STELLAR IT SOLUTIONS, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Plaintiff: STELLAR IT SOLUTIONS, INC, Kartik Krishnamurthy and STELLAR IT SOLUTIONS, INC.
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2018cv02015
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 10/29/2018. (tj)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Postponing the Effectiveness of the Decisions filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Adebonojo, Kenneth)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Junction by October 25, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file their reply by October 29, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/24/2018. (lcrc2)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion is granted. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by October 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/23/2018. (lcrc2)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
October 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction due by 10/22/2018. (tj)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction on or before October 22, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 15, 2018. (lcrc3)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction on or before October 15, 2018; and Plaintiffs' shall file their reply on or before October 19, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 12, 2018. (lcrc3)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
September 29, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER adopting #6 the parties' Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: Defendant shall file an opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before October 12, 2018; Plaintiffs may file a reply to Defendant's opposition on or before October 15, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 29, 2018. (lcrc3)
September 29, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by KARTIK KRISHNAMURTHY, STELLAR IT SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Piston, Michael)
September 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/28/2018 (tj)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit, on or before September 28, 2018, a proposed briefing schedule regarding #2 the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 21, 2018. (lcrc3)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of All Defendants (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KARTIK KRISHNAMURTHY, STELLAR IT SOLUTIONS, INC. re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Postponing the Effectiveness of the Decisions (First Amended). (Piston, Michael)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
August 28, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Postponing the Effectiveness of the Decisions by Kartik Krishnamurthy, STELLAR IT SOLUTIONS, INC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Piston, Michael)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5661162) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney, #3 Summons USCIS, #4 Summons US Attorney General, #5 Exhibit A. H-1B Petition, #6 Exhibit B. Request for Evidence (RFE), #7 Exhibit C. Denial of March 20, 2018, #8 Exhibit D. Motion to Reopen, #9 Exhibit E. Denial of May 31, 2018, #10 Exhibit F. Denial of Extension of Stay)(Piston, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/29/2018) (zmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STELLAR IT SOLUTIONS, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STELLAR IT SOLUTIONS, INC
Represented By: Michael E. Piston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kartik Krishnamurthy
Represented By: Michael E. Piston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STELLAR IT SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Michael E. Piston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?