GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE v. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES

Plaintiff: Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives and BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
Case Number: 1:2017cv02363
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #17 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/23/18. (lcrc1)
October 23, 2018 17 Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES. (Braswell, Marina)
July 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/23/2018. (gdf)
July 23, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #16 the parties' Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 23, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/23/2018. (lcrc1)
July 23, 2018 16 Joint STATUS REPORT by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Thurston, Robin)
May 22, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/23/2018 (tj)
May 22, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #15 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before July 23, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/22/2018. (lcrc1)
May 21, 2018 15 Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES. (Braswell, Marina)
April 26, 2018 14 Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES. (Braswell, Marina)
February 16, 2018 13 Joint STATUS REPORT by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Thurston, Robin)
January 9, 2018 12 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/09/2018. (lcrc1)
January 8, 2018 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thurston, Robin)
January 3, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties submit a joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter by January 8, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/03/2018. (lcrc1)
January 3, 2018 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Schedule by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Braswell, Marina)
December 20, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before January 3, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/20/2017. (lcrc1)
December 20, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time of One Day, Nunc Pro Tunc: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is now due by December 19, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/20/2017. (lcrc1)
December 19, 2017 9 ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES.(Braswell, Marina)
December 19, 2017 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Braswell, Marina)
December 19, 2017 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Braswell, Marina)
November 30, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that J. Adam Skaggs is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/30/2017. (lcrc1)
November 30, 2017 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- J. Adam Skaggs, :Firm- Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, :Address- 223 West 38th Street, #90, New York, NY 10018. Phone No. - (917) 680-3473. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5227642. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier)
November 27, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Robin F. Thurston is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/27/2017. (lcrc1)
November 27, 2017 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robin F. Thurston, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- P.O. Box 34553, Washington, DC 20043. Phone No. - (202) 448-9090. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5221879. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier)
November 21, 2017 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/16/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/16/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier)
November 14, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice: The motion for admission pro hac vice does not comply with all relevant local rules. Local Rule 83.2(d)(5) requires that attorneys seeking to appear pro hac vice before this Court include in their declarations "the number of times the attorney has been admitted pro hac vice in this Court in the last two years." Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that the #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/14/2017. (lcrc1)
November 14, 2017 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robin F. Thurston, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- P.O. Box 34553, Washington, D.C. 20043. Phone No. - (202) 701-1775. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5204553. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier)
November 13, 2017 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(jd)
November 9, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (jd)
November 9, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5198934) filed by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Guzman, Javier)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE v. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By: Javier M. Guzman
Represented By: Robin F. Thurston
Represented By: J. Adam Skaggs
Represented By: Robin Frances Thurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?