CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY v. US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, US AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE and U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Case Number: 1:2018cv00464
Filed: February 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/18/2020 (zjch)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #43 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 18, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 19, 2020. (lcdlf3)
October 19, 2020 Filing 43 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/19/2020 (zjch)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #41 Consent Motion for an Extension of Stay and #42 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the stay of the U.S. Department of States monthly productions is to be extended until the Court orders otherwise. The parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 19, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 18, 2020. (lcdlf3)
September 18, 2020 Filing 42 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 41 Consent MOTION for an Extension of Stay by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael)
September 15, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Gonzalez, Brenda)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant U.S. Department of State's #38 Consent Motion for an Extension of Stay Nunc Pro Tunc. Accordingly, Accordingly, the defendant U.S. Department of State's monthly productions are stayed until September 18, 2020. Upon consideration of the parties' #39 Joint Status Report, it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 18, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 20, 2020. (lcdlf3)
July 20, 2020 Filing 39 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael)
July 20, 2020 Filing 38 Consent MOTION for an Extension of Stay Nunc Pro Tunc by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael)
May 26, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Tilghman on behalf of U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Tilghman, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #36 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before July 20, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 21, 2020. (lcdlf3)
May 21, 2020 Filing 36 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Gonzalez, Brenda)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant U.S. Department of State's #35 Consent Motion for Stay and Extension of the Processing and Production Deadlines. Accordingly, the defendant U.S. Department of State's monthly productions are stayed for 60 days, to resume in June 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 27, 2020. (lcdlf3)
March 26, 2020 Filing 35 Consent MOTION to Stay the Processing and Production of Documents in Light of COVID-19 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric F. Stein)(Gonzalez, Brenda)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #34 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before May 21, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 24, 2020. (lcdlf3)
March 23, 2020 Filing 34 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Gonzalez, Brenda)
March 19, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Marina Utgoff Braswell (Gonzalez, Brenda)
January 22, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #32 Status Report; emailed to cbusen@bakerlaw.com, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. In future, the signature on the pleading and attorney login credentials must match. (ztth, )
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #32 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before March 23, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 22, 2020. (lcdlf3)
January 22, 2020 Filing 32 Joint STATUS REPORT by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #31 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before January 22, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 25, 2019. (lcdlf3)
November 25, 2019 Filing 31 Joint STATUS REPORT by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' #30 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 22, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 9/23/2019. (zcal)
September 23, 2019 Filing 30 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Braswell, Marina)
July 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/22/2019. (zcal)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties #29 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before September 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 23, 2019. (lcdlf3)
July 22, 2019 Filing 29 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Braswell, Marina)
June 17, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. Attorney A. Mackenna White terminated. (Busen, Carey)
May 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint status report due by 7/22/2019. (zcdw)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties #26 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before July 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 1, 2019. (lcdlf3)
April 30, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Proposed Order Correcting Scrivener's Error by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY re #26 Status Report (Busen, Carey)
April 30, 2019 Filing 26 Joint STATUS REPORT by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Busen, Carey)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #25 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 4, 2019. (JK)
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 Joint STATUS REPORT by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part the defendant's #24 Unopposed Motion for a Stay of Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. It is ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint status report within seven days of Congress restoring appropriations to the Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 11, 2019. (JK)
January 11, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Stay (Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse in Appropriations) by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #23 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before January 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 20, 2018. (JK)
November 14, 2018 Filing 23 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian)
November 14, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney April Denise Seabrook (Braswell, Marina)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #21 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 9/17/2018. (JK)
September 14, 2018 Filing 21 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Seabrook, April)
September 10, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/14/2018. (JK)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' #20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File the Status Report. Accordingly, the status report shall be filed on or before September 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 10, 2018. (JK)
September 4, 2018 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Joint Status Report by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Seabrook, April)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #19 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 19, 2018. (JK)
June 8, 2018 Filing 19 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Seabrook, April)
May 21, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendall Eugene Wangsgard on behalf of CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Wangsgard, Kendall)
May 10, 2018 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/7/2018 (Busen, Carey)
May 10, 2018 NOTICE OF ERROR re #16 Affidavit; emailed to cbusen@bakerlaw.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. Refile using the event under Initial Pleadings and Service, Service of Process and the select Summons Returned Executed as to... (ztd, )
May 9, 2018 Filing 16 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey) Modified on 5/10/2018 (td).
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the Joint Status Report no later than June 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 8, 2018. (JK)
May 7, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Seabrook, April)
April 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/7/2018. (JK)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed on or before May 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 6, 2018. (JK)
April 6, 2018 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Memorandum in Support Thereof by U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 21, 2018. (JK)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 21, 2018. (JK)
March 21, 2018 NOTICE OF ERROR re #9 Affidavit; emailed to cbusen@bakerlaw.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please note correct docket entry for future reference: Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant on the Service of Process menu; Do not refile. (znmw, )
March 20, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT served on 3/16/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/16/2018. (See Docket Entries #9 and #10 to view documents). (znmw)
March 20, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- A. Mackenna White, :Firm- Baker Hostetler LLP, :Address- 45 Rockefeller Plaza, 14th Floor, New York, New York 10111. Phone No. - 212-847-2829. Fax No. - 212-589-4201 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5381958. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Busen, Carey)
March 20, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nichole L. Sterling, :Firm- Baker Hostetler LLP, :Address- 45 Rockefeller Plaza, 14th Floor, New York, New York 10111. Phone No. - 212-589-4282. Fax No. - 212-589-4201 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5381916. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Busen, Carey)
March 20, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [USAID] by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey)
March 20, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [HHS] by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey)
March 16, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/8/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/7/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/7/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/6/2018.) (See Docket Entries #5 , #6 and #7 to view documents. (znmw)
March 15, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [US Department of State] by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey)
March 15, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [Sessions] by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey)
March 15, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE [Liu] by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey)
March 1, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(jd)
February 27, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (jd)
February 27, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Busen, Carey)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Carey S. Busen on behalf of CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Busen, Carey)
February 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, US DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5350575) filed by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons HHS, #9 Summons Lui, #10 Summons Sessions, #11 Summons State Department, #12 Summons USAID)(Busen, Carey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY v. US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY
Represented By: Carey S. Busen
Represented By: Nichole L. Sterling
Represented By: Kendall Eugene Wangsgard
Represented By: A. Mackenna White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Brenda A. Gonzalez
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Represented By: Michael A. Tilghman
Represented By: April Denise Seabrook
Represented By: Brenda A Gonzalez
Represented By: Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Brenda A. Gonzalez
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Represented By: Michael A. Tilghman
Represented By: April Denise Seabrook
Represented By: Brenda A Gonzalez
Represented By: Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Represented By: Brenda A. Gonzalez
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Represented By: Michael A. Tilghman
Represented By: April Denise Seabrook
Represented By: Brenda A Gonzalez
Represented By: Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?