IVEY v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: STANLEY EUGENE IVEY
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv01963
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Referring Judge: Deborah A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/11/2018. (tth)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 10/3/2018. (tth)
October 1, 2018 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for full case management. (ad)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that this case is referred to a Magistrate Judge for full case management, excluding resolution of dispositive motions, for which the Magistrate Judge shall provide a report and recommendation, and trial. The parties are reminded, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 73.1, that this action may be referred for all purposes, including trial, upon the filing of an executed notice of consent by all parties. The Magistrate Judge will be randomly assigned by the Clerk's Office, and the appointed Magistrate Judge will schedule a conference with the parties as soon as possible. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 1, 2018. (lcdlf1)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) Modified on 10/4/2018 (zrdj).
September 27, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zrdj)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED". Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/24/2018. (zrdj)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STANLEY EUGENE IVEY (zsth)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION filed by STANLEY EUGENE IVEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zsth)
August 22, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/22/18. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IVEY v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANLEY EUGENE IVEY
Represented By: Joshua Christopher Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?