CRABTREE v. ZEIGER CRANE RENTAL, INC.

Plaintiff: MICHAEL A. CRABTREE
Defendant: ZEIGER CRANE RENTAL, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02026
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #5 motion for permission to withdraw as counsel. It is therefore ORDERED that R. Richard Hopp's appearance on behalf of plaintiff is hereby terminated. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/17/2018. (lcegs3)
September 14, 2018 5 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (R. Richard Hopp only) by MICHAEL A. CRABTREE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hopp, R.)
September 4, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles William Gilligan on behalf of MICHAEL A. CRABTREE (Gilligan, Charles)
September 4, 2018 3 Featured Case STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/4/18. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
August 30, 2018 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ZEIGER CRANE RENTAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
August 29, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmd)
August 29, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against ZEIGER CRANE RENTAL, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5663859) filed by MICHAEL A. CRABTREE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hopp, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRABTREE v. ZEIGER CRANE RENTAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL A. CRABTREE
Represented By: R. Richard Hopp
Represented By: Charles William Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZEIGER CRANE RENTAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?