MEJIA-MEJIA v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al Featured Case

A Guatemalan woman has filed a lawsuit against the Trump administration for allegedly "forcibly" separating her from her seven-year-old son after they crossed the border to seek asylum in the United States. News outlets report that this lawsuit is the first to challenge the government's removal of a specific child from a parent in the execution of current federal immigration policy.

Plaintiff: BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, ALEX AZAR and SCOTT LLOYD
Case Number: 1:2018cv01445
Filed: June 19, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Friedman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 9/28/2018. (tj)
September 20, 2018 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 plaintiff's consent motion for extension of time up to and including September 28, 2018 within which to file her reply to defendants' opposition to plaintiff's motion for declaratory relief. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 20, 2018. (MA)
September 20, 2018 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 19 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint AND Opposition to Motion for Declaratory Relief and Permanent Injunction by BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Mario)
September 17, 2018 20 RESPONSE re 16 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Motion to Dismiss COMBINED filed by ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS HOMAN, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT. (Fabian, Sarah)
September 14, 2018 19 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint AND Opposition to Motion for Declaratory Relief and Permanent Injunction by ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS HOMAN, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT (Fabian, Sarah)
September 5, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/14/2018 (tj)
September 4, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' unopposed motion 18 for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint and to respond to plaintiff's motion 16 for declaratory relief and permanent injunction. Agency and official-capacity defendants shall file a response to the amended complaint and opposition to the motion for declaratory relief and permanent injunction on or before September 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 4, 2018. (MA)
August 31, 2018 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Response of Agency and Official-Capacity Defendants to Amended Complaint and Motion for Declaratory Relief and Permanent Injunction by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy)
August 27, 2018 17 Joint STATUS REPORT by BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA. (Williams, Mario)
August 27, 2018 16 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment , MOTION for Permanent Injunction by BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Mario)
August 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/27/2018 (tj)
August 20, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a joint status report as to how they intend to proceed in this matter on or before Monday, August 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 20, 2018. (lcplf1)
August 7, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER re counsel's obligations under the Court's Local Rule 40.5 re related cases. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 7, 2018. (MA)
July 13, 2018 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12)(Williams, Mario)
June 29, 2018 13 NOTICE of Intent to Continue Prosecuting Case by BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA (Tate, Andrew) Modified t3ext on 7/3/2018 (ztd).
June 22, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Upon the representations of the parties in their joint status report 12 , plaintiff's emergency motion 4 for a temporary restraining order is denied as moot. Plaintiff shall inform the Court of the manner in which she intends to proceed in this case on or before June 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 22, 2018. (lcplf1)
June 22, 2018 12 Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT. (Fabian, Sarah)
June 21, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2018 re 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA. Parties advise the court of an agreement, and the Motion for TRO is DENIED for reasons discussed on the record. Joint status report due 6//29/18 (Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones.) (tj)
June 21, 2018 11 Memorandum in opposition to re 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by HENRY LUCERO, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, MICHAEL ZACKOWSKI. (Fabian, Sarah)
June 21, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting Motion 9 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dallas S. LePierre and Motion 10 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew R. Tate on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 21, 2018. (MA)
June 21, 2018 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrew R. Tate, :Firm- Nexus Derechos Humanos Attorneys, Inc., :Address- 44 Broad Street NW, Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-254-0442. Fax No. - 703-935-2453 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5546346. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew R. Tate)(Shoreman, John)
June 21, 2018 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dallas S. LePierre, :Firm- Nexus Derechos Humanos Attorneys Inc., :Address- 44 Broad Street NW, Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-254-0442. Fax No. - 703-935-2453 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5546309. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Dallas S. LePierre)(Shoreman, John)
June 20, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Simon, Jeremy)
June 20, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
June 20, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a hearing on plaintiff's emergency motion 4 for a temporary restraining order on June 21, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 20, 2018. (lcplf1)
June 20, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah B. Fabian on behalf of HENRY LUCERO, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, MICHAEL ZACKOWSKI (Fabian, Sarah)
June 20, 2018 6 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
June 20, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mario B. Williams on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 20, 2018. (lcplf1)
June 20, 2018 5 SUMMONS (16) Issued Electronically as to ALEX AZAR, WILLIAM K. BROOKS, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS HOMAN, SCOTT LLOYD, HENRY LUCERO, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, MICHAEL ZACKOWSKI. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
June 19, 2018 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA (Shoreman, John)
June 19, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mario B. Williams, :Firm- Nexus Derechos Humanos Attorneys, Inc., :Address- 44 Broad Street NW, Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-254-0442. Fax No. - 703-935-2453 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5542950. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Mario Williams)(Shoreman, John)
June 19, 2018 2 ERRATA by BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA 1 Complaint,,, filed by BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Errata)(Shoreman, John)
June 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman. (zmd)
June 19, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5540828) filed by BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Azar Summons, # 3 Summons Lucero Summons, # 4 Summons Sessions Summons, # 5 Summons McAleenan Summons, # 6 Summons Nielsen Summons, # 7 Summons Cissna Summons, # 8 Summons Zackowski Summons, # 9 Summons ORR Summons, # 10 Summons Lloyd Summons, # 11 Summons Homan Summons, # 12 Summons USCIS Summons, # 13 Summons CBP Summons, # 14 Summons HHS Summons, # 15 Summons DHS Summons, # 16 Summons ICE Summons, # 17 Summons Brooks Summons, # 18 Exhibit Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice and Declaration)(Shoreman, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/19/2018) (zmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEJIA-MEJIA v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEATA MARIANA DE JESUS MEJIA-MEJIA
Represented By: Dallas S. LePierre
Represented By: John M. Shoreman
Represented By: Andrew Tate
Represented By: Mario B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT
Represented By: Sarah B. Fabian
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS HOMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT LLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?