LOPEZ-SALES v. SESSIONS et al

Plaintiff: NORMA AMABILIA LOPEZ-SALES
Defendant: ALEX AZAR, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JOHN DOE, 1, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, THOMAS HOMAN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III and L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Case Number: 1:2018cv01700
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Alien Detainee (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 motion for admission pro hac vice of Dallas S. LePierre on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 30, 2018. (MA)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dallas S. LePierre, :Firm- Nexus Derechos Humanos Attorneys, Inc., :Address- 44 Broad Street NW, Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-254-0442. Fax No. - 703-935-2453 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5664540. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NORMA AMABILIA LOPEZ-SALES (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dallas S. LePierre)(Shoreman, John)
August 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/27/2018 (tj)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a joint status report as to how they intend to proceed in this matter on or before Monday, August 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 20, 2018. (lcplf1)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re counsel's obligations under the Court's Local Rule 40.5 re related cases. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 7, 2018. (MA)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mario B. Williams on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 6, 2018. (MA)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 Case directly reassigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman by consent as related. Judge Amy Berman Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) Modified on 8/3/2018 to show that this is reassigned as a related case (jth).
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS HOMAN, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, and U.S. Attorney (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
July 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 07/31/2018. (zsb)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by NORMA AMABILIA LOPEZ-SALES (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shoreman, John)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by NORMA AMABILIA LOPEZ-SALES.(Shoreman, John)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mario B. Williams, :Firm- Nexus Derechos Humanos Attorneys, Inc., :Address- 44 Broad Street NW, Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-254-0442. Fax No. - 703-935-2453 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5597434. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NORMA AMABILIA LOPEZ SALES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mario Williams)(Shoreman, John)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND MONETARY RELIEF against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5597131) filed by NORMA AMABILIA LOPEZ SALES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summonses, #3 Exhibit Ex 1, #4 Exhibit Ex 2, #5 Exhibit Ex 3, #6 Exhibit Ex 4, #7 Exhibit Ex 5, #8 Exhibit Ex 6, #9 Exhibit Ex 7, #10 Exhibit Ex 8, #11 Exhibit Ex 9, #12 Exhibit Ex 10, #13 Exhibit Ex 11, #14 Exhibit Ex 12, #15 Exhibit Ex 13, #16 Exhibit Ex 14)(Shoreman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOPEZ-SALES v. SESSIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT LLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS HOMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMA AMABILIA LOPEZ-SALES
Represented By: John M. Shoreman
Represented By: Dallas S. LePierre
Represented By: Mario B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?