ANDERSON HOSPITAL et al v. HARGAN
Plaintiff: PROMEDICA BIXBY HOSPITAL, PALMETTO HEALTH EASLEY, SOUTH SHORE HOSPITAL, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL, FLOYD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, KARMANOS CANCER HOSPITAL, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER, RUSH NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN LAPEER HOSPITAL, GASTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, COPLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, REID HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, HENRY COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL, PROVIDENT HOSPITAL, WITHAM HEALTH SERVICES, JOHNSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, OAK FOREST HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, MCLAREN MACOMB, WAYNE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INC., COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, MCLAREN PORT HURON, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, STONEWALL JACKSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FLOWER HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER, AUGUSTA MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, JOHN H. STROGER HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, PARKLAND HEALTH AND HOSPITAL SYSTEM, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SOUTH BEND, MAJOR HOSPITAL, BAY PARK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, DEKALB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM, GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN OAKLAND, OHIO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF IOWA HOSPITALS AND CLINICS, MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL, TOLEDO HOSPITAL, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS MEDICAL CENTER, LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL, KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, PALMETTO HEALTH RICHLAND, BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PALMETTO HEALTH BAPTIST COLUMBIA, JOHN FITZGIBBON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, ESKENAZI HEALTH, FAYETTE REGIONAL HEALTH SERVICES, JACKSON COUNTY SCHNECK MEMORIAL, JAMAICA HOSPITAL, HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, GWINNETT HOSPITAL SYSTEM, THOMAS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DEARBORN COUNTY HOSPITAL and PALMETTO EASLEY
Defendant: ERIC D. HARGAN
Case Number: 1:2017cv02749
Filed: December 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report within thirty days of the Supreme Court's decision in Azar v. Allina Health Services, No. 17-1484. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/29/2018. (lcrc2)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT by ERIC D. HARGAN. (Orloff, Serena)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report within thirty days of the Supreme Court's grant or denial of certiorari in Azar v. Allina Health Services (No. 17-1484). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 29, 2018. (lcrc3)
May 29, 2018 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by ERIC D. HARGAN. (Orloff, Serena)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #10 the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to file its answer to the complaint is VACATED. The parties shall file a joint status report within thirty days of the earlier of the filing of a petition for certiorari in Allina Health Services, et al. v. Azar, No. 16-5255 (D.C. Cir.) or the expiration of the deadline for such a filing. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 2, 2018. (lcrc2)
March 2, 2018 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ERIC D. HARGAN (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
March 1, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ERIC D. HARGAN (Orloff, Serena)
January 15, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/3/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Errata Certified Card & USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan)
January 11, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ERIC D. HARGAN served on 1/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Card & USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan)
January 11, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01-03-18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Card & USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan)
December 26, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ERIC D. HARGAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
December 26, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb)
December 21, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:16-cv-150. (Smith, Nolan)
December 21, 2017 Filing 3 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANDERSON HOSPITAL, AUGUSTA MEDICAL CENTER, BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAY PARK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, COPLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DEARBORN COUNTY HOSPITAL, DEKALB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL, ESKENAZI HEALTH, FAYETTE REGIONAL HEALTH SERVICES, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FLOWER HOSPITAL, FLOYD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, GASTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, GWINNETT HOSPITAL SYSTEM, HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL, HENRY COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM, JACKSON COUNTY SCHNECK MEMORIAL, JAMAICA HOSPITAL, JOHN FITZGIBBON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, JOHN H. STROGER HOSPITAL, JOHNSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, KARMANOS CANCER HOSPITAL, KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL, MAJOR HOSPITAL, MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, MCLAREN LAPEER HOSPITAL, MCLAREN MACOMB, MCLAREN OAKLAND, MCLAREN PORT HURON, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SOUTH BEND, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, OAK FOREST HOSPITAL, OHIO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, PALMETTO EASLEY, PALMETTO HEALTH BAPTIST COLUMBIA, PALMETTO HEALTH EASLEY, PALMETTO HEALTH RICHLAND, PARKLAND HEALTH AND HOSPITAL SYSTEM, PROMEDICA BIXBY HOSPITAL, PROVIDENT HOSPITAL, REID HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, RUSH NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTH SHORE HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, STONEWALL JACKSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, THOMAS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TOLEDO HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS MEDICAL CENTER, UNIVERSITY OF IOWA HOSPITALS AND CLINICS, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER, WAYNE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INC., WITHAM HEALTH SERVICES, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Smith, Nolan)
December 21, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Kent Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Nolan) .
December 21, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT UNDER THE MEDICARE ACT against ERIC D. HARGAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5259699) filed by HENRY COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL, SOUTH SHORE HOSPITAL, FLOWER HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA, CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GASTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ESKENAZI HEALTH, UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER, EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN GREATER LANSING, PALMETTO HEALTH BAPTIST COLUMBIA, WITHAM HEALTH SERVICES, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, PALMETTO HEALTH RICHLAND, REID HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST, GWINNETT HOSPITAL SYSTEM, JAMAICA HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH, JACKSON COUNTY SCHNECK MEMORIAL, MCLAREN PORT HURON, STONEWALL JACKSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SOUTH BEND, KARMANOS CANCER HOSPITAL, ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL, PARKLAND HEALTH AND HOSPITAL SYSTEM, LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH, DEKALB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, OAK FOREST HOSPITAL, PROVIDENT HOSPITAL, PALMETTO HEALTH EASLEY, WAYNE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INC., MCLAREN LAPEER HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, FAYETTE REGIONAL HEALTH SERVICES, RUSH NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER, PALMETTO EASLEY, TOLEDO HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF IOWA HOSPITALS AND CLINICS, THOMAS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, AUGUSTA MEDICAL CENTER, ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER, FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, DEARBORN COUNTY HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS MEDICAL CENTER, PROMEDICA BIXBY HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS, OHIO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, FLOYD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MAJOR HOSPITAL, MCLAREN MACOMB, FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, COPLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER, BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JOHN FITZGIBBON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MCLAREN OAKLAND, CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL, JOHNSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BAY PARK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM, JOHN H. STROGER HOSPITAL, MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL, BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Eric D. Hargan, Acting Secretary, #3 Summons to Jeff Sessions, US Attorney General, #4 Summons to Jessie Liu, US Attorney)(Smith, Nolan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDERSON HOSPITAL et al v. HARGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROMEDICA BIXBY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALMETTO HEALTH EASLEY
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTH SHORE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOTSFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLOYD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL SOUTH
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARMANOS CANCER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSH NORTH SHORE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLUSHING HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER MARSHALL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUNDERSEN LUTHERAN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN LAPEER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GASTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN HEALTH INDIANAPOLIS
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COPLEY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REID HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELKHART GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENT HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WITHAM HEALTH SERVICES
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OAK FOREST HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN MACOMB
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INC.
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL EAST
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN PORT HURON
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALDWELL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STONEWALL JACKSON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLOWER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUGUSTA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN GREATER LANSING
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN H. STROGER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH ALABAMA
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARKLAND HEALTH AND HOSPITAL SYSTEM
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SOUTH BEND
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAJOR HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY PARK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEKALB MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WOOSTER COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIGH POINT REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SHEPHERD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCLAREN OAKLAND
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OHIO VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF IOWA HOSPITALS AND CLINICS
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARION GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOLEDO HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLE FOUNDATION HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LITTLE COMPANY OF MARY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. FRANCIS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALMETTO HEALTH RICHLAND
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAXTER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH ARKANSAS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALMETTO HEALTH BAPTIST COLUMBIA
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN FITZGIBBON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRELANDS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAST ALABAMA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESKENAZI HEALTH
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAYETTE REGIONAL HEALTH SERVICES
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKSON COUNTY SCHNECK MEMORIAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMAICA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANCOCK REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HOSPITAL NORTH
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDERSON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GWINNETT HOSPITAL SYSTEM
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEARBORN COUNTY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALMETTO EASLEY
Represented By: Nolan Kent Smith
Represented By: N. Kent Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC D. HARGAN
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?