THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA TO FUSION GPS et al v. BUZZFEED, INC., et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: ALEKSEJ GUBAREV, XBT HOLDING S.A. and WEBZILLA, INC.,
Defendant: BUZZFEED, INC. and BEN SMITH
Case Number: 1:2017mc02171
Filed: August 31, 2017
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Tanya S. Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2017 11 AMENDED REPLY to opposition to motion re 1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by FUSION GPS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13, # 2 Exhibit 14, # 3 Exhibit 15, # 4 Exhibit 16)(Cotton, Rachel) Modified on 10/31/2017 (DJS).
October 18, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Submission of materials by 10/27/2017. (tb)
October 16, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (AMENDED): The court's 10/13/17 Minute Order is hereby amended to required submission of the materials by 10/27/17. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/16/17. (DJS)
October 13, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Before the court are a Motion to Quash 1 and a Reply 10 filed by Fusion GPS. Both documents include exhibits numbered one through four. No later than 11/20/17, Fusion GPS shall refile the reply brief and attach exhibits numbered so as not to duplicate the previously numbered exhibits and make appropriate changes to the brief. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/13/17. (DJS)
October 10, 2017 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re 1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by FUSION GPS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Cotton, Rachel)
October 4, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 10/10/2017. (tb)
October 4, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 9 Amended Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Evan Fray-Witzer is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of ALEKSEJ GUBAREV, XBT HOLDING S.A., and WEBZILLA, INC. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/4/17. (DJS)
October 4, 2017 9 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Evan Fray-Witzer, :Firm- Ciampa Fray-Witzer, LLP, :Address- 20 Park Plaza, Suite 505, Boston, MA 02116. Phone No. - (617) 426-0000. Fax No. - (617) 507-8043 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5144728. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALEKSEJ GUBAREV, WEBZILLA, INC.,, XBT HOLDING S.A. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Amended declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Diercks, Walter)
October 4, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for failing to fully comply with Local Civil Rule 83.2(d)(6). Affiants with offices located outside of the District of Columbia are still required to provide sufficient information for the court to determine "whether the affiant engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia." Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/4/17. (DJS)
October 3, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Fusion GPS's Reply to Motion to Quash 1 is due October 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/3/17. (DJS)
October 3, 2017 8 ERRATA by FUSION GPS 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by FUSION GPS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cotton, Rachel)
October 2, 2017 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order by FUSION GPS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cotton, Rachel)
September 28, 2017 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Evan Fray-Witzer, :Firm- Ciampa Fray-Witzer, LLP, :Address- 20 Park Plaza, Suite 505, Boston, MA 02116. Phone No. - (617) 426-0000. Fax No. - (617) 507-8043 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5136856. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALEKSEJ GUBAREV, WEBZILLA, INC.,, XBT HOLDING S.A. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Evan Fray-Witzer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order granting motion)(Diercks, Walter)
September 26, 2017 5 Memorandum in opposition to re 1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by ALEKSEJ GUBAREV, WEBZILLA, INC.,, XBT HOLDING S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Opposition, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Opposition, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Opposition, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Opposition, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Opposition, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Diercks, Walter)
September 20, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Quash due by 9/26/2017. (tb)
September 19, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 2 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Fusion GPS's Motion to Quash shall be filed by September 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/19/17. (DJS)
September 18, 2017 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Elmer Diercks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Diercks, Walter)
September 18, 2017 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order by ALEKSEJ GUBAREV, WEBZILLA, INC.,, XBT HOLDING S.A. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Diercks, Walter)
August 31, 2017 1 MOTION to Quash, MOTION for Protective Order by FUSION GPS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12)(td)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA TO FUSION GPS et al v. BUZZFEED, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEKSEJ GUBAREV
Represented By: Walter Elmer Diercks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XBT HOLDING S.A.
Represented By: Walter Elmer Diercks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEBZILLA, INC.,
Represented By: Walter Elmer Diercks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUZZFEED, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEN SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?