BONILLA et al v. SIZZLING EXPRESS-COLUMBIA PLAZA, INC. et al

Plaintiff: SANTANA HERNANDEZ BONILLA and RONNY CASTELLANOS PINEDA
Defendant: SIZZLING EXPRESS-COLUMBIA PLAZA, INC. and YONG JIN KIM
Case Number: 1:2018cv01520
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2018 6 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Zelikovitz, Justin)
July 25, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by YONG JIN KIM, SIZZLING EXPRESS-COLUMBIA PLAZA, INC..(Wilson, Albert)
July 18, 2018 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. YONG JIN KIM served on 7/5/2018, answer due 7/26/2018 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
July 18, 2018 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SIZZLING EXPRESS-COLUMBIA PLAZA, INC. served on 7/5/2018, answer due 7/26/2018 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
June 27, 2018 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to YONG JIN KIM, SIZZLING EXPRESS-COLUMBIA PLAZA, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
June 27, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth . (zsb)
June 26, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5555998) filed by SANTANA HERNANDEZ BONILLA, RONNY CASTELLANOS PINEDA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (2))(Zelikovitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BONILLA et al v. SIZZLING EXPRESS-COLUMBIA PLAZA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANTANA HERNANDEZ BONILLA
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONNY CASTELLANOS PINEDA
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIZZLING EXPRESS-COLUMBIA PLAZA, INC.
Represented By: Albert Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YONG JIN KIM
Represented By: Albert Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?