TRANSAMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. MELTZER, et al
Plaintiff: TRANSAMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: MELTZER GROUP, INC. and ALAN L. MELTZER
Case Number: 1:2018cv02042
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Michael N. Wolgin in Further Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission by TRANSAMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Leventhal, Markham)
October 22, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, with respect to Michael N. Wolgin. That motion is GRANTED CONTINGENT upon Mr. Wolgin's submission of a declaration by OCTOBER 29, 2018, stating that he has reviewed and is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 22, 2018. (lcckk1)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. An Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby set for NOVEMBER 26, 2018, at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 22, 2018. (lcckk1)
October 18, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael N. Wolgin, :Firm- Carlton Fields Jorden Burt PA, :Address- 100 SE 2nd Street, Suite 4200, Miami, FL 33131. Phone No. - 305-530-0050. Fax No. - 305-530-0055 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5747589. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TRANSAMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Leventhal, Markham)
October 18, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ALAN L. MELTZER, MELTZER GROUP, INC..(Hassell, Christopher)
October 5, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to Complaint due by 10/18/2018. (dot)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendants' #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants indicate that their failure to timely file an answer or other response to the #1 Complaint is attributable to their retention, initially, of counsel that eventually realized a conflict. Accordingly, Defendants now move nunc pro tunc for an extension of time. With Plaintiff's consent, the Court shall GRANT nunc pro tunc Defendants' #11 Consent Motion, based on a finding of excusable neglect. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(B). Defendants' answer or other response to the #1 Complaint shall be submitted by OCTOBER 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 5, 2018. (lcckk1)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by ALAN L. MELTZER (Hassell, Christopher)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Markham R. Leventhal on behalf of TRANSAMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Leventhal, Markham)
September 20, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #7 Summons Returned Executed, #6 Summons Returned Executed was entered in error and refiled said pleadings as docket entry numbers #8 and #9 . (ztd)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALAN L. MELTZER served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018 (ztd)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MELTZER GROUP, INC. served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018 (ztd)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Williams, Dawn) Modified on 9/20/2018 (ztd).
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Williams, Dawn) Modified on 9/20/2018 (ztd).
September 17, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #5 Summons Returned Executed, was entered in error per counsel and will be refiled. (ztd)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALAN L. MELTZER served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018; MELTZER GROUP, INC. served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018 (Williams, Dawn) Modified on 9/17/2018 (ztd).
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANSAMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Williams, Dawn)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/07/18. (DM)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to ALAN L. MELTZER, MELTZER GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth)
August 30, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsth)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALAN L. MELTZER, MELTZER GROUP, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5666983) filed by TRANSAMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Alan Meltzer, #4 Summons to Meltzer Group)(Williams, Dawn) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/31/2018) (zsth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRANSAMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. MELTZER, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELTZER GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Christopher E. Hassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN L. MELTZER
Represented By: Christopher E. Hassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRANSAMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Dawn B. Williams
Represented By: Markham R. Leventhal
Represented By: Michael N. Wolgin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?