SHORTER v. NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

Plaintiff: MICHAEL SHORTER
Defendant: NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02074
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by MICHAEL SHORTER re #3 Order. (tth)
September 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 10/11/2018. (zjd)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. No later than October 11, 2018, Plaintiff shall show cause why this matter should not be transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/11/2018. (lcapm3)
September 4, 2018 Summons (1) Issued as to NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY. (jf)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MICHAEL SHORTER. Case related to Case No.: 16-9257(ND of Illinois) (jf)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616094362) with Jury Demand filed by MICHAEL SHORTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHORTER v. NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SHORTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?