EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY v. 1841 MONROE STREET LLC et al
Plaintiff: EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: FREDERICK C HAGGARD, ATIENO OKELO, DISTRICT HOME BUZZ, LLC, 1841 MONROE STREET LLC, ROBERT L WILLIAMS, UNIVERSAL UNLIMITED LLC, CHRISTINE L HAGGARD, FREDERICK C. HAGGARD, ROBERT L. WILLIAMS and CHRISTINE L. HAGGARD
Case Number: 1:2018cv01672
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/1/2018, (tj)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before October 1, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/23/2018. (lcrc1)
August 23, 2018 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by 1841 MONROE STREET LLC, DISTRICT HOME BUZZ, LLC, ATIENO OKELO, ROBERT L. WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonald, Kathleen) Modified event on 8/28/2018 (ztd).
August 17, 2018 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNIVERSAL UNLIMITED LLC served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018 (Harrison, Chelsea)
August 17, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY as to UNIVERSAL UNLIMITED LLC. (Harrison, Chelsea)
August 10, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ATIENO OKELO served on 8/4/2018, answer due 8/25/2018 (Harrison, Chelsea)
August 10, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERT L. WILLIAMS served on 8/4/2018, answer due 8/25/2018 (Harrison, Chelsea)
August 10, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DISTRICT HOME BUZZ, LLC served on 8/4/2018, answer due 8/25/2018 (Harrison, Chelsea)
August 10, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. 1841 MONROE STREET LLC served on 8/4/2018, answer due 8/28/2018 (Harrison, Chelsea) Modified on 8/13/2018 to correct serve/answer due date (jf).
August 7, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FREDERICK C. HAGGARD served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018 (Harrison, Chelsea)
August 7, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTINE L. HAGGARD served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018 (Harrison, Chelsea)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea C. Harrison on behalf of EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY (Harrison, Chelsea)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Chelsea Carol Harrison is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/01/2018. (lcrc1)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Chelsea Carol Harrison, :Firm- Adams and Reese LLP, :Address- 101 East Kennedy Blvd, Suite 4000, Tampa, FL 33602. Phone No. - 813-227-5537. Fax No. - 813-402-2887 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5612804. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Chelsea Harrison, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonner, Charles)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 ERRATA re #1 COMPLAINT (CORRECTED AS TO CAPTION ONLY) against 1841 MONROE STREET LLC, DISTRICT HOME BUZZ, LLC, CHRISTINE L HAGGARD, FREDERICK C HAGGARD, ATIENO OKELO, UNIVERSAL UNLIMITED LLC, ROBERT L WILLIAMS filed by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bonner, Charles) Modified on 7/18/2018 to correct docket text (jf).
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to 1841 MONROE STREET LLC, DISTRICT HOME BUZZ, LLC, CHRISTINE L HAGGARD, FREDERICK C HAGGARD, ATIENO OKELO, UNIVERSAL UNLIMITED LLC, ROBERT L WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth)
July 16, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsth)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY. Case related to Case No. 17-007872. (Bonner, Charles)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Complaint,, filed by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY.(Bonner, Charles)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against 1841 MONROE STREET LLC, DISTRICT HOME BUZZ, LLC, CHRISTINE L HAGGARD, FREDERICK C HAGGARD, ATIENO OKELO, UNIVERSAL UNLIMITED LLC, ROBERT L WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5589096) filed by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Summons to 1841 Monroe Street LLC, #7 Summons Summons to Atieno Okelo, #8 Summons Summons to Christine Haggard, #9 Summons Summons to Frederick Haggard, #10 Summons Summons to District Home Buzz LLC, #11 Summons Summons to Robert Williams, #12 Summons Summons to Universal Unlimited LLC)(Bonner, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY v. 1841 MONROE STREET LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREDERICK C HAGGARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATIENO OKELO
Represented By: Kathleen M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT HOME BUZZ, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1841 MONROE STREET LLC
Represented By: Kathleen M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT L WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL UNLIMITED LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE L HAGGARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FREDERICK C. HAGGARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT L. WILLIAMS
Represented By: Kathleen M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE L. HAGGARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Charles Britton Bonner
Represented By: Chelsea C. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?