NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

Plaintiff: NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv01673
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint by September 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/13/2018. (lctjk3)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Cohen, Jason)
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/23/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/22/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/23/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 7/20/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A)(Upton Fulford, Martha)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth)
July 16, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsth)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Upton Fulford, Martha)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5589518) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Upton Fulford, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Jason Todd Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Represented By: Martha Upton Fulford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?