BOLANOS et al v. DISCOUNT AUTO SOUND, INC. et al

Plaintiff: PABLO PERALTA CERRANO and CESAR BOLANOS
Defendant: DISCOUNT AUTO SOUND, INC., LINDA HUYNH, SCOTT NGUYEN and JOHN VAN HUYNH
Case Number: 1:2018cv01865
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2018, at 9:30 AM, in Courtroom 28A, before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (kt)
September 26, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER FOR INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9-26-2018. (lcckk3)
September 26, 2018 8 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DISCOUNT AUTO SOUND, INC. (Wilson, Albert)
September 26, 2018 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by DISCOUNT AUTO SOUND, INC., JOHN VAN HUYNH, LINDA HUYNH, SCOTT NGUYEN.(Wilson, Albert)
September 5, 2018 NOTICE OF ERROR re #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer; emailed to awilson@vedalaw.com, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Do not refile. Reminder for future documents, please make sure that your case numbers and captions are correct. (ztd, )
September 4, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/28/2018. (dot)
September 4, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendants' #6 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' complaint was due by September 4, 2018. The #6 Motion seeks to extend Defendants' obligation to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint until September 28, 2018. Defendants' counsel explains that he requires this extension of time because he was not retained until August 31, 2018, and he needs additional time to draft an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Defendants' counsel represents that Plaintiffs have consented to the relief sought on the condition that Defendants' counsel agrees to accept service on behalf of those Defendants who have not yet been served. Defendants' counsel has consented to this agreement. The Court GRANTS Defendants' #6 Motion. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by SEPTEMBER 28, 2018. For the future, the Court notes that motions for extensions of time must be filed at least four business days prior to the first affected deadline. See Order Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Kollar-Kotelly, ECF No. 3, ¶ 7. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/04/2018. (lcckk3)
September 2, 2018 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by DISCOUNT AUTO SOUND, INC., JOHN VAN HUYNH, LINDA HUYNH, SCOTT NGUYEN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Albert)
August 20, 2018 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SCOTT NGUYEN served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
August 20, 2018 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LINDA HUYNH served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018 (Zelikovitz, Justin)
August 20, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/20/18. (DM)
August 13, 2018 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DISCOUNT AUTO SOUND, INC., JOHN VAN HUYNH, LINDA HUYNH, SCOTT NGUYEN. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
August 8, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmd)
August 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5628305) filed by CESAR BOLANOS, PABLO PERALTA CERRANO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (4))(Zelikovitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOLANOS et al v. DISCOUNT AUTO SOUND, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISCOUNT AUTO SOUND, INC.
Represented By: Albert Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA HUYNH
Represented By: Albert Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT NGUYEN
Represented By: Albert Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN VAN HUYNH
Represented By: Albert Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PABLO PERALTA CERRANO
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CESAR BOLANOS
Represented By: Justin Derek Zelikovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?