CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. ROSS et al
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE and HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES
Defendant: WILBUR ROSS, CHRIS OLIVER and NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2018cv00112
Filed: January 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: James E. Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1540
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 124 Order on Remedy. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/19/2020. (lcjeb2)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 90 Order on Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/9/2020. (lcjeb2)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 75 Order on Motion for stay. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/31/2019. (lcjeb2)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 41 Order on Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/4/2018. (lcjeb2)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 20 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/10/18. (lcjeb1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. ROSS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Kristen Monsell
Represented By: Sarah Uhlemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
Represented By: Kristen Monsell
Represented By: Sarah Uhlemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Kristen Monsell
Represented By: Sarah Uhlemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILBUR ROSS
Represented By: John B. Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS OLIVER
Represented By: John B. Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Represented By: John B. Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?