sellers, Joseph)
September 25, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas James McNamara on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE (McNamara, Douglas)
September 20, 2017 Filing 6 SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA/U.S. Attorney. (znmw)
September 20, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, and U.S. Attorney General (znmw)
September 19, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Horwitz on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE (Horwitz, Julia)
September 19, 2017 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE 1) Donald Trump; 2) Jefferson Sessions; 3) Elaine Duke; 4) US Citizenship and Immigration Services; 5) US Immigration and Customs Enforcement; 6) Department of Homeland Security; and 7) US Attorneys Office re 1 Complaint, filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE.(Sellers, Joseph)
September 19, 2017 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, non party U.S. Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md)
September 19, 2017 SUMMONS (6) Not Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (SUMMONS WERE NOT SUBMITTED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED) (md)
September 18, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by NAACP against DONALD TRUMP, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS III, ELAINE C. DUKE, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5120614) filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorneys Office)(Sellers, Joseph)
September 18, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (md)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE
Represented By: Julia Horwitz
Represented By: Douglas James McNamara
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAINE C. DUKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?