BATTS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: RORI L. BATTS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv01908
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Referring Judge: Deborah A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10)(Littman, Matthew)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY.(Littman, Matthew)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Amended Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and finding as moot #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 09/07/2018. (lcdar3)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Clifford M. Farrell, :Address- 167 No. High Street, P.O. Box 15307, Columbus, OH 15037. Phone No. - 614-221-1827. Fax No. - 614-221-8612 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by RORI L. BATTS (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Osterhout, Karl)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Clifford M. Farrell, :Firm- Manring & Farrell, :Address- 167 No. High Street, P.O. Box 15307, Columbus, OH 15037. Phone No. - 614-221-1827. Fax No. - 614-221-8612 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5674877. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RORI L. BATTS (Osterhout, Karl)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 8/27/2018. (tth)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/27/2018. (Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/26/2018.) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/27/2018. (tth)
August 22, 2018 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for Report and Recommendation. (zsb)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsb)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/22/2018. (DAS)
August 22, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zsb)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/21/2018. (zsb)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RORI L. BATTS (zsb)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by RORI L. BATTS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(zsb)
August 13, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 08/13/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BATTS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: Matthew Jared Littman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RORI L. BATTS
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?