COSTER v. SCHWAT et al

Plaintiff: MARION COSTER
Defendant: SCHWAT REALTY LLC, PETER J. BONNELL, STEVEN F. SCHWAT, STEPHEN E. COX and UIP COMPANIES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01995
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UIP COMPANIES, INC. (jf)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying as moot Defendants' #4 Motion to Dismiss or to Stay the Action. As permitted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B), Plaintiff filed an Amended Complaint as a matter of right within 21 days of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. See Am. Compl., ECF No. 5. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is now the operative pleading in this matter, and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or to Stay the Action is rendered moot. Defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint within the time set forth in Rule 15(a)(3). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/16/2018. (lcapm3)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by MARION COSTER. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Ross, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay by PETER J. BONNELL, STEPHEN E. COX, STEVEN F. SCHWAT, SCHWAT REALTY LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo ISO Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Baum, Deborah)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to PETER J. BONNELL, STEPHEN E. COX, STEVEN F. SCHWAT, SCHWAT REALTY LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
August 28, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, filed by MARION COSTER. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by MARION COSTER.(Ross, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5657709) filed by MARION COSTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Ross, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COSTER v. SCHWAT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHWAT REALTY LLC
Represented By: Deborah Brand Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER J. BONNELL
Represented By: Deborah Brand Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN F. SCHWAT
Represented By: Deborah Brand Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN E. COX
Represented By: Deborah Brand Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UIP COMPANIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARION COSTER
Represented By: Michael Kay Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?