CRABTREE et al v. PEDERO PIPE SUPPORT SYSTEMS USA LP
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, MICHAEL A. CRABTREE and BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND
Defendant: PEDERO PIPE SUPPORT SYSTEMS USA LP
Case Number: 1:2018cv01842
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE advising the parties of the court's relationship with Plaintiff's counsel. See the attached Notice for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/18/2018. (lcapm2)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney R. Richard Hopp's appearance on behalf of the Plaintiff is hereby withdrawn. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/18/2018. (lcapm2)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (R. Richard Hopp only) by BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, MICHAEL A. CRABTREE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hopp, R.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles William Gilligan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gilligan, Charles)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to PEDERO PIPE SUPPORT SYSTEMS USA LP. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
August 8, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PEDERO PIPE SUPPORT SYSTEMS USA LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5625740) filed by MICHAEL A. CRABTREE, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hopp, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRABTREE et al v. PEDERO PIPE SUPPORT SYSTEMS USA LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEDERO PIPE SUPPORT SYSTEMS USA LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PLCA NATIONAL PIPELINE TRAINING FUND
Represented By: R. Richard Hopp
Represented By: Charles William Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS AND PIPE LINE EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: R. Richard Hopp
Represented By: Charles William Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL A. CRABTREE
Represented By: R. Richard Hopp
Represented By: Charles William Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS NATIONAL TRAINING FUND
Represented By: R. Richard Hopp
Represented By: Charles William Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?