CALIXTO v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY et al Featured Case

A lawsuit filed by an immigrant private in the U.S. Army Reserve against the US Army for discharging him without warning or explanation.

Plaintiff: LUCAS CALIXTO, WANJING LI, HEMBASHIMA SAMBE, TOUNDE DJOHI, JINGQUAN QU, FANG LU, EMEKA UDEIGWE and ZEYUAN LI
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY and MARK T. ESPER
Case Number: 1:2018cv01551
Filed: June 28, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2018 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/03/2018. (LoBue, Joseph)
July 9, 2018 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/3/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/1/2018. (LoBue, Joseph)
July 3, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Allen Haugh on behalf of All Defendants (Haugh, Jeremy)
July 3, 2018 7 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LUCAS CALIXTO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AR 135-178, # 2 Exhibit AR 380-67, # 3 Exhibit DoDI 5200.02, # 4 Exhibit DoD Manual 5200.02, # 5 Exhibit ADRB Overview)(LoBue, Joseph)
July 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file excerpted and highlighted Army Regulations, DOD Instructions due by 7/3/2018. Responses due by 7/16/2018. Reply due by 7/19/2018. (gdf)
July 2, 2018 Minute Entry for Telephone Conference proceedings held on 7/2/18, before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle, in Chambers. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (gdf)
July 2, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER: Setting a hearing date and briefing schedule for plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, ECF No. 2. See ORDER for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 2, 2018. (lcesh1)
July 2, 2018 5 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MARK T. ESPER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
July 2, 2018 Case directly reassigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle pursuant to the minute order dated 6/30/18. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
June 30, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER in view of [1-2] notice of related case, which states that this case is related to civil case number 17-998, this case is hereby reassigned by consent to Judge Huvelle. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/30/2018. (lcegs3)
June 29, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas W. Baruch on behalf of LUCAS CALIXTO (Baruch, Douglas)
June 29, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Wollenberg on behalf of LUCAS CALIXTO (Wollenberg, Jennifer)
June 28, 2018 11 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LUCAS CALIXTO. Case related to Case No. 17-998. (zsb)
June 28, 2018 1 COMPLAINT and Prayer for Declaratory, Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive, and Administrative Procedure Act Relief against MARK T. ESPER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5562488) filed by LUCAS CALIXTO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Related Case, #3 Summons United States Department of the Army, #4 Summons Mark T. Esper, #5 Summons US Attorney General, #6 Summons US Attorney District of Columbia)(LoBue, Joseph)
June 28, 2018 1 COMPLAINT and Prayer for Declaratory, Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive, and Administrative Procedure Act Relief against MARK T. ESPER, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5562488) filed by LUCAS CALIXTO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Notice of Related Case, # 3 Summons United States Department of the Army, # 4 Summons Mark T. Esper, # 5 Summons US Attorney General, # 6 Summons US Attorney District of Columbia)(LoBue, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALIXTO v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCAS CALIXTO
Represented By: Joseph J. LoBue
Represented By: Douglas W. Baruch
Represented By: Jennifer M. Wollenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANJING LI
Represented By: Douglas W. Baruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEMBASHIMA SAMBE
Represented By: Douglas W. Baruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOUNDE DJOHI
Represented By: Douglas W. Baruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JINGQUAN QU
Represented By: Douglas W. Baruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FANG LU
Represented By: Douglas W. Baruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMEKA UDEIGWE
Represented By: Douglas W. Baruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZEYUAN LI
Represented By: Douglas W. Baruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Represented By: Jeremy Allen Haugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK T. ESPER
Represented By: Jeremy Allen Haugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?