GUTIERREZ et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Plaintiff: MARIA IRMA GUTIERREZ DURON and KAREN YADIRA RODRIGUE GUTIERREZ
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ALEX AZAR, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, JOHN DOE 1, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, US Attorney General JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, L. FRANCIS CISSNA and JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv01958
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Alien Detainee (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 55 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/11/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/30/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/29/2018.); (See docket entry no. #44 to view.) (ztd)
September 28, 2018 Filing 54 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. Date of Service Upon U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES on 8/29/18 (Williams, Mario) Modified on 10/2/2018 (ztd).
September 28, 2018 Filing 53 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. Date of Service Upon U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES on 8/29/18 (Williams, Mario) Modified on 10/2/2018 (ztd).
September 28, 2018 Filing 52 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. Date of Service Upon JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III on 8/28/18 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Williams, Mario) Modified on 10/2/2018 (ztd).
September 28, 2018 Filing 51 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. Date of Service Upon OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT on 9/4/18 (Williams, Mario) Modified on 10/2/2018 (ztd).
September 28, 2018 Filing 50 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. Date of Service Upon KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN on 8/29/18 (Williams, Mario) Modified on 10/2/2018 (ztd).
September 28, 2018 Filing 49 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ate of Service Upon U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION on 8/30/18, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN 8/29/18 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Williams, Mario) Modified on 10/2/2018 (ztd).
September 28, 2018 Filing 48 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ate of Service Upon SCOTT LLOYD on 8/30/18 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Williams, Mario) Modified on 10/2/2018 (ztd).
September 28, 2018 Filing 47 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ate of Service Upon U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY on 8/29/18 (Williams, Mario) Modified on 10/2/2018 (ztd).
September 28, 2018 Filing 46 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ate of Service Upon L.F. CISSNA on 8/30/18 (Williams, Mario) Modified on 10/2/2018 (ztd).
September 28, 2018 Filing 45 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. Date of Service Upon U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION on 8/28/18 (Williams, Mario) Modified on 10/2/2018 (ztd).
September 28, 2018 Filing 44 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Williams, Mario)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of defendants' notice #43 of release of J.G. to his mother, plaintiffs' motion #4 for a temporary restraining order is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 26, 2018. (MA)
September 21, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Release of J.G. to His Mother by ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Haynes, Fred)
September 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 9/20/2018 re Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MARIA IRMA GUTIERREZ DURON, KAREN YADIRA RODRIGUE GUTIERREZ. Oral argument heard, and ruling reserved. Parties to advise the court by 9/21/18 at 5pm if there is an agreement to resolve this matter. (Court Reporter :Crystal Pilgrim.) (tj)
September 20, 2018 Filing 42 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 8/29/2018 (Williams, Mario)
September 20, 2018 Filing 41 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT served on 9/4/2018 (Williams, Mario)
September 20, 2018 Filing 40 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN served on 8/29/2018 (Williams, Mario)
September 20, 2018 Filing 39 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/29/2018 (Williams, Mario)
September 20, 2018 Filing 38 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/29/2018 (Williams, Mario)
September 20, 2018 Filing 37 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. L. FRANCIS CISSNA served on 8/30/2018 (Williams, Mario)
September 20, 2018 Filing 36 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 8/29/2018 (Williams, Mario)
September 20, 2018 Filing 35 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX AZAR served on 8/29/2018 (Williams, Mario)
September 20, 2018 Filing 34 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN K. MCALEENAN served on 8/30/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Williams, Mario)
September 20, 2018 Filing 33 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III served on 8/28/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Williams, Mario)
September 20, 2018 Filing 32 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SCOTT LLOYD served on 8/30/2018 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Williams, Mario)
September 19, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Subpoenas by MARIA IRMA GUTIERREZ DURON, KAREN YADIRA RODRIGUE GUTIERREZ (Williams, Mario)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #14 plaintiffs' motion for limited discovery in advance of the September 20, 2018 preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 18, 2018. (MA)
September 17, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by MARIA IRMA GUTIERREZ DURON, KAREN YADIRA RODRIGUE GUTIERREZ. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Karen Gutierrez)(Williams, Mario)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #20 plaintiffs' motion for testimony and attendance of minor child. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 17, 2018. (MA)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the United States may file a motion to quash any subpoenas that have been served on it or its agents, and third party Crittenton may file its own separate motion to quash any third party subpoenas that it may have received. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 17, 2018. (MA)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 defendants' consent emergency motion to supplement its opposition to the motion for discovery. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 17, 2018. (MA)
September 17, 2018 Filing 25 ERRATA by ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY #18 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, ALEX AZAR, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Haynes, Fred)
September 17, 2018 Filing 24 Emergency MOTION (on Consent) to Supplement Defendant's Opposition to the Motion for Discovery by ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Haynes, Fred) Modified relief on 9/18/2018 (ztd).
September 17, 2018 Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY re #22 Memorandum in Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Haynes, Fred)
September 17, 2018 Filing 22 Memorandum in opposition to re #20 MOTION for Order For Testimony and Attendance of Minor Child filed by ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Haynes, Fred)
September 14, 2018 Filing 21 Memorandum in opposition to re #14 MOTION for Discovery filed by ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Haynes, Fred)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendants shall file their response to plaintiffs' motion #20 for testimony and attendance of minor child by 12:00 p.m. on September 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 14, 2018. (lcplf1)
September 14, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Order For Testimony and Attendance of Minor Child by MARIA IRMA GUTIERREZ DURON, KAREN YADIRA RODRIGUE GUTIERREZ (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Mario)
September 13, 2018 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY re #18 Memorandum in Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Richard Zapata Declaration)(Haynes, Fred)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER denying as moot #17 defendants' consent motion for a 14-hour extension of time within which to respond to plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 13, 2018. (MA)
September 13, 2018 Filing 18 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Haynes, Fred)
September 12, 2018 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition to the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction of 14 Hours by ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Haynes, Fred)
September 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/14/2018 (tj)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 defendants' emergency consent motion for leave to file declarations under seal. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 12, 2018. (MA)
September 11, 2018 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION for Order on Consent Permitting the Parties to File Under Seal Declarations Containing Sensitive Information About J.G., a Minor by ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Haynes, Fred)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing defendants to respond to plaintiffs' motion #14 for discovery on or before September 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 11, 2018. (MA)
September 11, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Discovery by MARIA IRMA GUTIERREZ DURON, KAREN YADIRA RODRIGUE GUTIERREZ (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Mario)
September 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Replies due by 9/17/2018. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting briefing schedule for plaintiffs' motion #4 for a temporary restraining order. Defendant shall file a response and supporting affidavits on or before September 12, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file a reply and supporting affidavits on or before September 17, 2018. The motion shall be heard as a motion for a preliminary injunction on September 20, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 29A. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 7, 2018. (lcplf1)
September 6, 2018 Filing 12 Joint PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by MARIA IRMA GUTIERREZ DURON, KAREN YADIRA RODRIGUE GUTIERREZ. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Mario) Modified event title on 9/10/2018 (znmw).
September 5, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/6/2018 (tj)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Court intends to treat plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order #4 filed on August 24, 2018 as one for a preliminary injunction. The parties shall submit a joint report proposing a briefing schedule on or before September 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 5, 2018. (MA)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 motion for admission pro hac vice of Dallas S. LePierre on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 30, 2018. (MA) Modified text to add "minute" on 8/30/2018 (ztd).
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 motion for admission pro hac vice of Mario B. Williams on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 30, 2018. (MA)
August 29, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dallas S. LePierre, :Firm- Nexus Derechos Humanos Attorneys, Inc., :Address- 44 Broad Street NW, Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-254-0442. Fax No. - 703-935-2453 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5664509. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MARIA IRMA GUTIERREZ DURON, KAREN YADIRA RODRIGUE GUTIERREZ (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dallas S. LePierre)(Shoreman, John)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mario B. Williams, :Firm- Nexus Derechos Humanos Attorneys, Inc., :Address- 44 Broad Street NW, Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-254-0442. Fax No. - 703-935-2453 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5664458. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MARIA IRMA GUTIERREZ DURON, KAREN YADIRA RODRIGUE GUTIERREZ (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mario Williams)(Shoreman, John)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Fred Elmore Haynes on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Substituting for attorney William Mark Nebeker (Haynes, Fred)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Elmore Haynes on behalf of ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Haynes, Fred)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE Regarding Lack Of Service by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Nebeker, William)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Nebeker, William)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by MARIA IRMA GUTIERREZ DURON, KAREN YADIRA RODRIGUE GUTIERREZ (Shoreman, John)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants and U.S. Attorney (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
August 23, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman. (zsb)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MARIA IRMA GUTIERREZ DURON, KAREN YADIRA RODRIGUE GUTIERREZ. Case related to Case No. 18-1445, 18-1516, and 18-1700. (zsb)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX AZAR, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, JOHN DOE 1, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5651364) filed by MARIA IRMA GUTIERREZ DURON, KAREN YADIRA RODRIGUE GUTIERREZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Related Case Form, #3 Summons Proposed Summons for Defendants and U.S. Attorney)(Shoreman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUTIERREZ et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX AZAR
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT LLOYD
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Represented By: William Mark Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Fred Elmore Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA IRMA GUTIERREZ DURON
Represented By: John M. Shoreman
Represented By: Mario B. Williams
Represented By: Dallas S. LePierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN YADIRA RODRIGUE GUTIERREZ
Represented By: John M. Shoreman
Represented By: Mario B. Williams
Represented By: Dallas S. LePierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?