ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST HOSPITAL, INC., CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER, HIGHLAND HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER, MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM, HOMESTEAD HOSPITAL, INC., CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NEWYORK PRESBYTERIAN / QUEENS, NEW YORK EYE AND EAR INFIRMARY OF MOUNT SINAI, GRADY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CLARA MAAS MEDICAL CENTER, ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER, INC., DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC., BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, FLAGET HEALTHCARE, INC., DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT, HARRISON MEDICAL CENTER, NEWARK BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., METHODIST HEALTH CENTERS, HIGHLINE MEDICAL CENTER, FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM, JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC., ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, KEARNEY, NEBRASKA and MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv02044
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/9/2018. (Webster, Stephanie)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/15/2018. (Webster, Stephanie)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 10/15/2018 (Webster, Stephanie)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
August 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zmd)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER, BAPTIST HOSPITAL, INC., BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER, CLARA MAAS MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT, DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC., FLAGET HEALTHCARE, INC., FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER, INC., FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, KEARNEY, NEBRASKA, GRADY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION, HARRISON MEDICAL CENTER, HIGHLAND HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER, HIGHLINE MEDICAL CENTER, HOMESTEAD HOSPITAL, INC., JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER, JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC., MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., METHODIST HEALTH CENTERS, MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NEW YORK EYE AND EAR INFIRMARY OF MOUNT SINAI, NEWARK BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., NEWYORK PRESBYTERIAN / QUEENS (Webster, Stephanie)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5668098) filed by FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM, CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP., CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM, HIGHLINE MEDICAL CENTER, CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER, ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER, INC., CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO, NEWYORK PRESBYTERIAN / QUEENS, JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT, DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC., FLAGET HEALTHCARE, INC., NEW YORK EYE AND EAR INFIRMARY OF MOUNT SINAI, HARRISON MEDICAL CENTER, ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, KEARNEY, NEBRASKA, BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, HIGHLAND HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER, GRADY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAPTIST HOSPITAL, INC., METHODIST HEALTH CENTERS, NEWARK BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC., CLARA MAAS MEDICAL CENTER, HOMESTEAD HOSPITAL, INC., MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES - IOWA, CORP.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHI ST. LUKE'S HEALTH BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERSEY CITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIGHLAND HOSPITAL OF ROCHESTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOMESTEAD HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHOLIC HEALTH INITIATIVES COLORADO
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONMOUTH MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEWYORK PRESBYTERIAN / QUEENS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW YORK EYE AND EAR INFIRMARY OF MOUNT SINAI
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRADY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARA MAAS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT CREIGHTON HEALTH CREIGHTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORIDA HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOCTORS HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT HEALTH - BERGAN MERCY HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLAGET HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALLAS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRISON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEWARK BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: METHODIST HEALTH CENTERS
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIGHLINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEWISH HOSPITAL & ST. MARY'S HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEGENT HEALTH - IMMANUEL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, KEARNEY, NEBRASKA
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?