PERISIC v. KIM et al

Plaintiff: MARIA PERISIC
Defendant: CIGNA, PHILIPPE LE HOUEROU, FRANK HEEMSKERK, SNEZANA STOILJKOVIC and JIM YONG KIM
Case Number: 1:2018cv02038
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #12 Response to motion was entered in error and refiled by counsel. (See Docket Entry #13 to view document) (jf)
October 16, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Letten on behalf of FRANK HEEMSKERK, JIM YONG KIM, PHILIPPE LE HOUEROU, SNEZANA STOILJKOVIC (Letten, Matthew)
October 15, 2018 13 RESPONSE re #9 MOTION filed by FRANK HEEMSKERK, JIM YONG KIM, PHILIPPE LE HOUEROU, SNEZANA STOILJKOVIC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2018 12 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESPONSE re #9 MOTION filed by FRANK HEEMSKERK, JIM YONG KIM, PHILIPPE LE HOUEROU, SNEZANA STOILJKOVIC. (Green, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/16/2018 (jf).
October 15, 2018 11 Memorandum in opposition to re #9 MOTION [Cigna's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion] filed by CIGNA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Michael)
October 1, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MARIA PERISIC re #9 MOTION. (jf)
September 27, 2018 9 MOTION by MARIA PERISIC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jf)
September 27, 2018 8 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant "Cigna" by CIGNA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Michael)
September 27, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss by FRANK HEEMSKERK, JIM YONG KIM, PHILIPPE LE HOUEROU, SNEZANA STOILJKOVIC (Green, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Answer due by 9/27/2018. (mac)
September 10, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting over plaintiff's opposition #6 joint motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint for good cause shown. The defendants shall therefore respond to the plaintiff's complaint by no later than September 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/10/2018. (lcegs3)
September 5, 2018 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CIGNA, FRANK HEEMSKERK, JIM YONG KIM, PHILIPPE LE HOUEROU, SNEZANA (NENA) STOIJKOVIC (Green, Jeffrey)
September 5, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Green on behalf of FRANK HEEMSKERK, JIM YONG KIM, PHILIPPE LE HOUEROU, SNEZANA (NENA) STOIJKOVIC (Green, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2018 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
September 4, 2018 3 Featured Case STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/04/18. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
August 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb)
August 30, 2018 2 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF FILING OF A NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CIGNA (Cunningham, Michael)
August 30, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 005334 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5666445 filed by CIGNA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cunningham, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERISIC v. KIM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA PERISIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA
Represented By: Michael P. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPPE LE HOUEROU
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Green
Represented By: Matthew J. Letten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK HEEMSKERK
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Green
Represented By: Matthew J. Letten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNEZANA STOILJKOVIC
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Green
Represented By: Matthew J. Letten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM YONG KIM
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Green
Represented By: Matthew J. Letten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?