FAHEY v. DEOLEO USA, INC.

Plaintiff: A. KEVIN FAHEY
Defendant: DEOLEO USA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02047
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by DEOLEO USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kirtland, Matthew)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by A. KEVIN FAHEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed ORder)(Willcox, Thomas)
October 10, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/15/2018. (znbn)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response shall now be due on or before October 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/10/2018. (lccrc2)
October 8, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by A. KEVIN FAHEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Willcox, Thomas)
September 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/8/2018. (lsj)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's response is now due on or before October 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/26/2018. (lccrc2)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 Receipt on 9/25/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 18ca4842. (zrdj)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by A. KEVIN FAHEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed ORder)(Willcox, Thomas)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by DEOLEO USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Kirtland, Matthew)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal. (zmd)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #3 Defendant's Motion for Admission of Attorney Jeffrey Brian Margulies Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/5/2018. (lccrc2)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey Brian Margulies, :Firm- Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP, :Address- 555 South Flower Street, Forty-First Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Phone No. - (213) 892-2986. Fax No. - (213) 892-9494 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5672978. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DEOLEO USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Brian Margulies, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kirtland, Matthew)
August 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEOLEO USA, INC.. (Kirtland, Matthew)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 004842 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5667941 filed by DEOLEO USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kirtland, Matthew) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/4/2018) (zmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAHEY v. DEOLEO USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. KEVIN FAHEY
Represented By: Thomas C. Willcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEOLEO USA, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Brian Margulies
Represented By: Matthew H. Kirtland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?