LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW et al v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Plaintiff: NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER and LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW
Defendant: OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Case Number: 1:2018cv00645
Filed: March 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to opposition to motion re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schaefer, Daniel)
October 28, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #28 Memorandum in Opposition was entered in error and refiled by counsel. (See Docket Entry #29 to view document) (jf)
October 25, 2019 Filing 29 Memorandum in opposition to re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Plaintiffs' Counter Statement, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bolstad, Sam)
October 25, 2019 Filing 28 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER. (Bolstad, Sam) Modified on 10/28/2019 (zjf).
October 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Opposition To Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment due by 10/25/2019. Defendant Reply due by 11/8/2019. (mac)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #27 motion for extension of time. Plaintiff shall file an opposition to defendants motion for summary judgment by no later than October 25, 2019. Defendant shall file its reply by no later than November 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/10/2019. (lcegs2)
October 10, 2019 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
July 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Motion For Summary Judgment due by 9/18/2019. Plaintiff Opposition due by 10/18/2019. Defendant Reply In Support Of Its Motion due by 10/30/2019. (mac)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of #25 the parties' joint status report and proposed schedule, the following schedule shall govern these proceedings. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by no later than September 18, 2019. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition by no later than October 18, 2019. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion by no later than October 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/10/2019. (lcegs2)
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
June 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2019. (mac)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of #24 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to submit another joint status report by no later than July 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/7/2019. (lcegs2)
June 7, 2019 Filing 24 Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
May 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/7/2019. (mac)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of #23 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than June 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/30/2019. (lcegs2)
April 12, 2019 Filing 23 Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
March 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/12/2019. (mac)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of #22 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than April 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/27/2019. (lcegs2)
March 1, 2019 Filing 22 Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
February 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2019 (mac)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of #21 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than March 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/1/2019. (lcegs2)
February 1, 2019 Filing 21 Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
December 12, 2018 Filing 20 Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
November 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/12/2018. (mac)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of #19 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than December 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/5/2018. (lcegs2)
November 5, 2018 Filing 19 Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
August 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Status Report due by 11/5/2018. (mac)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #18 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to submit a further status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than November 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/23/2018. (lcegs2)
August 22, 2018 Filing 18 Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
July 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 8/22/2018. (zcdw)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of #17 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to submit a further status with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than August 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 6, 2018. (lcegs2)
July 3, 2018 Filing 17 Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel)
June 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/3/2018 (mac)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to meet and confer regarding defendant's searches, including search terms, custodians, and the offices that will be searched, by no later than June 22, 2018. The parties are also directed to submit a status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than July 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 15, 2018. (lcegs2)
June 12, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Schaefer, Daniel)
June 12, 2018 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER. (Bolstad, Sam)
June 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/12/2018. (mac)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #14 the parties' joint request for an extension of time. The parties are directed to file their status report by no later than June 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 11, 2018. (lcegs2)
May 29, 2018 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Joint Status Report by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Haynes, Fred)
May 4, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 5/28/2018. (mac)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than May 28, 2018. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) the status of plaintiff's FOIA requests; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA requests; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA requests; (4) whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 3, 2018. (lcegs2)
May 2, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Whitaker, Claire)
April 25, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 4/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bolstad, Sam)
April 25, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/02/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bolstad, Sam)
April 25, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/2/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bolstad, Sam)
April 24, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Whitaker, Claire)
April 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M. Greenbaum on behalf of LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW (Greenbaum, Jon)
March 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Maya Raghu on behalf of LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER (Raghu, Maya)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 03/29/18. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 , #3 , #4 motions for leave to appear pro hac vice. Daniel Goldberger, Colin Wicker, and Sam Bolstad are hereby admitted pro hac vice to this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 27, 2018. (lcegs2)
March 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(jd)
March 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (jd)
March 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Samuel Bolstad, :Firm- Dorsey & Whitney LLP, :Address- 50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500, Minneapolis, MN 54402. Phone No. - 612.492.6531. Fax No. - 612.340.2868 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5383127. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Emily)
March 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Colin Wicker, :Firm- Dorsey & Whitney LLP, :Address- 50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500, Minneapolis, MN 55402. Phone No. - 612.492.6687. Fax No. - 612.340-2868 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5383100. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Emily)
March 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel Goldberger, :Firm- Dorsey & Whitney LLP, :Address- 51 West 52nd Street, New York, NY 10019-6119. Phone No. - 212.415.9200. Fax No. - 212.953.7201 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5383077. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Emily)
March 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5382875) filed by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Martin, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW et al v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Represented By: Claire M. Whitaker
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Represented By: Emily J. Martin
Represented By: Colin Wicker
Represented By: Daniel Goldberger
Represented By: Maya Raghu
Represented By: Sam Bolstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW
Represented By: Emily J. Martin
Represented By: Colin Wicker
Represented By: Daniel Goldberger
Represented By: Maya Raghu
Represented By: Sam Bolstad
Represented By: Jon M. Greenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?