ESTATE OF ROBERT P. HARTWICK et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
Plaintiff: SHARON SCHINETHA STALLWORTH, PATRICK GARRY, LARRY HILL, MEGHAN GARRY, SUSAN HINKHOUSE, ANDREW JOHN LENZ, RICHARD HINKHOUSE, CATHLEEN HOLY, CORY ROBERT HOWARD, SUSAN GARRY, MATTHEW GOWIN, LATHAN HILL, EDWARD PULIDO, YADIRA HOLMES, LINDA K. HARTWICK, HANNAH HARTWICK, TROY HINKHOUSE, ESTATE OF ROBERT P. HARTWICK, SOFIA T. BOYNTON, BRIAN MICHAEL YORK, KAREN PULIDO, JESSE D. CORTRIGHT, JIMMY OWEKA OCHAN, S.D., CLINTON CHARLES SPRINGER, II, MANUEL PULIDO, LEIGH ROUNTREE, K.P., GILBERT MATTHEW BOYNTON, CHAD HINKHOUSE, BRANDON HINKHOUSE, HALEY RUSSELL, DENISE BEYERS, JOSHUA ROUNTREE, ANGELA PULIDO, EARL MCCRACKEN, ROBERT GARRY, ARAGORN THOR WOLD, SHAUN D. GARRY, DALE M. HINKLEY, BRIDGET GARRY, LARRY CRUTCHER, CATHERINE S. WOLD, JASON THOMAS WOODLIFF, JOSHUA CRUTCHER, KADE L. HINKHOUSE, MARK HOWARD BEYERS, AMANDA GOWIN, LISA BIZAN, LUCY FREEMAN, CHRISTINE WEST, KHRISTIE ALEXA BISCARR, WALTER E. GRAJKO, GERARDO CONTRERAS, V. D., ANGELA CLAUSET, JOSE CONTRERAS, JR., IVONNE DOMINGUEZ, NICHOLAS ANTHONY WEST, J.M., EMILY KYLE MOORE, JOSE CONTRERAS, SR., ALEX CARY, MARGARET ROLLISON, KIMBERLY CARY, SANDRA CARY, JOHN JOSEPH MIKOLAJCIK, VICTOR DOMINGUEZ, KATHLEEN J. GRAJKO, NELLY VIVEROS, ROY ANTHONY BISCARR, JASON WILLIAM ROLLISON, NICHOLAS HAMILTON KYLE, NICHOLAS MICHAEL LATONA, SUZANE CARY, KYLA PARCELL, AUDREY LANGE, MICHAEL J. GRAJKO, JASON EDWARD MIKOLAJCIK, BRANDON JACKSON, N.M., Constance Lenz, CURTIS L. SHELL, B.C., GABRIEL ALEXANDER BISCARR, SOCORRO CONTRERAS, WILLARD GLEN FUHRMAN, ELIZABETH CONTRERAS, ANTONIO APONTE, CHARLES EUGENE RUSSELL, MICHAEL RAYMOND KYLE, DAVID R. BAXTER, SR. and JOHN WILLIAM FUHRMAN
Defendant: BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN, NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, BANK MELLI IRAN, IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY, ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS and MELLI BANK PLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01612
Filed: July 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The Court shall GRANT Plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. See Order for further details, including instructions for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 15, 2018. (lcckk1)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Amended Complaint,,, by ANTONIO APONTE, B.C., DAVID R. BAXTER, SR, DENISE BEYERS, MARK HOWARD BEYERS, GABRIEL ALEXANDER BISCARR, KHRISTIE ALEXA BISCARR, ROY ANTHONY BISCARR, LISA BIZAN, GILBERT MATTHEW BOYNTON, SOFIA T. BOYNTON, ALEX CARY, KIMBERLY CARY, SANDRA CARY, SUZANE CARY, ANGELA CLAUSET, ELIZABETH CONTRERAS, GERARDO CONTRERAS, JOSE CONTRERAS, SR, JOSE CONTRERAS, JR, SOCORRO CONTRERAS, JESSE D. CORTRIGHT, JOSHUA CRUTCHER, LARRY CRUTCHER, V. D., IVONNE DOMINGUEZ, VICTOR DOMINGUEZ, ESTATE OF ROBERT P. HARTWICK, LUCY FREEMAN, JOHN WILLIAM FUHRMAN, WILLARD GLEN FUHRMAN, BRIDGET GARRY, MEGHAN GARRY, PATRICK GARRY, ROBERT GARRY, SHAUN D. GARRY, SUSAN GARRY, AMANDA GOWIN, MATTHEW GOWIN, KATHLEEN J. GRAJKO, MICHAEL J. GRAJKO, WALTER E. GRAJKO, HANNAH HARTWICK, LINDA K. HARTWICK, LARRY HILL, LATHAN HILL, BRANDON HINKHOUSE, CHAD HINKHOUSE, KADE L. HINKHOUSE, RICHARD HINKHOUSE, SUSAN HINKHOUSE, TROY HINKHOUSE, DALE M. HINKLEY, YADIRA HOLMES, CATHLEEN HOLY, CORY ROBERT HOWARD, J.M., BRANDON JACKSON, K.P., MICHAEL RAYMOND KYLE, NICHOLAS HAMILTON KYLE, AUDREY LANGE, NICHOLAS MICHAEL LATONA, ANDREW JOHN LENZ, Constance Lenz, EARL MCCRACKEN, JASON EDWARD MIKOLAJCIK, JOHN JOSEPH MIKOLAJCIK, EMILY KYLE MOORE, N.M., JIMMY OWEKA OCHAN, KYLA PARCELL, ANGELA PULIDO, EDWARD PULIDO, KAREN PULIDO, MANUEL PULIDO, MANUEL PULIDO, JASON WILLIAM ROLLISON, MARGARET ROLLISON, JOSHUA ROUNTREE, LEIGH ROUNTREE, CHARLES EUGENE RUSSELL, HALEY RUSSELL, S.D., CURTIS L. SHELL, CLINTON CHARLES SPRINGER, II, SHARON SCHINETHA STALLWORTH, NELLY VIVEROS, CHRISTINE WEST, NICHOLAS ANTHONY WEST, ARAGORN THOR WOLD, CATHERINE S. WOLD, JASON THOMAS WOODLIFF, BRIAN MICHAEL YORK (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ANTONIO APONTE, B.C., DAVID R. BAXTER, SR, DENISE BEYERS, MARK HOWARD BEYERS, GABRIEL ALEXANDER BISCARR, KHRISTIE ALEXA BISCARR, ROY ANTHONY BISCARR, LISA BIZAN, GILBERT MATTHEW BOYNTON, SOFIA T. BOYNTON, ALEX CARY, KIMBERLY CARY, SANDRA CARY, SUZANE CARY, ANGELA CLAUSET, ELIZABETH CONTRERAS, GERARDO CONTRERAS, JOSE CONTRERAS, SR, JOSE CONTRERAS, JR, SOCORRO CONTRERAS, JESSE D. CORTRIGHT, JOSHUA CRUTCHER, LARRY CRUTCHER, V. D., IVONNE DOMINGUEZ, VICTOR DOMINGUEZ, ESTATE OF ROBERT P. HARTWICK, LUCY FREEMAN, JOHN WILLIAM FUHRMAN, WILLARD GLEN FUHRMAN, BRIDGET GARRY, MEGHAN GARRY, PATRICK GARRY, ROBERT GARRY, SHAUN D. GARRY, SUSAN GARRY, AMANDA GOWIN, MATTHEW GOWIN, KATHLEEN J. GRAJKO, MICHAEL J. GRAJKO, WALTER E. GRAJKO, HANNAH HARTWICK, LINDA K. HARTWICK, LARRY HILL, LATHAN HILL, BRANDON HINKHOUSE, CHAD HINKHOUSE, KADE L. HINKHOUSE, RICHARD HINKHOUSE, SUSAN HINKHOUSE, TROY HINKHOUSE, DALE M. HINKLEY, YADIRA HOLMES, CATHLEEN HOLY, CORY ROBERT HOWARD, J.M., BRANDON JACKSON, K.P., MICHAEL RAYMOND KYLE, NICHOLAS HAMILTON KYLE, AUDREY LANGE, NICHOLAS MICHAEL LATONA, ANDREW JOHN LENZ, Constance Lenz, EARL MCCRACKEN, JASON EDWARD MIKOLAJCIK, JOHN JOSEPH MIKOLAJCIK, EMILY KYLE MOORE, N.M., JIMMY OWEKA OCHAN, KYLA PARCELL, ANGELA PULIDO, EDWARD PULIDO, KAREN PULIDO, MANUEL PULIDO, MANUEL PULIDO, JASON WILLIAM ROLLISON, MARGARET ROLLISON, JOSHUA ROUNTREE, LEIGH ROUNTREE, CHARLES EUGENE RUSSELL, HALEY RUSSELL, S.D., CURTIS L. SHELL, CLINTON CHARLES SPRINGER, II, SHARON SCHINETHA STALLWORTH, NELLY VIVEROS, CHRISTINE WEST, NICHOLAS ANTHONY WEST, ARAGORN THOR WOLD, CATHERINE S. WOLD, JASON THOMAS WOODLIFF, BRIAN MICHAEL YORK re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to File, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Nations, Howard)
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by NICHOLAS ANTHONY WEST, J.M., JOHN JOSEPH MIKOLAJCIK, ROY ANTHONY BISCARR, KYLA PARCELL, DAVID R. BAXTER, SR, BRANDON JACKSON, GERARDO CONTRERAS, KATHLEEN J. GRAJKO, Constance Lenz, ANTONIO APONTE, WALTER E. GRAJKO, JOHN WILLIAM FUHRMAN, JASON EDWARD MIKOLAJCIK, EMILY KYLE MOORE, AUDREY LANGE, GABRIEL ALEXANDER BISCARR, KHRISTIE ALEXA BISCARR, JOSE CONTRERAS, JR, ANGELA CLAUSET, SUZANE CARY, MARGARET ROLLISON, NICHOLAS MICHAEL LATONA, ALEX CARY, V.D., B.C., SOCORRO CONTRERAS, MICHAEL J. GRAJKO, MICHAEL RAYMOND KYLE, VICTOR DOMINGUEZ, KIMBERLY CARY, IVONNE DOMINGUEZ, NICHOLAS HAMILTON KYLE, CHRISTINE WEST, LUCY FREEMAN, SANDRA CARY, NELLY VIVEROS, JASON WILLIAM ROLLISON, N.M., WILLARD GLEN FUHRMAN, CHARLES EUGENE RUSSELL, CURTIS L. SHELL, JOSE CONTRERAS, SR, ELIZABETH CONTRERAS.(Nations, Howard)
July 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs appearing in the July 7, 2018 Complaint shall file, under seal, a list containing the names and residential addresses of all Plaintiffs by AUGUST 21, 2018. (dot)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' #2 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal. Plaintiffs appearing in the July 7, 2018 Complaint shall file, under seal, a list containing the names and residential addresses of all Plaintiffs by AUGUST 21, 2018. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 23, 2018. (lcckk1)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received an electronic copy of Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint, which consists of 604 pages. In light of the length, Plaintiffs also shall deliver a courtesy copy to the Court Security Officer at the loading dock located at Third and C Streets (not the Clerk's Office or Chambers). Order Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, ECF No. #4 , ¶ 14. The courtesy copy shall be appropriately bound and tabbed for ease of reference. Id. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 23, 2018. (lcckk1)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 07/11/18. (DM)
July 9, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN, BANK MELLI IRAN, IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS, MELLI BANK PLC, NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd)
July 9, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zjd)
July 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to file Plaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by DENISE BEYERS, MARK HOWARD BEYERS, LISA BIZAN, GILBERT MATTHEW BOYNTON, SOFIA T. BOYNTON, JESSE D. CORTRIGHT, JOSHUA CRUTCHER, LARRY CRUTCHER, Estate of Robert P. Hartwick, BRIDGET GARRY, MEGHAN GARRY, PATRICK GARRY, ROBERT GARRY, SHAUN D. GARRY, SUSAN GARRY, AMANDA GOWIN, MATTHEW GOWIN, HANNAH HARTWICK, LINDA K. HARTWICK, LARRY HILL, LATHAN HILL, BRANDON HINKHOUSE, CHAD HINKHOUSE, KADE L. HINKHOUSE, RICHARD HINKHOUSE, SUSAN HINKHOUSE, TROY HINKHOUSE, DALE M. HINKLEY, YADIRA HOLMES, CATHLEEN HOLY, COREY ROBERT HOWARD, K.P., ANDREW JOHN LENZ, EARL MCCRACKEN, JIMMY OWEKA OCHAN, ANGELA PULIDO, EDWARD PULIDO, KAREN PULIDO, MANUEL "MANNIE&qu PULIDO, MANUEL PULIDO, JOSHUA ROUNTREE, LEIGH ROUNTREE, HALEY RUSSELL, S.D., CLINTON CHARLES SPRINGER, II, SHARON SCHINETHA STALLWORTH, ARAGORN THOR WOLD, CATHERINE S. WOLD, JASON THOMAS WOODLIFF, BRIAN MICHAEL YORK (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard) Modified relief on 7/11/2018 (ztd).
July 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN, BANK MELLI IRAN, IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS, MELLI BANK PLC, NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5575560) filed by KAREN PULIDO, K.P., KADE L. HINKHOUSE, ARAGORN THOR WOLD, CHAD HINKHOUSE, HALEY RUSSELL, JOSHUA CRUTCHER, Estate of Robert P. Hartwick, LARRY CRUTCHER, CATHLEEN HOLY, JIMMY OWEKA OCHAN, PATRICK GARRY, BRANDON HINKHOUSE, LISA BIZAN, LATHAN HILL, SHAUN D. GARRY, LEIGH ROUNTREE, EARL MCCRACKEN, BRIAN MICHAEL YORK, TROY HINKHOUSE, COREY ROBERT HOWARD, EDWARD PULIDO, ANGELA PULIDO, DALE M. HINKLEY, SOFIA T. BOYNTON, SUSAN GARRY, RICHARD HINKHOUSE, BRIDGET GARRY, DENISE BEYERS, SUSAN HINKHOUSE, LARRY HILL, ANDREW JOHN LENZ, JESSE D. CORTRIGHT, AMANDA GOWIN, MANUEL "MANNIE&qu PULIDO, HANNAH HARTWICK, CLINTON CHARLES SPRINGER, II, S.D., MARK HOWARD BEYERS, JASON THOMAS WOODLIFF, GILBERT MATTHEW BOYNTON, CATHERINE S. WOLD, MATTHEW GOWIN, LINDA K. HARTWICK, MANUEL PULIDO, MEGHAN GARRY, YADIRA HOLMES, JOSHUA ROUNTREE, ROBERT GARRY, SHARON SCHINETHA STALLWORTH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Islamic Republi of Iran, #3 Summons The Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corps, #4 Summons Iranian Ministry of Intelligence & Security, #5 Summons Bank Markazi Jomhouri Islami Iran, #6 Summons Bank Melli Iran, #7 Summons Melli Bank PLC, #8 Summons National Iranian Oil Company)(Nations, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTATE OF ROBERT P. HARTWICK et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON SCHINETHA STALLWORTH
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK GARRY
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY HILL
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGHAN GARRY
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN HINKHOUSE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW JOHN LENZ
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD HINKHOUSE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHLEEN HOLY
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORY ROBERT HOWARD
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN GARRY
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW GOWIN
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATHAN HILL
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD PULIDO
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YADIRA HOLMES
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA K. HARTWICK
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANNAH HARTWICK
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY HINKHOUSE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF ROBERT P. HARTWICK
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOFIA T. BOYNTON
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN MICHAEL YORK
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN PULIDO
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE D. CORTRIGHT
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY OWEKA OCHAN
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.D.
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLINTON CHARLES SPRINGER, II
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL PULIDO
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEIGH ROUNTREE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.P.
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILBERT MATTHEW BOYNTON
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD HINKHOUSE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON HINKHOUSE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HALEY RUSSELL
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE BEYERS
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA ROUNTREE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA PULIDO
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARL MCCRACKEN
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT GARRY
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARAGORN THOR WOLD
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAUN D. GARRY
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE M. HINKLEY
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIDGET GARRY
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY CRUTCHER
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHERINE S. WOLD
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON THOMAS WOODLIFF
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA CRUTCHER
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KADE L. HINKHOUSE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK HOWARD BEYERS
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA GOWIN
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA BIZAN
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCY FREEMAN
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE WEST
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KHRISTIE ALEXA BISCARR
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER E. GRAJKO
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERARDO CONTRERAS
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. D.
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA CLAUSET
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE CONTRERAS, JR.
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IVONNE DOMINGUEZ
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS ANTHONY WEST
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M.
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMILY KYLE MOORE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE CONTRERAS, SR.
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX CARY
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET ROLLISON
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY CARY
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA CARY
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN JOSEPH MIKOLAJCIK
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR DOMINGUEZ
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN J. GRAJKO
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NELLY VIVEROS
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY ANTHONY BISCARR
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON WILLIAM ROLLISON
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS HAMILTON KYLE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS MICHAEL LATONA
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANE CARY
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLA PARCELL
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUDREY LANGE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL J. GRAJKO
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON EDWARD MIKOLAJCIK
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON JACKSON
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.M.
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Lenz
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS L. SHELL
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.C.
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIEL ALEXANDER BISCARR
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOCORRO CONTRERAS
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLARD GLEN FUHRMAN
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH CONTRERAS
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO APONTE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES EUGENE RUSSELL
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL RAYMOND KYLE
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID R. BAXTER, SR.
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN WILLIAM FUHRMAN
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK MELLI IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELLI BANK PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?