YUDZON v. SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC
Plaintiff: ALEX YUDZON
Defendant: SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02076
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Thomas F Hogan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Sage Title's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 5] is hereby HELD IN ABEYANCE until plaintiff's First Motion to Amend the Complaint [ECF No. 10] becomes ripe and is resolved by the Court. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on October 25, 2018. (lctfh4).
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by ALEX YUDZON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Chester, Charles)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Request for Hearing and Certificate of Service filed by ALEX YUDZON. (Chester, Charles)
September 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to defendant's motion to dismiss due by 10/25/2018 (hs)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file a response to defendant's motion to dismiss [ECF No. 6] is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file his response to defendant's motion to dismiss on or before October 25, 2018. The Court will not grant plaintiff further extensions for the purpose of retaining counsel. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on September 26, 2018. (lctfh4).
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 Receipt on 9/25/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 18ca5456. (zrdj)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1-3)(Johnson, Vernon)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ALEX YUDZON (jf)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 - 6)(Johnson, Vernon)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE to Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (zmd)
September 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zmd)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC (Johnson, Vernon)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC. Case related to Case No. 18-1837. (Johnson, Vernon)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 18ca5456 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5671210 filed by SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents from Superior Court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Vernon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YUDZON v. SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Vernon Webster Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX YUDZON
Represented By: Charles Frederick Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?