PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY v. LEMMA HOLDINGS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: HASSON KENNY TAYLOR, LEMMA HOLDINGS, LLC and MARTIA CONNER
Case Number: 1:2018cv01782
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by LEMMA HOLDINGS, LLC.(Henry, Jeanett)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanett P. Henry on behalf of LEMMA HOLDINGS, LLC (Henry, Jeanett)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by MARTIA CONNER.(Winkelman, Michael)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 6, 2018. (lcbah1)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to MARTIA CONNER, LEMMA HOLDINGS, LLC, HASSON KENNY TAYLOR. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(sth)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY re #1 Complaint,, Cover Sheet, filed by PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. Related document: #1 Complaint,, Cover Sheet, filed by PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY.(Schleifman, Paul)
July 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsth)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY . (Schleifman, Paul) Modified event title on 8/7/2018 (znmw).
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 ERRATA by PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY #1 Complaint,, Cover Sheet, filed by PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Complaint of Def Conner, #2 Policy of Peslic)(Schleifman, Paul)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LEMMA HOLDINGS, LLC dba BLISS, MARTIA CONNER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5612308), CIVIL COVER SHEET by PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY filed by PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification LCvR 7.1, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Schleifman, Paul) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/3/2018) (zsth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY v. LEMMA HOLDINGS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HASSON KENNY TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEMMA HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jeanett P. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIA CONNER
Represented By: Michael J. Winkelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Paul Steven Schleifman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?