JEFFERSON PARISH HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 2 et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: JEFFERSON PARISH HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 2, LAKELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., PRESBYTERIAN HEALTHCARE SERVICES, MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, LAKELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as LAKELAND REGIONAL HEALTH and JEFFERSON PARISH HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 2 doing business as EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M AZAR II and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv02039
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/10/2018. (Hettich, Daniel)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/9/2018. (Hettich, Daniel)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 9/10/2018 (Hettich, Daniel)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JEFFERSON PARISH HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 2, LAKELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, PRESBYTERIAN HEALTHCARE SERVICES. (Hettich, Daniel)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II filed by JEFFERSON PARISH HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 2, LAKELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., PRESBYTERIAN HEALTHCARE SERVICES, MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hettich, Daniel)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
September 4, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth N. Swayne on behalf of JEFFERSON PARISH HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 2, LAKELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., PRESBYTERIAN HEALTHCARE SERVICES (Swayne, Elizabeth)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JEFFERSON PARISH HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 2, LAKELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., PRESBYTERIAN HEALTHCARE SERVICES. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-01454. (Hettich, Daniel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JEFFERSON PARISH HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 2, LAKELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., PRESBYTERIAN HEALTHCARE SERVICES. (Hettich, Daniel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M AZAR II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5666518) filed by JEFFERSON PARISH HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 2, LAKELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., PRESBYTERIAN HEALTHCARE SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Hettich, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JEFFERSON PARISH HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 2 et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERSON PARISH HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 2
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESBYTERIAN HEALTHCARE SERVICES
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDICAL UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL AUTHORITY
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as LAKELAND REGIONAL HEALTH
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERSON PARISH HOSPITAL SERVICE DISTRICT NO. 2 doing business as EAST JEFFERSON GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?