KYER-FOSNAUGH v. STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: Cherie Kyer-Fosnaugh
Defendant: STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY, The Standard Benefit Administrators and STANDARD BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS
Case Number: 1:2018cv02094
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
0 Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
1 Judge: Deborah A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2018 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand filed by CHERIE KYER-FOSNAUGH.(Batt, Mitchell)
October 19, 2018 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for full case management. (ad)
October 19, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court has determined that this action should be referred to a Magistrate Judge for full case management up to and including issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive motions, but excluding trial. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter is referred to a Magistrate Judge, beginning immediately; the Magistrate Judge will be randomly assigned by the clerk's office; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that any future filings related to this matter shall have the initials of the presiding judge and the magistrate judge following the case number in the caption. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/19/18. (DJS)
October 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/12/2018. (tb)
October 8, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Standard Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by November 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/8/18. (DJS)
October 5, 2018 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , Standard Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time for Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herring, Jacquelin)
October 5, 2018 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY (Herring, Jacquelin)
October 5, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelin J. Herring on behalf of STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY (Herring, Jacquelin)
September 12, 2018 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to STANDARD BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS, STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
September 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd)
September 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5675666) filed by Cherie Kyer-Fosnaugh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Batt, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KYER-FOSNAUGH v. STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherie Kyer-Fosnaugh
Represented By: Mitchell I. Batt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jacquelin J. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Benefit Administrators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD BENEFIT ADMINISTRATORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?