ATCHLEY et al v. ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: AMY RITCHIE, BRENDA CHAND, JEAN DAMMANN, BRANDEAUX CAMPBELL, ANTHONY CAPRA, SR., KARA CONNELLY, S. C., BILLY JOHNSON, EMILY CAPRA, JOSHUA ATCHLEY, MARK CAPRA, ELISSA ATCHLEY, MICHAEL ADAM EMORY, KATHY KUGLER, JOANNA CAPRA, A. C., SHARON CAPRA, EUGENE DELOZIER, DEMPSEY BENNETT, JACOB HARBIN, ELIJAH HARBIN, J. C., RYAN CHAND, JACOB CAPRA, SARAH JOHNSON, ESTHER TATE, BOBBY EMORY, MICHAEL CHAND, JR., ROBERT KUGLER, BRIAN BEAUMONT, TANYA EVRARD, ANGIE CAPRA, VICTORIA CAPRA, BRIDGET JUNEAU, RACHEL LEE, JULIA-ANNE CAPRA, MARIA DE LA LUZ VILLA, MARK DAMMANN, JOHN ARAGON, SR., JOSEPH CAPRA, DANIELLE CAPRA, DONIELLE EDWARDS, LEASA DOLLAR, KEVIN CONNELLY, DREW EDWARDS, MICHAEL CAPRA, SALLY CHAND, JIMMY CONNOLLY, MELISSA DOHENY, CHISTINA MAHON, GARY HUFFMAN, KAREN HUFFMAN, ALL PLAINTIFFS, ESTATE OF JASON HUFFMAN, LORI SILVERI and TORIE MURPHY
Defendant: JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, ETHICON, INC., GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC, PFIZER INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, GE HEALTHCARE USA HOLDING LLC, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC., PFIZER ENTERPRISES SARL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, GENENTECH, INC., ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC., CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. and JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V.
Case Number: 1:2017cv02136
Filed: October 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 18:2331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on February 4, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-20. Date of Issuance: March 6, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from t he court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2019.(wz)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No re #108 Transcript was entered in error and will be refiled with correct transcript attached.(jf)
February 28, 2019 Filing 108 ENTERED IN ERROR.....TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on February 4, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-20. Date of Issuance: February 28, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/31/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2019.(wz) Modified on 3/6/2019 (zjf).
February 11, 2019 Filing 107 SEALED DOCUMENT (Notice) filed by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD., GE HEALTHCARE USA HOLDING LLC, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC., GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC, PFIZER ENTERPRISES SARL, PFIZER INC., PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(znmw)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of defendants' #71 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to maintain under seal defendants' Sealed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal [Dkt. # 71] and to file under seal the Notice attached to defendants' motion [Dkt. # 71-1]. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/11/2019. (lcrjl2)
February 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Updated Dispositive Motions due by 4/4/2019 any responses thereto are due 30 days thereafter. (jth)
February 4, 2019 Filing 106 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(jf)
February 4, 2019 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 2/4/2019 before Judge Richard J. Leon: It is hereby ordered that plaintiffs' #100 Motion For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant's #63 #64 #70 and #72 Motions to Dismiss are hereby DENIED without prejudice to refiling updated motions. Updated motions are due by 4/4/19 and any responses are due 30 days thereafter. Page limit on new motions filed shall remain the same as indicated in the Court's previous order. (Court Reporter William Zaremba) (tb) Modified on 2/6/2019 (jth).
January 31, 2019 Filing 105 REPLY to opposition to motion re #100 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, David)
January 30, 2019 Filing 104 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Frederick, David)
January 30, 2019 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on December 19, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-30. Date of Issuance: January 30, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased fr om the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2019.(wz)
January 25, 2019 Filing 102 RESPONSE re #100 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint filed by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD., GE HEALTHCARE USA HOLDING LLC, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC., GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC, PFIZER ENTERPRISES SARL, PFIZER INC., PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (MacBride, Neil)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' joint #101 Motion Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint and Scheduling of Status Conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and defendants shall respond to plaintiffs' #100 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint on or before January 25, 2019. It is further ORDERED that a status conference is set for February 4, 2019, at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/16/2019. (lcrjl2)
January 10, 2019 Filing 101 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #100 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Stipulation Regarding Scheduling of Status Conference by PFIZER ENTERPRISES SARL, PFIZER INC., PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Manning, Christopher)
December 31, 2018 Filing 100 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Frederick, David)
December 31, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Lori Silveri . This has no effect on the claims asserted by the other Plaintiffs. (Frederick, David)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties #96 Joint Motion regarding Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the #96 Motion is GRANTED. 1) Plaintiffs' pending "Time-Sensitive Motion for Leave to Add Additional Plaintiffs by December 31, 2018" (Dkt. 95) is hereby withdrawn. 2) On or before December 31, 2018, Plaintiffs may file a new Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint to add new plaintiffs accompanied by a concurrently filed proposed Second Amended Complaint that includes the new plaintiffs' names and factual allegations following the general form set forth in Dkt. 95-1. (SEE THE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS). Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/20/2018. (jth)
December 20, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Duffy on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (Duffy, Matthew)
December 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 12/19/2018. The parties shall meet, confer and contact chambers with proposed dates for another status conference to be held in early February, 2019. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
December 18, 2018 Filing 96 Joint MOTION Order Regarding Proposed Second Amended Complaint re #95 MOTION for Leave to File . Plaintiffs' Time-Sensitive Motion for Leave to Add Additional Plaintiffs by December 31, 2018 Stipulation and Joint Motion Regarding Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint, Joint MOTION to Withdraw #95 MOTION for Leave to File . Plaintiffs' Time-Sensitive Motion for Leave to Add Additional Plaintiffs by December 31, 2018 by PFIZER ENTERPRISES SARL, PFIZER INC., PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manning, Christopher)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. A status conference is hereby set for 12/19/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/6/18. (lcrjl3)
December 4, 2018 Filing 95 WITHDRAWN PURUANT TO ORDER FILED 12/21/18.....MOTION for Leave to File . Plaintiffs' Time-Sensitive Motion for Leave to Add Additional Plaintiffs by December 31, 2018 by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, David) Modified on 12/21/2018 to reflect that the motion has been withdrawn. (jth)
October 31, 2018 Filing 94 RESPONSE re #92 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed on behalf of all defendants filed by CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC. (Johnson, Jeh)
October 26, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Gary Huffman, Karen Huffman, Torie Murphy, Estate of Jason Huffman . This has no effect on the claims asserted by the other Plaintiffs. (Frederick, David)
October 23, 2018 Filing 92 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Frederick, David)
September 18, 2018 Filing 91 RESPONSE re #90 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY, filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Frederick, David)
September 12, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Brill v Chevron Corp., #2 Exhibit 2 -- Gonzalez v Google Inc)(Johnson, Jeh)
September 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of #88 and #89 Motions to Withdraw the Appearances of G. Derek Anderson and Nicholas O. Hunter as Counsel for All Plaintiffs, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED. The clerk shall reflect the termination of attorneys G. Derek Andreson and Nicholas O. Hunter on the docket. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/2/18. (lcrjl3)
August 30, 2018 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re Nicholas O. Hunter by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunter, Nicholas)
August 28, 2018 Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re G. Derek Andreson by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparacino, Ryan)
August 22, 2018 Filing 87 RESPONSE re #86 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed on behalf of all defendants filed by CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC. (Johnson, Jeh)
August 15, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Frederick, David)
August 9, 2018 Filing 85 RESPONSE re #82 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC.. (Carome, Patrick)
August 9, 2018 Filing 84 REPLY to opposition to motion re #72 MOTION to Dismiss , #70 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC.. (Carome, Patrick)
August 9, 2018 Filing 83 REPLY to opposition to motion re #70 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD., GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., PFIZER ENTERPRISES SARL. (MacBride, Neil)
August 3, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Frederick, David)
August 1, 2018 Filing 81 RESPONSE re #80 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed on behalf of all defendants filed by GE HEALTHCARE USA HOLDING LLC, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Bellinger, John)
July 27, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kaplan v. Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran)(Frederick, David)
July 27, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #79 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading as proper pleading. (Counsel should review LCvR 5.1 (a) CORRESPONDENCE WITH THE COURT) (jf)
July 26, 2018 Filing 79 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kaplan v. Central Bank of the Islamic Republic of Iran)(Frederick, David) Modified on 7/27/2018 (zjf).
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of #74 Motion to Stay Discovery, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and discovery is STAYED pending the Court's ruling on defendants' motions to dismiss. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/9/2018. (lcrjl3)
July 3, 2018 Filing 78 REPLY to opposition to motion re #74 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed on behalf of all defendants filed by CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC. (Johnson, Jeh)
June 26, 2018 Filing 77 RESPONSE re #74 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, David)
June 25, 2018 Filing 76 RESPONSE re #72 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, David)
June 25, 2018 Filing 75 RESPONSE re #70 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, David)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of #73 Joint Meet and Confer Statement, is it hereby ORDERED that, in the event one or more of plaintiffs' claims survives the motions to dismiss, within 30 days of the Court's ruling the parties shall submit a supplemental Joint Meet and Confer Statement and scheduling order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/22/2018. (lcrjl3)
June 12, 2018 Filing 74 MOTION to Stay Discovery by CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jeh)
June 12, 2018 Filing 73 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order / [Proposed] Scheduling Order)(Johnson, Jeh)
April 26, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss by GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 84, #85 Exhibit 85, #86 Exhibit 86, #87 Exhibit 87, #88 Exhibit 88, #89 Exhibit 89, #90 Exhibit 90, #91 Exhibit 91, #92 Exhibit 92, #93 Exhibit 93, #94 Exhibit 94, #95 Exhibit 95, #96 Text of Proposed Order)(Nichols, Carl)
April 26, 2018 Filing 71 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD., GE HEALTHCARE USA HOLDING LLC, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC., GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC, PFIZER ENTERPRISES SARL, PFIZER INC., PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Zionts, David)
April 26, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss by ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD., GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., PFIZER ENTERPRISES SARL (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of John F. Baughman, #3 Declaration of David M. Zionts, #4 Declaration of Christopher N. Manning, #5 Declaration of Paul S. Mishkin, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(MacBride, Neil)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #69 Motion for Extension of Time to Brief Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on Rule 12(b) grounds other than personal jurisdiction is due by 4/26/2018. That motion shall not exceed 90 pages. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2) is also due by 4/26/2018. That motion shall not exceed 25 pages. Plaintiffs' Memoranda in Opposition are due by 6/25/2018. Plaintiffs' memorandum in opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on Rule 12(b) ground other than personal jurisdiction shall not exceed 90 pages. Plaintiffs' memorandum in opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2) shall not exceed 25 pages. Defendants' Reply Memoranda are due by 8/9/2018. Defendants' reply memorandum in support of its motion to dismiss on Rule 12(b) grounds other than personal jurisdiction shall not exceed 45 pages. Defendants' reply memorandum in support of its motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2) shall not exceed 12 pages. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/26/18.(lcrjl3)
March 22, 2018 Filing 69 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Proposed Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss Briefing filed on behalf of all parties by CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baughman, John)
March 12, 2018 Filing 68 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Frederick, David)
March 12, 2018 Filing 67 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Frederick, David)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time. Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 3/12/2018. It is hereby ORDERED that, upon the filling of a First Amended Complaint, the parties will meet-and-confer in good faith to set a proposed schedule for Defendants to move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint. To the extent Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint asserts claims on behalf of new Plaintiffs, Plaintiffs may comply with Local Rule 5.1(c) by filing under seal a list containing the names and full residential addresses of all new Plaintiffs. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Civil Rule 16.3 within 30 days of Defendants filing their motions to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Within fourteen days of that meeting, counsel shall submit the materials required by page 2 of the Court's November 14, 2017 Case Management Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/12/18. (lcrjl3)
March 5, 2018 Filing 66 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Other Deadlines (Re-Filing Dkt. No. 65) by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Branson, Joshua)
February 14, 2018 Filing 65 STIPULATION and Joint Motion Regarding A First Amended Complaint and Other Deadlines by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Branson, Joshua)
February 5, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss by GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Text of Proposed Order)(Nichols, Carl)
February 5, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss by ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD., GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., PFIZER ENTERPRISES SARL (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of John F. Baughman, #3 Declaration of David M. Zionts, #4 Declaration of Christopher N. Manning, #5 Declaration of Paul S. Mishkin, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(MacBride, Neil)
February 5, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Adam DeRise on behalf of GE HEALTHCARE USA HOLDING LLC, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (DeRise, Robert)
February 5, 2018 Filing 61 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GE HEALTHCARE USA HOLDING LLC, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Bellinger, John)
February 5, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Reeves Anderson on behalf of GE HEALTHCARE USA HOLDING LLC, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Anderson, Robert)
February 5, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Weiner on behalf of GE HEALTHCARE USA HOLDING LLC, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Weiner, David)
February 5, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Susan Brinkmann on behalf of F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD. (Brinkmann, Beth)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties Stipulation and Joint Motion Regarding Motion to Dismiss Briefing #57 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants are permitted file a joint memorandum of points and authorities, not to exceed 75 pages, to address Rule 12(b) grounds other than personal jurisdiction. Plaintiffs memorandum in opposition shall not exceed 75 pages, and Defendants reply memorandum shall not exceed 35 pages. Defendants are permitted to file an additional joint memorandum of points and authorities, not to exceed 25 pages, in support of dismissal for lack of personal jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(2). Plaintiffs memorandum in opposition also shall not exceed 25 pages, and the Defendants reply memorandum shall not exceed 12 pages. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/2/18. (lcrjl3)
January 30, 2018 Filing 57 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and to permit the filing of consolidated memoranda as described herein in connection with forthcoming motion to dismiss briefing, filed on behalf of all Parties by PFIZER ENTERPRISES SARL, PFIZER INC., PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Manning, Christopher)
December 20, 2017 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT of Service on F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd. by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Branson, Joshua)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd's response to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 2/5/2018. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/11/17. (lcrjl3)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #52 Motion for Leave for Paul S. Mishkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/11/17. (lcrjl3)
December 11, 2017 Filing 55 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD.. Attorney Lanny A. Breuer terminated. (Breuer, Lanny)
December 5, 2017 Filing 54 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zionts, David)
November 30, 2017 Filing 53 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED (MacBride, Neil)
November 30, 2017 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul S. Mishkin, :Firm- Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP, :Address- 450 Lexington Avenue, New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - 212-450-4000. Fax No. - 212-701-5292 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5227821. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul S. Mishkin, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MacBride, Neil)
November 30, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Leonard Wainstein on behalf of ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED (Wainstein, Kenneth)
November 30, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Harvey MacBride on behalf of ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED (MacBride, Neil)
November 28, 2017 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE by ALL PLAINTIFFS. GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH waiver sent on 11/14/2017, answer due 2/12/2018; PFIZER ENTERPRISES SARL waiver sent on 11/14/2017, answer due 2/12/2018. (Branson, Joshua)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Serve Defendant F. Hoffmann-La Roche LTD. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3). Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/28/17. (lcrjl3)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/22/2017. (lcrjl2) Modified on 11/25/2017 to reflect that this is a "Minute" Order. (jth)
November 22, 2017 Filing 48 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Amended) by HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. (Nichols, Carl)
November 22, 2017 Filing 47 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Amended) by GENENTECH, INC. (Nichols, Carl)
November 22, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Bowker on behalf of GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. (Bowker, David)
November 22, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Joseph Carome on behalf of GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. (Carome, Patrick)
November 21, 2017 Filing 44 REPLY to opposition to motion re #33 MOTION for Leave to Serve Defendant F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, David)
November 20, 2017 Filing 43 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Frederick, David)
November 20, 2017 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE by ALL PLAINTIFFS. ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED waiver sent on 11/14/2017, answer due 2/12/2018; CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL waiver sent on 11/14/2017, answer due 2/12/2018; JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. waiver sent on 11/14/2017, answer due 2/12/2018. (Branson, Joshua)
November 16, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeh C. Johnson, :Firm- Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, :Address- 2001 K Street, NW, Washington, DC, 20006-1047. Phone No. - (202) 223-7300. Fax No. - (202) 223-7420 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5209488. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeh C. Johnson, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex)
November 16, 2017 Filing 40 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC (Oh, Alex)
November 16, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Young K. Oh on behalf of CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC (Oh, Alex)
November 16, 2017 Filing 38 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD. (Zionts, David)
November 16, 2017 Filing 37 Memorandum in opposition to re #33 MOTION for Leave to Serve Defendant F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) filed by F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of D. Zionts, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Zionts, David)
November 16, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Zionts on behalf of F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD. (Zionts, David)
November 16, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Lanny A. Breuer on behalf of F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD. (Breuer, Lanny)
November 16, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by John Edward Hall on behalf of F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD. (Hall, John)
November 14, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Serve Defendant F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Branson, Joshua)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/14/2017. (lcrjl2)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #31 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time for Moving Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The Moving Defendants shall have up to and including February 5, 2018, to respond to plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/14/2017. (lcrjl2)
November 14, 2017 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC (Oh, Alex)
November 14, 2017 Filing 30 STIPULATION by CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC. (Oh, Alex)
November 14, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Nicholas Manning on behalf of PFIZER ENTERPRISES SARL, PFIZER INC., PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Manning, Christopher)
November 9, 2017 Filing 28 REPLY to opposition to motion re #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on behalf of all Served Defendants (On behalf of all Served Defendants) filed by GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC.. (Nichols, Carl)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Attorney John F. Baughman is admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/09/2017. (lcrjl2)
November 8, 2017 Filing 27 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC (Oh, Alex)
November 8, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Young K. Oh on behalf of ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC (Oh, Alex)
November 7, 2017 Filing 25 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP (MacBride, Neil)
November 7, 2017 Filing 24 Memorandum in opposition to re #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on behalf of all Served Defendants filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Frederick, David)
November 7, 2017 Filing 23 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests as Amended by PFIZER INC., PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Petrosinelli, Joseph)
November 7, 2017 Filing 22 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GE HEALTHCARE USA HOLDING LLC, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Bellinger, John)
November 7, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Bellinger, III on behalf of GE HEALTHCARE USA HOLDING LLC, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Bellinger, John)
November 7, 2017 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP served on 10/23/2017, answer due 11/13/2017; ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC served on 10/23/2017, answer due 11/13/2017; ETHICON, INC. served on 10/20/2017, answer due 11/10/2017; GE HEALTHCARE USA HOLDING LLC served on 10/23/2017, answer due 11/13/2017; GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC. served on 10/20/2017, answer due 11/10/2017; GENENTECH, INC. served on 10/20/2017, answer due 11/10/2017; HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. served on 10/20/2017, answer due 11/10/2017; JANSSEN ORTHO LLC served on 10/23/2017, answer due 11/13/2017; JOHNSON & JOHNSON served on 10/20/2017, answer due 11/10/2017; JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC. served on 10/20/2017, answer due 11/10/2017; ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC served on 10/23/2017, answer due 11/13/2017; PFIZER INC. served on 10/23/2017, answer due 11/13/2017; PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC served on 10/23/2017, answer due 11/13/2017; PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC served on 10/23/2017, answer due 11/13/2017; WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC. served on 10/23/2017, answer due 11/13/2017 (Branson, Joshua)
November 6, 2017 Filing 19 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FILED ON 11/14/2017.....MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on behalf of all Served Defendants by ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex) Modified on 11/15/2017 (jth).
November 6, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Harvey MacBride on behalf of ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP (MacBride, Neil)
November 6, 2017 Filing 17 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PFIZER INC., PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Petrosinelli, Joseph)
November 6, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G Petrosinelli on behalf of PFIZER INC., PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Petrosinelli, Joseph)
November 6, 2017 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENENTECH, INC.. (Nichols, Carl)
November 6, 2017 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC.. (Nichols, Carl)
November 6, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Nichols on behalf of GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC. (Nichols, Carl)
November 6, 2017 Filing 12 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC (Oh, Alex)
November 6, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John F. Baughman, :Firm- Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP, :Address- 1285 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - 212-373-3000. Fax No. - 212-757-3990 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5192319. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Baughman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Oh, Alex)
November 6, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Young K. Oh on behalf of ETHICON, INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC (Oh, Alex)
October 25, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan R. Sparacino on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sparacino, Ryan)
October 25, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Derek Andreson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Andreson, G.)
October 24, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Graham Schultz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schultz, Thomas)
October 24, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas O. Hunter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hunter, Nicholas)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Waiver of Local Civil Rule 5.1(c). It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that: (1) plaintiffs are excused from publicly filing their residence address information with their complaint in accordance with Local Civil Rule 5.1(c); and (2) plaintiffs shall file under seal a list containing the names and full residential addresses of all plaintiffs within 30 days of this Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/23/2017. (lcrjl2)
October 19, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS (21) Issued Electronically as to ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL, ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC, ETHICON, INC., F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD., GE HEALTHCARE USA HOLDING LLC, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC., GENENTECH, INC., HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC., JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC., ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC, PFIZER ENTERPRISES SARL, PFIZER INC., PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (md)
October 18, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (md)
October 18, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Edward Goldsmith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Goldsmith, Andrew)
October 17, 2017 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION Waiver of Local Civil Rule 5.1(c) by JOHN ARAGON, SR, ELISSA ATCHLEY, JOSHUA ATCHLEY, BRIAN BEAUMONT, DEMPSEY BENNETT, A. C., J. C., S. C., BRANDEAUX CAMPBELL, ANGIE CAPRA, ANTHONY CAPRA, SR, DANIELLE CAPRA, EMILY CAPRA, JACOB CAPRA, JOANNA CAPRA, JOSEPH CAPRA, JULIA-ANNE CAPRA, MARK CAPRA, MICHAEL CAPRA, SHARON CAPRA, VICTORIA CAPRA, BRENDA CHAND, MICHAEL CHAND, JR, RYAN CHAND, SALLY CHAND, KARA CONNELLY, KEVIN CONNELLY, JIMMY CONNOLLY, JEAN DAMMANN, MARK DAMMANN, MARIA DE LA LUZ VILLA, EUGENE DELOZIER, MELISSA DOHENY, LEASA DOLLAR, DONIELLE EDWARDS, DREW EDWARDS, BOBBY EMORY, MICHAEL ADAM EMORY, TANYA EVRARD, ELIJAH HARBIN, JACOB HARBIN, BILLY JOHNSON, SARAH JOHNSON, BRIDGET JUNEAU, KATHY KUGLER, ROBERT KUGLER, RACHEL LEE, CHISTINA MAHON, AMY RITCHIE, ESTHER TATE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frederick, David)
October 17, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Daniel Branson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Branson, Joshua)
October 17, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5162217) filed by JIMMY CONNOLLY, KEVIN CONNELLY, MICHAEL CAPRA, ANGIE CAPRA, CHISTINA MAHON, JOANNA CAPRA, EMILY CAPRA, JACOB HARBIN, RYAN CHAND, JULIA-ANNE CAPRA, MARK CAPRA, MARK DAMMANN, KATHY KUGLER, VICTORIA CAPRA, EUGENE DELOZIER, KARA CONNELLY, BRIDGET JUNEAU, DONIELLE EDWARDS, A. C., MARIA DE LA LUZ VILLA, DANIELLE CAPRA, ELIJAH HARBIN, JOSEPH CAPRA, ELISSA ATCHLEY, JACOB CAPRA, JOSHUA ATCHLEY, JEAN DAMMANN, MICHAEL CHAND, JR, BRENDA CHAND, MICHAEL ADAM EMORY, S. C., BILLY JOHNSON, SALLY CHAND, BOBBY EMORY, RACHEL LEE, ESTHER TATE, J. C., SARAH JOHNSON, BRANDEAUX CAMPBELL, JOHN ARAGON, SR, ROBERT KUGLER, SHARON CAPRA, LEASA DOLLAR, ANTHONY CAPRA, SR, DREW EDWARDS, BRIAN BEAUMONT, MELISSA DOHENY, AMY RITCHIE, TANYA EVRARD, DEMPSEY BENNETT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons AstraZeneca UK Limited, #3 Summons AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, #4 Summons Cilag GmbH International, #5 Summons Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC, #6 Summons Ethicon, Inc., #7 Summons F. Hoffmann-La Roche Ltd., #8 Summons GE Healthcare USA Holding LLC, #9 Summons GE Medical Systems Information Technologies GmbH, #10 Summons GE Medical Systems Information Technologies, Inc., #11 Summons Genentech, Inc., #12 Summons Hoffmann-La Roche Inc., #13 Summons Johnson & Johnson (Middle East) Inc., #14 Summons Janssen Ortho LLC, #15 Summons Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., #16 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #17 Summons Ortho Biologics LLC, #18 Summons Pfizer Enterprises SARL, #19 Summons Pfizer Inc., #20 Summons Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, #21 Summons Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC, #22 Summons Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc.)(Frederick, David) Modified on 10/19/2017 (md).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATCHLEY et al v. ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY RITCHIE
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA CHAND
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN DAMMANN
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDEAUX CAMPBELL
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY CAPRA, SR.
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARA CONNELLY
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. C.
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY JOHNSON
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMILY CAPRA
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA ATCHLEY
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK CAPRA
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELISSA ATCHLEY
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ADAM EMORY
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY KUGLER
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNA CAPRA
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. C.
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON CAPRA
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE DELOZIER
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMPSEY BENNETT
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB HARBIN
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIJAH HARBIN
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. C.
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN CHAND
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB CAPRA
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH JOHNSON
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTHER TATE
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOBBY EMORY
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CHAND, JR.
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT KUGLER
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN BEAUMONT
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANYA EVRARD
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGIE CAPRA
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA CAPRA
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIDGET JUNEAU
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL LEE
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA-ANNE CAPRA
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA DE LA LUZ VILLA
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK DAMMANN
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN ARAGON, SR.
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH CAPRA
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE CAPRA
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONIELLE EDWARDS
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEASA DOLLAR
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN CONNELLY
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DREW EDWARDS
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CAPRA
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALLY CHAND
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY CONNOLLY
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA DOHENY
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHISTINA MAHON
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY HUFFMAN
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN HUFFMAN
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Represented By: Nicholas O. Hunter
Represented By: G. Derek Andreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JASON HUFFMAN
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI SILVERI
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Matthew M. Duffy
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TORIE MURPHY
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Branson
Represented By: Ryan R. Sparacino
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: David Charles Frederick
Represented By: Thomas Graham Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN ORTHO LLC
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Alex Young K. Oh
Represented By: John F. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Represented By: Christopher Nicholas Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHICON, INC.
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Alex Young K. Oh
Represented By: John F. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES GMBH
Represented By: John B. Bellinger, III
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Represented By: Robert Adam DeRise
Represented By: David J. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
Represented By: Kenneth Leonard Wainstein
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin
Represented By: Neil Harvey MacBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON (MIDDLE EAST) INC.
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Alex Young K. Oh
Represented By: John F. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO BIOLOGICS LLC
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Alex Young K. Oh
Represented By: John F. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER INC.
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Represented By: Christopher Nicholas Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Alex Young K. Oh
Represented By: John F. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE HEALTHCARE USA HOLDING LLC
Represented By: John B. Bellinger, III
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Represented By: Robert Adam DeRise
Represented By: David J. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE MEDICAL SYSTEMS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: John B. Bellinger, III
Represented By: Robert Reeves Anderson
Represented By: Robert Adam DeRise
Represented By: David J. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER ENTERPRISES SARL
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Represented By: Christopher Nicholas Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, LLC
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Alex Young K. Oh
Represented By: John F. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENENTECH, INC.
Represented By: Carl J. Nichols
Represented By: David W. Bowker
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Carome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED
Represented By: Kenneth Leonard Wainstein
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin
Represented By: Neil Harvey MacBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Represented By: Christopher Nicholas Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: Joseph G Petrosinelli
Represented By: Christopher Nicholas Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CILAG GMBH INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Alex Young K. Oh
Represented By: John F. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE LTD.
Represented By: John Edward Hall
Represented By: David M. Zionts
Represented By: Beth Susan Brinkmann
Represented By: Lanny A. Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC.
Represented By: Carl J. Nichols
Represented By: David W. Bowker
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Carome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V.
Represented By: Jeh Charles Johnson
Represented By: Alex Young K. Oh
Represented By: John F. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?