WORLD BUSINESS LENDERS, LLC v. BERGER
Plaintiff: WORLD BUSINESS LENDERS, LLC
Defendant: JAMES E. BERGER
Case Number: 1:2018cv01750
Filed: July 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Case Remanded to Superior Court re #13 Order on Motion to Remand. (jf)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER re: #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Motion for Sanctions. See attached for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/11/2018. (lcapm3)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Sanctions filed by WORLD BUSINESS LENDERS, LLC. (Moiz, Ibrahim) .
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Sanctions filed by JAMES E. BERGER. (tth)
September 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Opposition due by 10/9/2018. (zjd)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to the Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Remand. Defendant's Opposition shall now be due on or before October 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/27/2018. (lcapm3)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Sanctions by JAMES E. BERGER (jf)
September 4, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response due by 9/24/2018. (zjd)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER advising Defendant to respond no later than September 24, 2018, to Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Remand and for Sanctions or risk remand of the case and an award of sanctions against Defendant. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/04/2018. (lcapm3)
August 24, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #8 NOTICE of Appearance of Douglas E. Plocki was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using their assigned login/password. (Counsel should review LCvR 5.4(b)OBTAINING AND USING ELECTRONIC FILING PASSWORD; SIGNATURE;CONSENT TO SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MEANS) (jf)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance of Douglas E. Plocki by WORLD BUSINESS LENDERS, LLC (Moiz, Ibrahim) Modified on 8/24/2018 (jf).
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand , MOTION for Sanctions by WORLD BUSINESS LENDERS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas E. Plocki (Ex. A), #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit A-8, #10 Exhibit A-9, #11 Exhibit A-10, #12 Exhibit A-11, #13 Exhibit A-12, #14 Exhibit A-13, #15 Exhibit A-14, #16 Exhibit A-15, #17 Exhibit A-16, #18 Exhibit A-17, #19 Exhibit A-18, #20 Exhibit A-19, #21 Exhibit A-20, #22 Declaration of Shannon Flood (Ex. B), #23 Exhibit B-1, #24 Exhibit B-2, #25 Exhibit B-3, #26 Exhibit B-4, #27 Declaration of Eugene J. Benick (Ex. C), #28 Text of Proposed Order)(Moiz, Ibrahim)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WORLD BUSINESS LENDERS, LLC (Moiz, Ibrahim)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ibrahim A. Moiz on behalf of WORLD BUSINESS LENDERS, LLC (Moiz, Ibrahim)
August 14, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 8/28/2018. (zjd)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. It appears that Defendant has improperly removed this matter. Defendant shall, no later than August 28, 2018, show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and remanded to the D.C. Superior Court. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/14/2018. (lcapm3)
July 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice Confirming Service due by 8/9/2018. (zjd)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Defendant shall file a notice with the court confirming service of the #1 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff no later than August 9, 2018. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Defendant's address of record. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/30/2018. (lcapm3)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 Receipt on 7/27/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2018 LTB 001865. (zrdj)
July 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JAMES E. BERGER from Superior Court for DC, case number 2018 LTB 001865. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616093823) filed by JAMES E. BERGER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WORLD BUSINESS LENDERS, LLC v. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WORLD BUSINESS LENDERS, LLC
Represented By: Ibrahim A. Moiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES E. BERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?