IN RE: MAYFAIR-CORCORAN, LLC
Defendant: MAYFAIR-CORCORAN, LLC
Appellant: PETER ODAGBODO
Interested Party: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE, BEN SOTO and FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv01526
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Appellant's brief shall be due on or before September 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/22/2018. (lcrmc1)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellants Brief by PETER ODAGBODO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levin, Robert)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zrdj)
July 26, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Bankruptcy Court case number 17-00513-SMT. Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by PETER ODAGBODO.(zrdj)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File for failure to comply with the requirements for such a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1). Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/24/2018. (lcrmc1)
July 24, 2018 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by PETER ODAGBODO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levin, Robert)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-00513-SMT. filed by PETER ODAGBODO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: MAYFAIR-CORCORAN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYFAIR-CORCORAN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PETER ODAGBODO
Represented By: Robert N. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Guzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BEN SOTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: John G. McJunkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?