MOLINA v. TARGET CORPORATION
Plaintiff: ORBELINA MOLINA
Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02016
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Doyle on behalf of ORBELINA MOLINA (Doyle, Thomas)
October 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(1), to be exchanged by 11/16/2018. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 12/4/2018. Plaintiff's Initial Expert Disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(2), due by 12/4/2018. Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2019. Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Reports and Disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), due by 2/5/2019. Discovery shall conclude on 3/15/2019. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: The parties shall submit their initial disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(1), on or before November 16, 2018; the parties shall serve any interrogatories or document requests by November 19, 2018; the deadline for joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings is December 4, 2018; Plaintiff shall make initial expert disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(2), on or before December 4, 2018; the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of discovery on or before January 14, 2019; Defendant shall provide any rebuttal expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), on or before February 5, 2019; discovery shall conclude on March 15, 2019; and a Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for March 22, 2019, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 10. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/09/2018. (lcapm3)
October 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/5/2018. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Huber, Jonathan)
August 30, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (gdf)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for October 5, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/30/2018. (lcapm1)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal. (zmd)
August 29, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Lanier on behalf of TARGET CORPORATION (Lanier, Daniel)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TARGET CORPORATION. (Huber, Jonathan)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by TARGET CORPORATION.(Huber, Jonathan)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by TARGET CORPORATION re #1 Notice of Removal filed by TARGET CORPORATION. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal filed by TARGET CORPORATION.(Huber, Jonathan) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/29/2018) (zmd).
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2018-cv-005384 V Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5661230 filed by TARGET CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Huber, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOLINA v. TARGET CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION
Represented By: Jonathan James Huber
Represented By: Daniel R. Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORBELINA MOLINA
Represented By: Thomas E. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?