HUMMER v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: LESTER L. HUMMER
Defendant: DAN RATTRAY and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2018cv01816
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of DAN RATTRAY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Nebeker, William)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/6/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/5/2018.) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/6/2018. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAN RATTRAY served on 8/6/2018 (ztth)
August 2, 2018 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DAN RATTRAY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tth)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAN RATTRAY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616093932) filed by LESTER L. HUMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 24, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUMMER v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN RATTRAY
Represented By: William Mark Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: William Mark Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESTER L. HUMMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?