SMITH v. ATHENA CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff: WILLIAM SMITH
Defendant: AMBER PEEBLES, ATHENA CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC., MELISSA SCHNEIDER, CLARK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, BALFOUR BEATTY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., COAKLEY & WILLIAMS CONSTRUCTION, INC., GILBANE BUILDING COMPANY, BARTON MALOW COMPANY, CLARK/BALFOUR BEATTY-NCE, CDM SMITH/COAKLEY WILLIAMS JV, HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION CO., COMPONENT ASSEMBLY SYSTEMS, INC., CDM SMITH INC., COMMONWEALTH WALL SYSTEMS, LLC and TURNER/GILBANE JV
Interested Party: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Debtor In Possession: JOHN DOES
Case Number: 1:2018cv02080
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 41 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by WILLIAM SMITH(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit Exhibit 83)(Simmer, W.)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SEALED ORDER re 39 Sealed Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/19/2018.(zjd)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of the Government's request for an additional investigatory period of four months to consider the new allegations contained in Plaintiff's proposed Second Amended Complaint, see ECF Nos. 38-39, Plaintiff is hereby directed to file his Second Amended Complaint under seal. A decision about further proceedings in this matter will be made after the Government decides whether to intervene. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/19/2018. (lcapm1)
October 17, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE Regarding Relator's Proposed Second Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Truong, John)
September 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Telephone Conference held on 9/28/2018. Government's Notice due by 10/17/2018. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying Defendant's #32 Motion for Briefing Schedule and Plaintiff's #34 Motion for Briefing Schedule. Pursuant to the telephone conference held on this date, Plaintiff shall provide ex parte a copy of his proposed Second Amended Complaint to government counsel for review no later than October 3, 2018. On or before October 17, 2018, government counsel shall notify the court, by public filing, whether the nature of the allegations in the proposed Second Amended Complaint are such that the government believes a new investigatory period is warranted. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/28/2018. (lcapm1)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #37 Motion to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Glenn Andrew Ellis is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/26/2018. (lcapm1)
September 26, 2018 Filing 37 Declaration re #36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Glenn A. Ellis, :Firm- Freiwald Law, P.C., :Address- 1500 Walnut Street, 18th Floor, Philadelphia, PA 19102. Phone No. - 215-875-8000. Fax No. - gae@freiwaldlaw.com Filing f Supplement to Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Glenn A. Ellis Declaration by WILLIAM SMITH (Simmer, W.) Modified on 10/1/2018 to correct docket text/event (jf).
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before the court considers the #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, the movant must attach a declaration, signed by the non-member seeking to appear pro hac vice, that complies with the requirements set forth in Local Civil Rule 83.2(d). If the movant fails to submit such a declaration, the court will deny the motion. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/26/2018. (lcapm1)
September 25, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Glenn A. Ellis, :Firm- Freiwald Law, P.C., :Address- 1500 Walnut Street, 18th Floor, Philadelphia, PA 19102. Phone No. - 215-875-8000. Fax No. - gae@freiwaldlaw.com Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5705784. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILLIAM SMITH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simmer, W.)
September 25, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference scheduled for 9/28/2018, at 10:00 AM before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (tg)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER scheduling telephone conference for September 28, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/25/2018. (lcapm1)
September 25, 2018 Filing 35 Memorandum in opposition to re #34 MOTION for Briefing Schedule filed by ATHENA CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Craig, Thomas)
September 21, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Briefing Schedule by WILLIAM SMITH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter from DOJ to Relator, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Simmer, W.)
September 21, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Scott Simmer on behalf of WILLIAM SMITH (Simmer, W.)
September 20, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Briefing Schedule by ATHENA CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craig, Thomas)
September 20, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Miller on behalf of WILLIAM SMITH (Miller, Andrew)
September 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/21/2018. (zjd)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. On or before September 21, 2018, the parties shall submit a proposed briefing schedule for any renewed motion to dismiss by Defendant pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/19/2018. (lcapm1)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Milton C. Johns is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/10/2018. (lcapm1)
September 10, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Milton C. Johns, :Firm- FH+H, PLLC, :Address- 1751 Pinnacle Drive Suite 1000, Tysons, VA 22102. Phone No. - 7035901234. Fax No. - 7035900366 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5681332. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ATHENA CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Craig, Thomas)
September 7, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Craig on behalf of ATHENA CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. (Craig, Thomas)
September 7, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by John Cuong Truong on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Truong, John)
September 5, 2018 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:17-cv-00060. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: In accord with the accompanying Memorandum #25 ; Dft's mtn to Dismiss #17 is Denied. The clerk shall transfer this case to the USDC for the District of Columbia.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 8/29/18. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM re MOTION to Dismiss #17 (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 8/29/18. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stephen G. Rhoads (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rhoads, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 23 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Andrew Miller, Esq. on behalf of William SmithSigned by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 5/7/18. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 22 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Scott Simmer, Esq. on behalf of William SmithSigned by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 5/7/18. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 21 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by William S Simmer on behalf of United States Of America ex rel. William "Bill" Smith . Attorney W. Scott Simmer is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4418424. (Simmer, William) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 20 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Andrew M Miller on behalf of United States Of America ex rel. William "Bill" Smith - Attorney Andrew Miller is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4418410. (Miller, Andrew) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
December 19, 2017 Filing 19 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 In Opposition)(Freiwald, Aaron) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
December 7, 2017 Filing 18 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Athena Construction Group, Inc., Amber Peebles, Melissa Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence)(Rhoads, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
December 6, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to re-file only the Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complant as a seperate document using event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs) Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). Counsel is further advised to file a Certificate of Concurrence/Non-Concurrence for Doc. 17. (dmn) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
December 5, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Athena Construction Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Service)(Rhoads, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
November 21, 2017 Filing 16 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Freiwald, Aaron) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
November 21, 2017 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States Of America.(Freiwald, Aaron) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 14 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Milton Johns, Esq. on behalf of dtsSigned by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 11/6/17. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
November 6, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner Johns & Associate Counsel Rhoads- Bar Status Verified. (ve) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 13 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION- Pro Hac Vice - Attorney Milton Johns is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4245519 (Rhoads, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
November 2, 2017 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Athena Construction Group, Inc., Amber Peebles, Melissa Schneider.(Rhoads, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
November 2, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the Memorandum to Doc. 11 as a separate entry using the event: Brief in Support. (ve) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
November 1, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Athena Construction Group, Inc., Amber Peebles, Melissa Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Rhoads, Stephen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Athena Construction Group, Inc., Amber Peebles, Melissa Schneider and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Service Documents) (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. The complaint #1 be unsealed and served upn the dfts by the relator; 2. All other contents of the court's file in this action remain sealed but for this order #9 and the Gvt's notice of election #8 ; 3. The seal be lifted as to all other matters occuring in this action after the date of this order; 4. Parties shall serve all pleadings and mtns filed in this case action. The U.S. may order any deposition transcripts and is entitled to intervene in this action for good causeeeee at any time; 5. All orders of this court shall be sent to the U.S.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/12/17. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
September 6, 2017 Filing 8 The Government's NOTICE of Election to Decline Intervention by United States Of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cl) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
March 16, 2017 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO DETERMINE WHETHER TO INTERVENE by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(bg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn A. Ellis on behalf of William Smith. (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
February 7, 2017 Filing 4 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Glenn Ellis, Esq. on behalf of pltfSigned by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 2/6/17. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
February 6, 2017 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE)- Attorney Glenn Ellis is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50 Receipt Number: 111020007 (ve) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
January 11, 2017 Receipt of payment from USA ex rel. WILLIAM SMITH in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 1/10/2017. Receipt number 111019907 processed by vyinger. (jjs, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
January 10, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
January 10, 2017 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Glenn Ellis. (pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]
January 10, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 111019907) filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 9/5/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. ATHENA CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM SMITH
Represented By: Andrew Michael Miller
Represented By: Glenn Andrew Ellis
Represented By: W. Scott Simmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBER PEEBLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATHENA CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Thomas M. Craig
Represented By: Milton C. Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELISSA SCHNEIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BALFOUR BEATTY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COAKLEY & WILLIAMS CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILBANE BUILDING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARTON MALOW COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK/BALFOUR BEATTY-NCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDM SMITH/COAKLEY WILLIAMS JV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPONENT ASSEMBLY SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDM SMITH INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH WALL SYSTEMS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TURNER/GILBANE JV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: John Cuong Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?