STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE

Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: Doe John and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2018cv01894
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DISMISSING this action without prejudice pursuant to the plaintiff's #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a). The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 4, 2018. (lcbah4)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (Haire, Jessica)
September 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Status Report due by 12/3/2018. (tg)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING the plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 12, 2018. (lcbah4)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lansky, #2 Affidavit Fieser, #3 Affidavit Pasquale, #4 Affidavit Stalzer, #5 Memorandum in Support, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Haire, Jessica)
August 15, 2018 SUMMONS Not Issued as to JOHN DOE. (zmd) Modified filed date on 9/6/2018 (znmw).
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 15, 2018. (lcbah4)
August 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmd)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (Haire, Jessica)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5637390) filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haire, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Haire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?