PERLA FLORES v. KAJ CORPORATION et al

Plaintiff: FRANCISCA PERLA FLORES
Defendant: ALEX CHOE, KWI HWA CHOE, JUSTIN CHOE, KAJ CORPORATION D/B/A TONY'S BREAKFAST and KAJ CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv01891
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Due to settlement talks, the Court hereby VACATES the parties' Joint Status Report on discovery which was due October 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10-12-2018. (lcckk3)
October 10, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: Telephone Conference held on 10/10/2018. (lcgmh1)
October 1, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. (lcgmh1)
September 25, 2018 11 Featured Case MEDIATION STANDING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 9/25/18. (lcgmh1)
September 24, 2018 CASE DIRECTLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for mediation. (zmd)
September 24, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9-24-2018. (lcckk3)
September 24, 2018 9 Featured Case SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/24/2018. (kt)
September 24, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 9/24/2018. Initial Disclosures due by 10/24/2018; Motions to Amend Pleadings or Joinder of Parties due by 10/26/2018; Proponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B) & (C) Disclosures due by 1/22/2019; Opponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B) & (C) Disclosures due by 2/25/2019; Replies, if any, due by 3/8/2019; Joint Status Report due by 10/12/2018; Discovery to be completed by 3/25/2019; Mediation to conclude by 11/30/2018. Order forthcoming referring case for Mediation with Magistrate Judge Michael Harvey. A Status Conference is set for 3/29/2019, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 28A, before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards.) (kt)
September 19, 2018 8 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Amster, Michael)
September 13, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Counsel for the parties contacted chambers jointly on September 13, 2018, to request that the October 2, 2018 Initial Scheduling Conference be rescheduled to accommodate Plaintiff's counsel, who is in trial on that date. Accordingly, the Initial Scheduling Conference is rescheduled for September 24, 2018, at 3:00 p.m. in courtroom 28A, before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Both counsel have indicated that they are available on that date. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/13/18. (DM)
September 13, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
September 13, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Scheduling Conference on OCTOBER 2, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9-13-2018. (lcckk3)
September 12, 2018 6 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KAJ CORPORATION (Chong, Dennis)
September 12, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint by ALEX CHOE, JUSTIN CHOE, KWI HWA CHOE, KAJ CORPORATION.(Chong, Dennis)
August 22, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/22/18. (DM)
August 16, 2018 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX CHOE, JUSTIN CHOE, KWI HWA CHOE, KAJ CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth)
August 16, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET CORRECTED by FRANCISCA PERLA FLORES re #1 Complaint, filed by FRANCISCA PERLA FLORES. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by FRANCISCA PERLA FLORES.(Amster, Michael)
August 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsth)
August 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5636978) filed by FRANCISCA PERLA FLORES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Amster, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERLA FLORES v. KAJ CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX CHOE
Represented By: Dennis Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KWI HWA CHOE
Represented By: Dennis Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUSTIN CHOE
Represented By: Dennis Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAJ CORPORATION D/B/A TONY'S BREAKFAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAJ CORPORATION
Represented By: Dennis Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCA PERLA FLORES
Represented By: Michael K. Amster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?