PINKETT v. DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP. et al

Plaintiff: RENE PINKETT
Defendant: VEE INTERNATIONAL, INC., DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP., JOHN DOE, INC. and BLUSH NOVELTIES
Case Number: 1:2018cv01656
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2018 8 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP.. (Freeman, Alan)
August 6, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of LISA M. MORGAN. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/6/2018. (lcjeb3)
August 3, 2018 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lisa M. Morgan, :Firm- The Law Offices of Frank F. Daily, P.A., :Address- 11350 McCormick Rd., EP III, Ste. 704, Hunt Valley, MD 21031. Phone No. - 410-584-9443. Fax No. - 410-584-9619 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5621068. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BLUSH NOVELTIES, VEE INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Out of State Attorney, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Byers, Larissa)
August 3, 2018 6 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by RENE PINKETT. (Denson, Shaketta)
July 24, 2018 5 Receipt on 07/24/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 18ca3050. (zrdj)
July 20, 2018 4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Freeman, Alan)
July 17, 2018 3 NOTICE to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal. (zmd)
July 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmd)
July 13, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP.. (Freeman, Alan)
July 13, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 003050 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5586911 filed by DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Superior Court Documents)(Freeman, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PINKETT v. DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VEE INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Larissa N. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. LEONARD'S HEALTHCARE CORP.
Represented By: Alan M. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUSH NOVELTIES
Represented By: Lisa M. Morgan
Represented By: Larissa N. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENE PINKETT
Represented By: Benjamin Tederick Boscolo
Represented By: Shaketta Ayana Denson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?