SELTZ v. CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC.

Plaintiff: RYAN SELTZ
Defendant: CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02092
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's #12 Motion for Admission of Joseph K. Mulherin Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Mulherin may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the defendant in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 18, 2018. (lcbah1)
October 17, 2018 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joseph K. Mulherin, :Firm- Vedder Price P.C., :Address- 222 N. LaSalle Street, Suite 2600, Chicago, Illinois 60601. Phone No. - 312-609-7725. Fax No. - 312- 609-5005 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5743830. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph K. Mulherin in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Inomata, Margaret)
October 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Initial Disclosures due by 11/5/2018; Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 1/14/2019; Discovery due by 10/15/2019; Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2019; Motion for Class Certification due by 11/14/2019; Opposition to Motion for Class Certification due by 12/16/2019; Reply to Opposition to Motion for Class Certification due by 12/30/2019; Expert Discovery due by 11/29/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 1/28/2020; Oppositions to Dispositive Motions due by 2/27/2020; Replies to Oppositions to Dispositive Motions due by 3/13/2020. (tg)
October 15, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' #11 Joint Meet and Confer Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control the timing of proceedings in this matter: (1) by November 5, 2018, the parties shall exchange initial disclosures; (2) by January 14, 2019, the parties shall make any amendments to the pleadings and join any additional parties; (3) by October 15, 2019, all fact discovery shall close, on which date the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court whether (a) the parties request referral for mediation or settlement, (b) the parties request a date for a pretrial conference, or (c) dispositive motions are anticipated; (4) by November 14, 2019, the plaintiff shall file any motion for class certification pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23; (5) by November 29, 2019, all expert discovery shall close; (6) by December 16, 2019, the defendant shall file any opposition to the plaintiff's motion for class certification; (7) by December 30, 2019, the plaintiff shall file any reply in support of its motion for class certification; (8) by January 28, 2020, the parties shall file any dispositive motions; (9) by February 27, 2020, the parties shall file any oppositions to dispositive motions; (10) by March 13, 2020, the parties shall file any replies in support of their dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 15, 2018. (lcbah1)
October 12, 2018 11 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abrahamson, Sally)
September 26, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING, the plaintiff's #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Aaron may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 26, 2018. (lcbah1)
September 26, 2018 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Deirdre A. Aaron, :Firm- Outten & Golden LLP, :Address- 685 Third Avenue, 25th Floor, New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - 347-390-2130. Fax No. - 646-509-2064 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5706821. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RYAN SELTZ (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deirdre A. Aaron, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Abrahamson, Sally)
September 26, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING, the plaintiff's #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Swartz may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 26, 2018. (lcbah1)
September 25, 2018 9 Receipt on 9/25/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 18ca4710. (zrdj)
September 25, 2018 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Justin M. Swartz, :Firm- Outten & Golden LLP, :Address- 685 Third Avenue, 25th Floor, New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - 212-245-1000. Fax No. - 646-509-2060 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5705701. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RYAN SELTZ (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin M. Swartz, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Abrahamson, Sally)
September 13, 2018 7 ANSWER to Complaint by CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC..(Inomata, Margaret)
September 12, 2018 6 Featured Case STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 12, 2018. (lcbah1)
September 10, 2018 5 ERRATA to Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.'s Notice of Removal by CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC. #1 Notice of Removal, filed by CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Inomata, Margaret)
September 7, 2018 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zsth)
September 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsth)
September 6, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Inomata on behalf of CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC. (Inomata, Margaret)
September 6, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC.. (Inomata, Margaret)
September 6, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 004710 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5675578 filed by CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Inomata, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SELTZ v. CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN SELTZ
Represented By: Deirdre A. Aaron
Represented By: Justin M. Swartz
Represented By: Sally Jasmine Abrahamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD, INC.
Represented By: Margaret Inomata
Represented By: Joseph K. Mulherin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?