HACKMAN v. ONE BRANDS LLC

Plaintiff: GLORIA HACKMAN
Defendant: ONE BRANDS LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02101
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to opposition to motion re #10 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by GLORIA HACKMAN. (Migliaccio, Nicholas)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 Memorandum in opposition to re #10 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by ONE BRANDS LLC. (Mundel, Benjamin)
October 10, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response to #10 due by 10/24/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 10/31/2018. (dot)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's #10 Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. The Court ORDERS Defendant to file an Opposition by OCTOBER 24, 2018 and Plaintiff to file a Reply in support of her Motion by OCTOBER 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10-10-2018. (lcckk3)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by GLORIA HACKMAN (Rathod, Jason)
October 7, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to opposition to motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ONE BRANDS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Mundel, Benjamin)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 Memorandum in opposition to re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GLORIA HACKMAN. (Migliaccio, Nicholas)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 Receipt on 9/25/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 18ca5423. (zrdj)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/24/2018. (DM)
September 14, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to file a Response to Defendant's #5 by 9/28/2018. Reply due by 10/7/2018. (dot)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's #5 Motion to Dismiss. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a Response to Defendant's #5 Motion to Dismiss by no later than SEPTEMBER 28, 2018. The Court further ORDERS Defendant to file a reply in support of its #5 Motion to Dismiss by no later than OCTOBER 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9-14-2018. (lcckk3)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by ONE BRANDS LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Volpe, Frank)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zsth)
September 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsth)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Mundel on behalf of ONE BRANDS LLC (Mundel, Benjamin)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ONE BRANDS LLC (Volpe, Frank) Modified on 9/7/2018 (zrdj).
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from DC Superior Court, case number 2018 CA 005423 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5677933 filed by ONE BRANDS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Volpe, Frank) (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/10/2018) (zsth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HACKMAN v. ONE BRANDS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE BRANDS LLC
Represented By: Frank R. Volpe
Represented By: Benjamin M. Mundel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA HACKMAN
Represented By: Esfand Yar Nafisi
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Represented By: Jason Samuel Rathod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?