ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY v. HOFFMAN-MADISON WATERFRONT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC, HOFFMAN-STRUEVER WATERFRONT, LLC, WHARF DISTRICT JOINT VENTURE LP, SALT WATER SEAFOOD, INC., WHARF FISH MARKET REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC, WHARF, INC., WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT, LLC, BRW, INC., HOFFMAN-MADISON WATERFRONT, LLC and WHARF DISTRICT GP JOINT VENTURE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02104
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of BRW, INC., SALT WATER SEAFOOD, INC., WHARF, INC. (Caplen, Robert)
October 24, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendell Landray Taylor on behalf of BRW, INC., SALT WATER SEAFOOD, INC., WHARF, INC. (Taylor, Wendell)
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE by BRW, INC., WHARF, INC., SALT WATER SEAFOOD, INC.. BRW, INC. waiver sent on 9/26/2018, answer due 11/25/2018; WHARF, INC. waiver sent on 9/26/2018, answer due 11/25/2018; SALT WATER SEAFOOD, INC. waiver sent on 9/26/2018, answer due 11/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Range, John)
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John Jay Range on behalf of BRW, INC., SALT WATER SEAFOOD, INC., WHARF, INC. (Range, John)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE by ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY. HOFFMAN-MADISON WATERFRONT, LLC waiver sent on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018; HOFFMAN-STRUEVER WATERFRONT, LLC waiver sent on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018; WHARF DISTRICT GP JOINT VENTURE, LLC waiver sent on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018; WHARF DISTRICT JOINT VENTURE LP waiver sent on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018; WHARF FISH MARKET REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC waiver sent on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018; WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC waiver sent on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018; WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT, LLC waiver sent on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement District Joint Venture, #2 Supplement Fish Market REIT, #3 Supplement Horizontal Leaseholder, #4 Supplement Horizontal REIT, #5 Supplement Horizontal Struever, #6 Supplement Horrman-Madison)(Lippincott, Kelly) Modified on 9/28/2018 to correct sent/answer due date(s) (jf).
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Cavaliero Pincoski on behalf of HOFFMAN-MADISON WATERFRONT, LLC, HOFFMAN-STRUEVER WATERFRONT, LLC, WHARF DISTRICT GP JOINT VENTURE, LLC, WHARF DISTRICT JOINT VENTURE LP, WHARF FISH MARKET REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC, WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC, WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT, LLC (Pincoski, Clare)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Zingone on behalf of HOFFMAN-MADISON WATERFRONT, LLC, HOFFMAN-STRUEVER WATERFRONT, LLC, WHARF DISTRICT GP JOINT VENTURE, LLC, WHARF DISTRICT JOINT VENTURE LP, WHARF FISH MARKET REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC, WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC, WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT, LLC (Zingone, Gerald)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. McNamara on behalf of HOFFMAN-MADISON WATERFRONT, LLC, HOFFMAN-STRUEVER WATERFRONT, LLC, WHARF DISTRICT GP JOINT VENTURE, LLC, WHARF DISTRICT JOINT VENTURE LP, WHARF FISH MARKET REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC, WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC, WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT, LLC (McNamara, Michael)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 #8 Motions for Leave of Adam Hoyt Fleischer and Justin K. Seigler to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyers admitted, or at least one member of the lawyers' firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/20/18. (DMK)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Minute Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, by ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seigler)(Lippincott, Kelly) Modified event title on 9/19/2018 (znmw).
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Minute Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, by ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amended Declaration)(Lippincott, Kelly) Modified event title on 9/19/2018 (znmw).
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS 10 Issued Electronically as to BRW, INC., HOFFMAN-MADISON WATERFRONT, LLC, HOFFMAN-STRUEVER WATERFRONT, LLC, SALT WATER SEAFOOD, INC., WHARF DISTRICT GP JOINT VENTURE, LLC, WHARF DISTRICT JOINT VENTURE LP, WHARF FISH MARKET REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC, WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC, WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT, LLC, WHARF, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #3 #4 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with the specific requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), in particular subpart (4) which requires "a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline." Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/14/18. (DMK)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, filed by ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Summons Hoffman-Struever, #2 Summons Wharf District GP Joint Venture, LLC, #3 Summons Wharf District Joint Venture LP, #4 Summons Wharf Horizontal REIT, LLC, #5 Summons Wharf Horizontal REIT Leaseholder, #6 Summons Wharf Fish Market REIT Leaseholder, #7 Summons The Wharf, #8 Summons BRW, Inc., #9 Summons Salt Water Seafood)(Lippincott, Kelly)
September 12, 2018 SUMMONS Not Issued as to BRW, INC., HOFFMAN-MADISON WATERFRONT, LLC, HOFFMAN-STRUEVER WATERFRONT, LLC, SALT WATER SEAFOOD, INC., WHARF DISTRICT GP JOINT VENTURE, LLC, WHARF DISTRICT JOINT VENTURE LP, WHARF FISH MARKET REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC, WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC, WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT, LLC, WHARF, INC.. (zmd)
September 10, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmd)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adam H. Fleischer, :Firm- BatesCarey LLP, :Address- 191 North Wacker, Suite 2400, Chicago, IL 60606. Phone No. - 312-762-3130. Fax No. - 312-762-3200 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5681443. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Declaration Fleischer's Declaration)(Lippincott, Kelly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Justin K. Seigler, :Firm- BatesCarey LLP, :Address- 191 North Wacker, Suite 2400, Chicago, IL 60606. Phone No. - 312-762-3416. Fax No. - 312-762-3200 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5681311. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Declaration Seigler's Declaration)(Lippincott, Kelly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Lippincott, Kelly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5680288) filed by ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 ExhibitD, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Summons, #13 Supplement Corporate Disclosure)(Lippincott, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY v. HOFFMAN-MADISON WATERFRONT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC
Represented By: Clare Cavaliero Pincoski
Represented By: Gerald Zingone
Represented By: Michael S. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOFFMAN-STRUEVER WATERFRONT, LLC
Represented By: Clare Cavaliero Pincoski
Represented By: Gerald Zingone
Represented By: Michael S. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHARF DISTRICT JOINT VENTURE LP
Represented By: Clare Cavaliero Pincoski
Represented By: Gerald Zingone
Represented By: Michael S. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALT WATER SEAFOOD, INC.
Represented By: Wendell Landray Taylor
Represented By: Robert Aaron Caplen
Represented By: John Jay Range
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHARF FISH MARKET REIT LEASEHOLDER. LLC
Represented By: Clare Cavaliero Pincoski
Represented By: Gerald Zingone
Represented By: Michael S. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHARF, INC.
Represented By: Wendell Landray Taylor
Represented By: Robert Aaron Caplen
Represented By: John Jay Range
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT, LLC
Represented By: Clare Cavaliero Pincoski
Represented By: Gerald Zingone
Represented By: Michael S. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRW, INC.
Represented By: Wendell Landray Taylor
Represented By: Robert Aaron Caplen
Represented By: John Jay Range
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOFFMAN-MADISON WATERFRONT, LLC
Represented By: Clare Cavaliero Pincoski
Represented By: Gerald Zingone
Represented By: Michael S. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHARF DISTRICT GP JOINT VENTURE, LLC
Represented By: Clare Cavaliero Pincoski
Represented By: Gerald Zingone
Represented By: Michael S. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Kelly Marie Lippincott
Represented By: Justin K. Seigler
Represented By: Adam Hoyt Fleischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?