TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al Featured Case

A lawsuit that alleges President Donald Trump’s attempt to end the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals (DACA) program violates the Constitution and federal law.

Plaintiff: MICROSOFT CORPORATION, THE TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO, CLC and NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE
Defendant: DUKE C. ELAINE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ELAINE C. DUKE, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Petitioner: SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, BAR ASSOCIATION OF SAN FRANCISCO, CUNY DREAMERS, HISPANIC FEDERATION, INC., HISPANIC NATIONAL BAR ASSOCIATION, ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, 28 ADDITIONAL CITIES AND COUNTIES, PUBLIC COUNSEL, UNIDOSUS, ARAB AMERICAN INSTITUTE, LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR JUSTICE, ADVOCATES FOR YOUTH, PRESENTE.ORG, ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE-ASIAN LAW CAUCUS, LATINOJUSTICE PRLDEF, LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS, RU DREAMERS, ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE, LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND ECONOMIC JUSTICE, ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE, UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS, NEW YORK STATE YOUTH LEADERSHIP COUNCIL, NATIONAL LEAGUE OF CITIES and HISPANIC ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Amicus Curiae: CAPITAL COMMUNITY COLLEGE, HAMPSHIRE COLLEGE, MASSACHUSETTS LAW REFORM INSTITUTE (MLRI), ROCKY MOUNTAIN IMMIGRANT ADVOCACY NETWORK, UNIVERSITY OF CONNECTICUT, HARVARD UNIVERSITY, CENTRO LEGAL DE LA RAZA, DUKE UNIVERSITY, MOUNT HOLYOKE COLLEGE, CORNELL UNIVERSITY, BUCKNELL UNIVERSITY, LEGAL SERVICES FOR CHILDREN (LSC), DOLORES STREET COMMUNITY SERVICES, SMITH COLLEGE, EMERSON COLLEGE, NORTHWESTERN COMMUNITY COLLEGE, CHILDREN'S LAW CENTER OF MASSACHUSETTS, NORTHWEST IMMIGRANT RIGHTS PROJECT, MANCHESTER COMMUNITY COLLEGE, CHARTER OAK STATE COLLEGE, NATIONAL JUSTICE FOR OUR NEIGHBORS, VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY, NAUGATUCK VALLEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE, BOWDOIN COLLEGE, LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY, GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY, AMHERST COLLEGE, YALE UNIVERSITY, UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, CANAL ALLIANCE, SERVICES, IMMIGRANT RIGHTS, AND EDUCATION NETWORK (SIREN), SOUTHERN CONNECTICUT STATE UNIVERSITY, UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND, COLLEGE PARK, IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE, MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, LEGAL AID SOCIETY OF SAN MATEO COUNTY, CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, LEGAL AID JUSTICE CENTER, ASIAN LAW ALLIANCE, GATEWAY COMMUNITY COLLEGE, JUST NEIGHBORS, WELLESLEY COLLEGE, CENTRAL CONNECTICUT STATE UNIVERSITY, WESTERN CONNECTICUT STATE UNIVERSITY, TUNXIS COMMUNITY COLLEGE, HOUSATONIC COMMUNITY COLLEGE, STANFORD UNIVERSITY, 112 COMPANIES, MIDDLESEX COMMUNITY COLLEGE, COMMUNITY LEGAL SERVICES IN EAST PALO (CLSEPA), TUFTS UNIVERSITY, NEW YORK LEGAL ASSISTANCE GROUP, SQUARE, INC., UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO, COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY, EMORY UNIVERSITY, DARTMOUTH COLLEGE, QUINEBAUG VALLEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE, NORTHWESTERN UNIVERSITY, UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, IMMIGRANT LEGAL RESOURCE CENTER (ILRC), BRANDEIS UNIVERSITY, HEBREW IMMIGRANT AID SOCIETY (HIAS) PENNSYLVANIA, ONEJUSTICE, YELP, INC., GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, WORCESTER POLYTECHNIC INSTITUTE, HEARTLAND ALLIANCE'S NATIONAL IMMIGRANT JUSTICE CENTER (NIJC), THREE RIVERS COMMUNITY COLLEGE, CURRENT AND FORMER LAW ENFORCEMENT LEADERS, WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY IN ST. LOUIS, ASNUNTUCK COMMUNITY COLLEGE, COLBY COLLEGE, RICE UNIVERSITY, BROOKLYN DEFENDER SERVICES, BROWN UNIVERSITY, LOS RIOS COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY, AIRBNB, INC., NORWALK COMMUNITY COLLEGE, EASTERN CONNECTICUT STATE UNIVERSITY, TWITTER, INC., CASE WESTERN RESERVE UNIVERSITY, EAST BAY SANCTUARY COVENANT, WILLIAMS COLLEGE, JUSTICE CENTER OF SOUTHEAST MASSACHUSETTS, SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT and CARNEGIE MELLON UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2017cv02325
Filed: November 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/17/2018. (lcjdb1)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #81 the government's motion to clarify and granting in part and denying in part #82 the government's motion to stay. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/17/2018. (lcjdb1)
August 16, 2018 Filing 84 REPLY to opposition to motion re #82 MOTION to Stay re #77 Order on Motion for Order, #69 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(17-cv-1902), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Davis, Kathryn)
August 15, 2018 Filing 83 RESPONSE re #82 MOTION to Stay re #77 Order on Motion for Order, #69 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, filed by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perrelli, Thomas)
August 14, 2018 Filing 82 MOTION to Stay re #77 Order on Motion for Order, #69 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Pending Appeal by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(17-cv-1902), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Renaud Decl., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn)
August 14, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION to Clarify Regarding Entry of Final Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(17-cv-1902), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn)
August 13, 2018 USCA Case Number 18-5245 for #79 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,,, filed by JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE. (zrdj)
August 7, 2018 Filing 80 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re #79 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zrdj)
August 6, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #78 Memorandum & Opinion, #77 Order on Motion for Order, #70 Memorandum & Opinion, #69 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, by ELAINE C. DUKE, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(17-cv-1902), U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, ELAINE C. DUKE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Davis, Kathryn)
August 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: The stay of the Court's 4/24/2018 Order vacating the DHS's 9/5/2017 decision rescinding the DACA program is continued until 8/23/2018. Defendants shall file by 8/23/2018 any motion seeking a further stay of the Court's Order pending appeal. (jth)
August 3, 2018 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/3/2018. (lcjdb1)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying #74 defendants' motion to revise #69 the Court's April 24, 2018 Order. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/3/2018. (lcjdb1)
July 27, 2018 Filing 76 REPLY to opposition to motion re #74 MOTION for Order Revising the Court's April 24, 2018 Order filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(17-cv-1902), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Davis, Kathryn)
July 23, 2018 Filing 75 Memorandum in opposition to re #74 MOTION for Order Revising the Court's April 24, 2018 Order filed by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. (Perrelli, Thomas)
July 11, 2018 Filing 74 MOTION for Order Revising the Court's April 24, 2018 Order by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(17-cv-1902), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn)
July 11, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Pezzi on behalf of All Defendants (Pezzi, Stephen)
June 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to revive Order #69 is due by 7/11/2018. Responses due by 7/23/2018. Reply due by 7/27/2018. (tb)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 SCHEDULING ORDER. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/27/2018. (lcjdb1)
June 22, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Filing by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(17-cv-1902), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum)(Davis, Kathryn)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/24/2018. (lcjdb1) (Main Document 70 replaced on 4/26/2018) (ztd).
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and deferring in part #8 defendants' motion to dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #28 plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment; and disposing of the remaining motions pending in this case. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/24/2018. (lcjdb1)
March 30, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Motion to Withdraw as Counsel - Janine M. Lopez) by AIRBNB, INC., SQUARE, INC., TWITTER, INC., YELP, INC. (Holtzblatt, Ari)
March 23, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(17-cv-1902), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Memorandum Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Joint Status Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - Defendants' Notice)(Davis, Kathryn)
March 19, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BROWN UNIVERSITY, CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY, CORNELL UNIVERSITY, DARTMOUTH COLLEGE, DUKE UNIVERSITY, EMORY UNIVERSITY, GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY, HARVARD UNIVERSITY, MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, NORTHWESTERN UNIVERSITY, STANFORD UNIVERSITY, UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY, WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY IN ST. LOUIS, YALE UNIVERSITY, UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO. Attorney Danielle C. Gray terminated. (Hacker, Jonathan)
March 15, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Clarification by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Davis, Kathryn)
March 15, 2018 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT OF 3/14/18 MOTIONS HEARING before Judge John D. Bates held on March 14, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-95. Date of Issuance: March 15, 2018. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2018.(Wayne, Bryan)
March 14, 2018 Minute Entry: Motions Hearing held on 3/14/2018 before Judge John D. Bates re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ELAINE C. DUKE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, MICROSOFT CORPORATION. Motions heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb)
March 7, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiffs' consent request to change the time of the hearing currently set for Wednesday, March 14, 2018, at 9:30 a.m., and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the hearing shall take place on that date at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/6/2018. (lcjdb1) Modified on 3/7/2018 (tb).
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that at the hearing on the motions to dismiss and for summary judgment pending in these cases, which is currently set for Wednesday, March 14, at 9:30 a.m., plaintiffs and defendants shall each be allowed 45 minutes for oral argument. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs' counsel shall determine how to divide their argument time among themselves. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/6/2018. (lcjdb1)
March 6, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Brinton Lucas on behalf of All Defendants (Lucas, Gerald)
March 5, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing reset for 3/14/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #62 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions hearing tentatively set for Wednesday, March 14, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. is confirmed for that date and time; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall update the Court's public calendar to reflect the 9:30 a.m. hearing time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/5/2018. (lcjdb1)
March 5, 2018 Filing 62 Joint STATUS REPORT by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. (Perrelli, Thomas)
February 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1:00 p.m. on 3/5/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #61 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on the dispositive motions currently pending in this case is tentatively set for Wednesday, March 14, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 30; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file, by not later than Monday, March 5, 2018 at 1:00 p.m., another joint status report addressing any scheduling issues that remain outstanding as of that date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/26/2018. (lcjdb1)
February 22, 2018 Filing 61 Joint STATUS REPORT by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. (Perrelli, Thomas)
February 16, 2018 Filing 60 JOINT APPENDIX by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. (Perrelli, Thomas)
February 16, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Filing of Joint Appendix of Administrative Exhibits Relied Upon by the Parties With Respect to Dispositive Motions by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY re #8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment, #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Perrelli, Thomas)
February 6, 2018 Filing 58 REPLY to opposition to motion re #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Appendix M. Exhibit DD, #2 Certificate of Service)(Perrelli, Thomas)
January 28, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Reply in support of their #28 Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 2/6/2018. A Joint Status Report representing the parties' respective proposals for scheduling further proceedings in this case is due by 2/22/2018. (jth)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the matters discussed at the telephone conference held on this date, including plaintiffs' oral motion for an extension of time to file their reply in support of #28 their motion for summary judgment, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs' oral motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs' reply shall be filed by not later than Tuesday, February 6, 2018; it is further ORDERED that, at the request of both parties, the motions hearing currently set in this matter for Friday, February 2, 2018 is CONTINUED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file, by not later than Thursday, February 22, 2018, a joint status report presenting their respective proposals for scheduling further proceedings in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/26/2018. (lcjdb1)
January 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Bates: Telephone Conference call held on 1/26/2018. The Motions Hearing presently scheduled for Friday, February 2, 2018 is continued to a date and time to be determined. (Revised Scheduling Order to be Issued) (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (jth)
January 25, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 1/26/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
January 25, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Celia Davis on behalf of All Defendants (Davis, Kathryn)
January 22, 2018 Filing 56 REPLY to opposition to motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, DONALD TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(17-cv-1902), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Westmoreland, Rachael)
January 22, 2018 Filing 55 Memorandum in opposition to re #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ELAINE C. DUKE, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(17-cv-1902), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Westmoreland, Rachael)
January 19, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M. Greenbaum on behalf of LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW (Greenbaum, Jon)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On the Court's own motion, and upon consideration of the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No. 17-1907 for purposes of the dispositive motions currently pending in both cases; it is further ORDERED that all filings with respect to those motions shall be made jointly and shall be filed only in this case; it is further ORDERED that counsel of record in both cases shall receive electronic notice of any filings made in either case; and it is further ORDERED that counsel in both cases shall determine how to divide their argument time at the motions hearing currently set for Friday, February 2, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/18/2018. (lcjdb1)
January 12, 2018 Filing 53 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by ADVOCATES OF YOUTH, LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND ECONOMIC JUSTICE, LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, PUBLIC COUNSEL, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS, ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE, MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR JUSTICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amicus Brief of the Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Anti-Defamation League, and Social Justice Organizations in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Coston, William) Modified filers on 1/16/2018 (znmw).
January 12, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Martin L. Saad, :Firm- Venable LLP, :Address- 600 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Washington, D.C. 20001. Phone No. - 202-344-4345. Fax No. - 202-344-8300 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5286205. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ADVOCATES OF YOUTH, LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND ECONOMIC JUSTICE, LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, PUBLIC COUNSEL, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS, ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE, MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR JUSTICE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Coston, William) Modified filers on 1/16/2018 (znmw).
January 12, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by William Dean Coston on behalf of ADVOCATES OF YOUTH, LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND ECONOMIC JUSTICE, LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, PUBLIC COUNSEL, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS, ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE, MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR JUSTICE. (Coston, William) Modified filers on 1/16/2018 (znmw).
January 12, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sameer P. Sheikh, :Firm- Venable LLP, :Address- 600 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Washington, D.C. 20001. Phone No. - 202-344-4168. Fax No. - 202-344-8300 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5285694. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ADVOCATES OF YOUTH, LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND ECONOMIC JUSTICE, LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, PUBLIC COUNSEL, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS, ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE, MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR JUSTICE.(Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Coston, William) Modified filers on 1/16/2018 (znmw).
January 8, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 1/22/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/31/2018. Motion Hearing rescheduled for 2/2/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (gdf)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #47 defendants' motion for a modified briefing schedule. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/5/2018. (lcjdb1)
January 4, 2018 Filing 48 ERRATA Correcting Date by ELAINE C. DUKE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA #47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ELAINE C. DUKE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order CORRECTED Proposed Order)(Bailey, Kate)
January 4, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ELAINE C. DUKE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bailey, Kate). Added MOTION to Modify on 1/5/2018 (znmw).
January 3, 2018 Filing 46 Case randomly reassigned to Judge John D. Bates. Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
December 29, 2017 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by The Bar Association of San Francisco (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Amicus Brief of the Bar Association of San Francisco, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anyanwu, Chidera)
December 29, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Neil A.F. Popovic, :Firm- Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP, :Address- 4 Embarcadero Center, 17th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415.434.9100. Fax No. - 415.434.3947 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5268155. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by The Bar Association of San Francisco (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anyanwu, Chidera)
December 29, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John-Paul S. Deol, :Firm- Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP, :Address- 4 Embarcadero Center, 17th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415.434.9100. Fax No. - 415.434.3947 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5268110. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by The Bar Association of San Francisco (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anyanwu, Chidera)
December 22, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, 28 Additional Cities and Counties, The National League of Cities, The United States Conference of Mayors (Attachments: #1 AMICUS BRIEF OF THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES, 28 ADDITIONAL CITIES AND COUNTIES., THE NATIONAL LEAGUE OF CITIES, AND THE UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #2 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AND ORDERING FILING OF AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF)(Scherb, Matthew)
December 22, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tiffany Miao, :Firm- Baker & Hostetler LLP, :Address- 45 Rockefeller Plaza, New York, NY 10111. Phone No. - 212-847-4266. Fax No. - 212-589-4201 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5262649. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LATINOJUSTICE PRLDEF (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Paul)
December 22, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alan Friel, :Firm- Baker & Hostetler LLP, :Address- 11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400, Los Angeles, CA 90025. Phone No. - 310-979-8860. Fax No. - 310-820-8859 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5262643. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LATINOJUSTICE PRLDEF (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Paul)
December 22, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Fernando Bohorquez, Jr., :Firm- Baker & Hostetler LLP, :Address- 45 Rockefeller Plaza, New York, NY 10111. Phone No. - 212-589-4200. Fax No. - 212-589-4201 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5262635. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LATINOJUSTICE PRLDEF (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Paul)
December 22, 2017 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jose Luis Perez, :Firm- LatinoJustice PRLDEF, :Address- 99 Hudson Street, New York, NY 10013. Phone No. - 213-219-3360. Fax No. - 212-431-4276 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5262630. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LATINOJUSTICE PRLDEF (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Paul)
December 22, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Madiha M. Zuberi, :Firm- Baker & Hostetler LLP, :Address- 11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400, Los Angeles, CA 90025. Phone No. - 310-979-8454. Fax No. - 310-820-8859 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5262628. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LATINOJUSTICE PRLDEF (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Paul)
December 22, 2017 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment And/Or Preliminary Injunction and Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by LATINOJUSTICE PRLDEF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Amicus Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Paul)
December 22, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Marc Levine on behalf of LATINOJUSTICE PRLDEF (Levine, Paul)
December 19, 2017 Filing 34 AMICUS BRIEF by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northeastern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University. (td)
December 19, 2017 Filing 33 AMICUS BRIEF by Amherst College, Asnuntuck Community College, Bowdoin College, Brandeis University, Bucknell University, Capital Community College, Carnegie Mellon University, Case Western Reserve University, Central Connecticut State University, Charter Oak State College, Colby College, Eastern Connecticut State University, Emerson College, Gateway Community College, Hampshire College, Housatonic Community College, Lawrence University, Los Rios Community College District, Manchester Community College, Middlesex Community College, Mount Holyoke College, Naugatuck Valley Community College, Northeastern University, Northwestern Community College, Norwalk Community College, Quinebaug Valley Community College, Rice University, San Francisco Community College District, Smith College, Southern Connecticut State University, Three Rivers Community College, Tufts University, UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, University of Connecticut, University of Maryland, College Park, Wellesley College, Western Connecticut State University, Williams College, Worcester Polytechnic Institute. (td)
December 19, 2017 Filing 32 AMICUS BRIEF by Asian Law Alliance, Brooklyn Defender Services, Canal Alliance, Centro Legal de la Raza, Children's Law Center of Massachusetts, Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto (CLSEPA), Dolores Street Community Services, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Heartland Alliance's National Immigrant Justice Center (NIJC), Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society (HIAS) Pennsylvania, Immigrant Legal Resource Center (ILRC), Just Neighbors, Justice Center of Southeast Massachusetts, LEGAL AID JUSTICE CENTER, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Legal Services for Children (LSC), Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (MLRI), NORTHWEST IMMIGRANT RIGHTS PROJECT, National Justice for Our Neighbors, New York Legal Assistance Group, OneJustice, Rocky Mountain Immigrant Advocacy Network, Services, Immigrant Rights, and Education Network (SIREN). (td)
December 19, 2017 Filing 31 AMICUS BRIEF by 112 COMPANIES. (td)
December 19, 2017 Filing 30 AMICUS BRIEF by Current and Former Law Enforcement Leaders. (td)
December 19, 2017 Filing 29 AMICUS BRIEF by IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE. (td)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #25 Motion to Admit Danielle C. Gray Pro Hac Vice; and granting #26 Motion to Admit Jennifer Sokoler Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/19/2017. (lccrc1)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #27 Motion of Eighteen Universities for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/19/2017. (lccrc1)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/19/2017. (lccrc1)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #20 Motion of Legal Services Organizations for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/19/2017. (lccrc1)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Motion to Admit Janine M. Lopez Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/19/2017. (lccrc1)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion of 112 Companies for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/19/2017. (lccrc1)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion to Admit Karen W. Lin Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion to Admit Lauren R. Goldman Pro Hac Vice; and granting #14 Motion to Admit Rory K. Schneider Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/19/2017. (lccrc1)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion of Current and Former Law Enforcement Leaders for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/19/2017. (lccrc1)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion of Immigration Reform Law Institute for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Defendants. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/19/2017. (lccrc1)
December 15, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Lindsay C. Harrison, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Appendix A. Table of Contents, #8 Appendix B. Declarations - Exhibits A-Q, #9 Appendix C. Exhibits 1-24, #10 Appendix D. Exhibits 25-43, #11 Appendix E. Exhibits 44-59, #12 Appendix F. Exhibits 60-78, #13 Appendix G. Exhibits 79-98, #14 Appendix H. Exhibits 99-108 and ND Cal Topical Index, #15 Appendix I. Exhibits 109-120, #16 Appendix J. Exhibits 121-141, #17 Appendix K. Declarations - Exhibits R-CC, #18 Appendix L. Exhibits 142-143 and Topical Index)(Perrelli, Thomas)
December 15, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Eighteen Universities in Support of The Trustees of Princeton University, Microsoft Corporation, and Maria De La Cruz Perales Sanchez's Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Injunctive Relief by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hacker, Jonathan)
December 15, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer Sokoler, :Firm- O'Melveny & Myers LLP, :Address- 7 Times Square, New York, NY 10036. Phone No. - (212) 326-2000. Fax No. - (212) 326-2061 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5251723. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Sokoler, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hacker, Jonathan)
December 15, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Danielle C. Gray, :Firm- O'Melveny & Myers LLP, :Address- 7 Times Square, New York, NY 10036. Phone No. - (212) 326-2000. Fax No. - (213) 326-2061 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5251722. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, George Washington University, Georgetown University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danielle C. Gray, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hacker, Jonathan)
December 15, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Hacker on behalf of Brown University, California Institute of Technology, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University, Georgetown University, George Washington University, Harvard University, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Northwestern University, Stanford University, University of Chicago, University of Pennsylvania, Vanderbilt University, Washington University in St. Louis, Yale University (Hacker, Jonathan)
December 15, 2017 Filing 23 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Perrelli, Thomas)
December 15, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION For Leave To Allow Three Declarants To Proceed By Pseudonym by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Perrelli, Thomas)
December 15, 2017 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Preliminary Injunction by Amherst College, Asnuntuck Community College, Bowdoin College, Brandeis University, Bucknell University, Capital Community College, Carnegie Mellon University, Case Western Reserve University, Central Connecticut State University, Charter Oak State College, Colby College, University of Connecticut, Eastern Connecticut State University, Emerson College, Gateway Community College, Hampshire College, Housatonic Community College, Lawrence University, Los Rios Community College District, Manchester Community College, University of Maryland, College Park, UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, Middlesex Community College, Mount Holyoke College, Naugatuck Valley Community College, Northeastern University, Northwestern Community College, Norwalk Community College, Quinebaug Valley Community College, Rice University, San Francisco Community College District, Smith College, Southern Connecticut State University, Three Rivers Community College, Tufts University, Tunxis Community College, Wellesley College, Western Connecticut State University, Worcester Polytechnic Institute, Williams College (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spiva, Bruce)
December 15, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Preliminary Injunction by Asian Law Alliance, Brooklyn Defender Services, Centro Legal de la Raza, Children's Law Center of Massachusetts, Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto (CLSEPA), Dolores Street Community Services, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Heartland Alliance's National Immigrant Justice Center (NIJC), Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society (HIAS) Pennsylvania, Immigrant Legal Resource Center (ILRC), LEGAL AID JUSTICE CENTER, Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County, Legal Services for Children (LSC), Justice Center of Southeast Massachusetts, Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (MLRI), National Justice for Our Neighbors, New York Legal Assistance Group, NORTHWEST IMMIGRANT RIGHTS PROJECT, OneJustice, Rocky Mountain Immigrant Advocacy Network, Services, Immigrant Rights, and Education Network (SIREN), Just Neighbors, Canal Alliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siegel, Joshua)
December 15, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Janine M. Lopez, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 60 State Street Boston, MA 02109. Phone No. - 617-526-6454. Fax No. - 617-526-5000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5251601. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Airbnb, Inc., Square, Inc., Twitter, Inc., Yelp, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Holtzblatt, Ari)
December 15, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Holtzblatt on behalf of Airbnb, Inc., Square, Inc., Twitter, Inc., Yelp, Inc. (Holtzblatt, Ari)
December 15, 2017 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by 112 COMPANIES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amicus Brief of 112 Companies in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
December 15, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Joseph Carome on behalf of Airbnb, Inc., Square, Inc., Twitter, Inc., Yelp, Inc. (Carome, Patrick)
December 15, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Paul Waxman on behalf of Twitter, Inc., Yelp, Inc., Airbnb, Inc., Square, Inc. (Waxman, Seth)
December 15, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rory K. Schneider, :Firm- Mayer Brown LLP, :Address- 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY 10020-1001. Phone No. - 212-506-2157. Fax No. - 212-849-5775 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5251526. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 112 COMPANIES (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
December 15, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren R. Goldman, :Firm- Mayer Brown LLP, :Address- 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY 10020-1001. Phone No. - 212-506-2647. Fax No. - 212-849-5647 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5251506. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 112 COMPANIES (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
December 15, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karen W. Lin, :Firm- Mayer Brown LLP, :Address- 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, NY 10020-1001. Phone No. - 212-506-2538. Fax No. - 212-849-5539 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5251462. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 112 COMPANIES (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
December 15, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae by Current and Former Law Enforcement Leaders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief Amici Curiae, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Geltzer, Joshua)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion for Leave to Enlarge Page Limit. Plaintiffs' memorandum of law supporting their combined opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss may be up to 50 pages. Plaintiffs' memorandum supporting their motion for a preliminary injunction or for summary judgment may be up to 55 pages. Defendants' memorandum supporting their opposition to Plaintiffs' motions may be up to 55 pages. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/14/2017. (lccrc1)
December 14, 2017 NOTICE OF ERROR re #10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; emailed to tperrelli@jenner.com, cc'd 8 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Cases are not consolidated; Documents shall only contain one case caption and case number; File separate motion in 17-1907 if it also pertains to that case. (znmw, )
December 13, 2017 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perrelli, Thomas)
December 12, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Axelrod, Julie) Modified event title on 12/13/2017 (znmw).
November 27, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2017. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2018. Replies due by 1/19/2018. Oral Arguments on Motion set for 1/31/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj)
November 22, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by ELAINE C. DUKE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certified Index of Administrative Record)(Westmoreland, Rachael). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 11/27/2017 (znmw).
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: See Order for full briefing schedule. The Court will hold a motions hearing on January 31, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/22/2017. (lccrc1)
November 21, 2017 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order and Stipulation Regarding Use of Discovery by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, THE TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Perrelli, Thomas)
November 9, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/22/2017. Responses due by 12/13/2017 (lsj)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court directs Defendants to file a responsive pleading by November 22, 2017. Plaintiffs' opposition to that pleading is due on or before December 13, 2017. Defendants' reply is due 14 days after Plaintiffs file their opposition. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/9/2017. (lccrc3)
November 6, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ELAINE C. DUKE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (md)
November 3, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (md)
November 3, 2017 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION.(Perrelli, Thomas)
November 3, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-1907. (Perrelli, Thomas)
November 3, 2017 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY (Perrelli, Thomas)
November 3, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ELAINE C. DUKE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5190077) filed by TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Perrelli, Thomas)
November 3, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ELAINE C. DUKE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5190077) filed by TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY, MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ, MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Perrelli, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Represented By: Thomas J. Perrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Thomas J. Perrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA DE LA CRUZ PERALES SANCHEZ
Represented By: Thomas J. Perrelli
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Thomas J. Perrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO, CLC
Represented By: Julie S. Selesnick
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE
Represented By: Joseph M. Sellers
Represented By: Douglas James McNamara
Represented By: Julia Horwitz
Represented By: Julie S. Selesnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUKE C. ELAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Kathryn Celia Davis
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Gerald Brinton Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Kathryn Celia Davis
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Gerald Brinton Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAINE C. DUKE
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Kathryn Celia Davis
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Gerald Brinton Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Kathryn Celia Davis
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Gerald Brinton Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Kathryn Celia Davis
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Gerald Brinton Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Kathryn Celia Davis
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Gerald Brinton Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Kathryn Celia Davis
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Gerald Brinton Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Represented By: Kathryn Celia Davis
Represented By: Rachael Lynn Westmoreland
Represented By: Kate Bailey
Represented By: Gerald Brinton Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CAPITAL COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HAMPSHIRE COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MASSACHUSETTS LAW REFORM INSTITUTE (MLRI)
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROCKY MOUNTAIN IMMIGRANT ADVOCACY NETWORK
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNIVERSITY OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HARVARD UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTRO LEGAL DE LA RAZA
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DUKE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MOUNT HOLYOKE COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CORNELL UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BUCKNELL UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEGAL SERVICES FOR CHILDREN (LSC)
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DOLORES STREET COMMUNITY SERVICES
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SMITH COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EMERSON COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NORTHWESTERN COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHILDREN'S LAW CENTER OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NORTHWEST IMMIGRANT RIGHTS PROJECT
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MANCHESTER COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHARTER OAK STATE COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL JUSTICE FOR OUR NEIGHBORS
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NAUGATUCK VALLEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BOWDOIN COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAWRENCE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMHERST COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: YALE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CANAL ALLIANCE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SERVICES, IMMIGRANT RIGHTS, AND EDUCATION NETWORK (SIREN)
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOUTHERN CONNECTICUT STATE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNIVERSITY OF MARYLAND, COLLEGE PARK
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE
Represented By: Julie B. Axelrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEGAL AID SOCIETY OF SAN MATEO COUNTY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEGAL AID JUSTICE CENTER
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASIAN LAW ALLIANCE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GATEWAY COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JUST NEIGHBORS
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WELLESLEY COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTRAL CONNECTICUT STATE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WESTERN CONNECTICUT STATE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TUNXIS COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HOUSATONIC COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STANFORD UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 112 COMPANIES
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MIDDLESEX COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMMUNITY LEGAL SERVICES IN EAST PALO (CLSEPA)
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TUFTS UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW YORK LEGAL ASSISTANCE GROUP
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SQUARE, INC.
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Janine M. Lopez
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Carome
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Seth Paul Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EMORY UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DARTMOUTH COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: QUINEBAUG VALLEY COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NORTHWESTERN UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IMMIGRANT LEGAL RESOURCE CENTER (ILRC)
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRANDEIS UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HEBREW IMMIGRANT AID SOCIETY (HIAS) PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ONEJUSTICE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: YELP, INC.
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Janine M. Lopez
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Carome
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Seth Paul Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WORCESTER POLYTECHNIC INSTITUTE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HEARTLAND ALLIANCE'S NATIONAL IMMIGRANT JUSTICE CENTER (NIJC)
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THREE RIVERS COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CURRENT AND FORMER LAW ENFORCEMENT LEADERS
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Joshua Geltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY IN ST. LOUIS
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASNUNTUCK COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COLBY COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RICE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BROOKLYN DEFENDER SERVICES
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BROWN UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jennifer B. Sokoler
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Danielle C. Gray
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LOS RIOS COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Jonathan D. Hacker
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AIRBNB, INC.
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Janine M. Lopez
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Carome
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Seth Paul Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NORWALK COMMUNITY COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EASTERN CONNECTICUT STATE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TWITTER, INC.
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Janine M. Lopez
Represented By: Ari Holtzblatt
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Carome
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Seth Paul Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CASE WESTERN RESERVE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EAST BAY SANCTUARY COVENANT
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WILLIAMS COLLEGE
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JUSTICE CENTER OF SOUTHEAST MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Joshua M. Siegel
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SAN FRANCISCO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CARNEGIE MELLON UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Rory K. Schneider
Represented By: Karen W. Lin
Represented By: Lauren R. Goldman
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER
Represented By: William Dean Coston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BAR ASSOCIATION OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Chidera Anyanwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CUNY DREAMERS
Represented By: Paul Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HISPANIC FEDERATION, INC.
Represented By: Paul Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HISPANIC NATIONAL BAR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Paul Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASIAN AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: Paul Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 28 ADDITIONAL CITIES AND COUNTIES
Represented By: Matthew Alex Scherb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PUBLIC COUNSEL
Represented By: William Dean Coston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNIDOSUS
Represented By: Paul Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ARAB AMERICAN INSTITUTE
Represented By: Paul Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS
Represented By: Paul Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Represented By: Matthew Alex Scherb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR JUSTICE
Represented By: William Dean Coston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ADVOCATES FOR YOUTH
Represented By: William Dean Coston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PRESENTE.ORG
Represented By: Paul Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE-ASIAN LAW CAUCUS
Represented By: Paul Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LATINOJUSTICE PRLDEF
Represented By: Paul Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW
Represented By: William Dean Coston
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS
Represented By: William Dean Coston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RU DREAMERS
Represented By: Paul Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE
Represented By: Paul Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND ECONOMIC JUSTICE
Represented By: William Dean Coston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE
Represented By: William Dean Coston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS
Represented By: Matthew Alex Scherb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NEW YORK STATE YOUTH LEADERSHIP COUNCIL
Represented By: Paul Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL LEAGUE OF CITIES
Represented By: Matthew Alex Scherb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HISPANIC ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Paul Marc Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?