GSELL v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)

Plaintiff: ERNEST ALBERT GSELL
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 1:2018cv02088
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Thomas F Hogan
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2018 7 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(McGrath, Felicity)
October 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 11/9/2018; Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (hs)
October 10, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. A Scheduling Conference is hereby set for November 15, 2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 26A. The parties' report pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 16.3 shall be filed on or before November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on October 10, 2018. (lctfh3)
October 3, 2018 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ERNEST ALBERT GSELL.(Goggin, Robert)
October 2, 2018 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (McGrath, Felicity)
October 2, 2018 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK).(McGrath, Felicity)
September 19, 2018 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018 (Goggin, Robert)
September 6, 2018 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
September 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zsb)
September 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5674878) filed by ERNEST ALBERT GSELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Goggin, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GSELL v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST ALBERT GSELL
Represented By: Robert S. Goggin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Felicity Ann McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?