POLICY AND RESEARCH, LLC et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al Featured Case

A case claiming that the Department of Health and Human Services "violated the Administrative Procedure Act that bars arbitrary decision-making and that the political appointees thwarted the will of Congress" when it cut $213 million from pregnancy prevention programs at more than 80 healthcare providers around the country.

Plaintiff: POLICY AND RESEARCH, LLC, PROJECT VIDA HEALTH CENTER, SEXUAL HEALTH INITIATIVES FOR TEENS NORTH CAROLINA and SOUTH CAROLINA CAMPAIGN TO PREVENT TEEN PREGNANCY
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv00346
Filed: February 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2018 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson held on 4-18-18; Page Numbers: 1-86; Date of Issuance: 4-19-18; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone Number (202) 354-3111. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2018.(Miller, Timothy)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. See attached for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/19/2018. (lckbj2)
April 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Motion Hearing held on 4/19/2018. Oral ruling denying 13 Cross MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment and granting 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Order forthcoming via Chambers. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth Sain-Loth) (gdf)
April 18, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2018 regarding the following motions: 13 Cross MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, and 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Summary Judgment . Oral arguments heard and motions taken under advisement. The next motion hearing date has been set for 4/19/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 17. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller). (jl)
April 13, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 Cross MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Gerardi, Michael)
April 9, 2018 Filing 17 Memorandum in opposition to re 13 Cross MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment filed by POLICY AND RESEARCH, LLC, PROJECT VIDA HEALTH CENTER, SEXUAL HEALTH INITIATIVES FOR TEENS NORTH CAROLINA, SOUTH CAROLINA CAMPAIGN TO PREVENT TEEN PREGNANCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lynne Jenner (Second) and Accompanying Exhibits, # 2 Declaration of Benjamin Link and Accompanying Exhibits, # 3 Declaration of Sean M. Sherman (Second) and Accompanying Exhibits)(Sherman, Sean) .
April 9, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY to opposition to motion re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by POLICY AND RESEARCH, LLC, PROJECT VIDA HEALTH CENTER, SEXUAL HEALTH INITIATIVES FOR TEENS NORTH CAROLINA, SOUTH CAROLINA CAMPAIGN TO PREVENT TEEN PREGNANCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lynne Jenner (Second) and Accompanying Exhibits, # 2 Declaration of Benjamin Link and Accompanying Exhibits, # 3 Declaration of Sean M. Sherman (Second) and Accompanying Exhibits)(Sherman, Sean)
April 6, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Partial Dismissal (Joint) by POLICY AND RESEARCH, LLC, PROJECT VIDA HEALTH CENTER, SEXUAL HEALTH INITIATIVES FOR TEENS NORTH CAROLINA, SOUTH CAROLINA CAMPAIGN TO PREVENT TEEN PREGNANCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Second Declaration of Michon Kretschmaier)(Sherman, Sean)
March 26, 2018 Filing 14 Memorandum in opposition to re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (See Docket Entry 13 to view document). (znmw)
March 26, 2018 Filing 13 Cross MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment by ALEX M. AZAR, II, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Gerardi Declaration, # 2 Kretschmaier Declaration, # 3 Certified List of Contents of Administrative Record, # 4 Proposed Order)(Gerardi, Michael). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 3/27/2018 (znmw).
March 7, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to (Sherman, Sean)
March 6, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (gdf)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER. See the attached for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/5/2018. (lckbj2)
February 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Gerardi on behalf of All Defendants (Gerardi, Michael)
February 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE (Joint) of Availability for Telephone Hearing by POLICY AND RESEARCH, LLC, PROJECT VIDA HEALTH CENTER, SEXUAL HEALTH INITIATIVES FOR TEENS NORTH CAROLINA, SOUTH CAROLINA CAMPAIGN TO PREVENT TEEN PREGNANCY (Sherman, Sean)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES REGARDING MOTIONS FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 02/23/2018. (lckbj1)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/23/2018. (lckbj1)
February 23, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Summary Judgment by POLICY AND RESEARCH, LLC, PROJECT VIDA HEALTH CENTER, SEXUAL HEALTH INITIATIVES FOR TEENS NORTH CAROLINA, SOUTH CAROLINA CAMPAIGN TO PREVENT TEEN PREGNANCY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Combined Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Expedited Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration of Lynne Jenner, # 3 Declaration of E.A. "Beth" De Santis, # 4 Declaration of Traci Baird, # 5 Declaration of William Schlesinger, # 6 Declaration of Carmen Zuniga, # 7 Declaration of Sean M. Sherman, # 8 Text of Proposed Order, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Sherman, Sean)
February 21, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/21/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/22/2018. (Sherman, Sean)
February 20, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
February 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zmd)
February 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Marcy Zieve on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zieve, Allison)
February 15, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by POLICY AND RESEARCH, LLC, PROJECT VIDA HEALTH CENTER, SEXUAL HEALTH INITIATIVES FOR TEENS NORTH CAROLINA, SOUTH CAROLINA CAMPAIGN TO PREVENT TEEN PREGNANCY. (Sherman, Sean)
February 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5333956) filed by SOUTH CAROLINA CAMPAIGN TO PREVENT TEEN PREGNANCY, POLICY AND RESEARCH, LLC, SEXUAL HEALTH INITIATIVES FOR TEENS NORTH CAROLINA, PROJECT VIDA HEALTH CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Sherman, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POLICY AND RESEARCH, LLC et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POLICY AND RESEARCH, LLC
Represented By: Sean M. Sherman
Represented By: Allison Marcy Zieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROJECT VIDA HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Sean M. Sherman
Represented By: Allison Marcy Zieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEXUAL HEALTH INITIATIVES FOR TEENS NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Sean M. Sherman
Represented By: Allison Marcy Zieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTH CAROLINA CAMPAIGN TO PREVENT TEEN PREGNANCY
Represented By: Sean M. Sherman
Represented By: Allison Marcy Zieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Michael Joseph Gerardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Michael Joseph Gerardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?